This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2016 at 13:21:11 (UTC).

Helios Software LLC et al v. SpectorSoft Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/06/2015 Helios Software LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against SpectorSoft Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Leonard P. Stark and Judge Christopher J. Burke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard P. Stark

Referral Judge

Judge Christopher J. Burke

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants

Pearl Software Inc.

Helios Software LLC

Counter Claimant

SpectorSoft Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Adam Wyatt Poff

Monte Terrell Squire

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Rex A. Donnelly, IV

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,930,535 B2;. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Helios Software LLC. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Pearl Software Inc.. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pearl Software Inc., Helios Software LLC. SpectorSoft Corporation served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#7

(#7) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER Procedures Order by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM ORDER granting D.I. 11 MOTION to Stay filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. The stay will extend until August 28, 2015, and by July 24, 2015, the parties shall provide the Court with a joint letter, updating the Court as to whether either or both parties intend to move to extend the stay prior to its expiration. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 03/25/2015. (mlc) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cabrach J. Connor, David E. Dunham, Jennifer Tatum Lee - filed by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

#24

(#24) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James P. Martin - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#25

(#25) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erick C. Howard - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#26

(#26) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kajsa M. Minor - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#27

(#27) Joint Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rex A. Donnelly and Monte T. Squire regarding Extension of Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#28

(#28) SO ORDERED Stipulation to Extend Stay as attached to Letter D.I. 27 . Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/27/2015. (dlk) Modified on 7/27/2015. (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#29

(#29) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

#30

(#30) ORDER re (638 in 1:12-cv-00081-LPS, 29 in 1:15-cv-00020-LPS-CJB) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00081-LPS, 1:15-cv-00020-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER re (638 in 1:12-cv-00081-LPS, 29 in 1:15-cv-00020-LPS-CJB) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/25/15. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00081-LPS, 1:15-cv-00020-LPS-CJB (ntl) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Squire, Monte) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SO ORDERED Stipulation to Extend Stay as attached to Letter D.I. 27 . Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/27/2015. (dlk) Modified on 7/27/2015. (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Joint Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Rex A. Donnelly and Monte T. Squire regarding Extension of Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kajsa M. Minor - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Erick C. Howard - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James P. Martin - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cabrach J. Connor, David E. Dunham, Jennifer Tatum Lee - filed by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM ORDER granting D.I. 11 MOTION to Stay filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. The stay will extend until August 28, 2015, and by July 24, 2015, the parties shall provide the Court with a joint letter, updating the Court as to whether either or both parties intend to move to extend the stay prior to its expiration. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 03/25/2015. (mlc) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark and The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Monte T. Squire regarding Case Scheduling Issues. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc. by SpectorSoft Corporation.(Blaszkowski, Christopher) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - filed by SpectorSoft Corporation. (Donnelly, Rex) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED ORDER Procedures Order by Helios Software LLC, Pearl Software Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/22/15. (ntl) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pearl Software Inc., Helios Software LLC. SpectorSoft Corporation served on 1/8/2015, answer due 1/29/2015. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Pearl Software Inc.. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Helios Software LLC. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,930,535 B2;. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SpectorSoft Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0311-1650288.) - filed by Pearl Software Inc., Helios Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(etg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex A. Donnelly, IV(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher H. Blaszkowski