This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:44:29 (UTC).

Helferich Patent Licensing LLC et al v. Lee

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 Helferich Patent Licensing LLC filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Lee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Helferich Patent Licensing LLC

Wireless Science LLC

Defendant

Michelle K Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jon E Kappes

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven G Lisa Ltd

55 W Monroe St., Ste. 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Steven G Lisa

Attorney at Law Offices of Steven G Lisa Limited

55 W Monroe St., Ste. 3200

Chicago, IL 60603

Victoria Gruver Curtin

Attorney at Victoria Gruver Curtin PLC

14555 N Scottsdale Rd, Ste 160

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Michael Lantka

Attorney at US Attorneys Office

2 Renaissance Sq, 40 N Central Ave., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4408

Sydney Oliver Johnson, Jr.

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

600 Dulany St.

Alexandria, VA 22314

Amy J Nelson

Attorney at US Patent & Trademark Office

600 Dulaney St.

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC, Wireless Science LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Jon E. Kappes by Plaintiff Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A - 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2 - 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit A2 - 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit A3, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit D1, # 11 Exhibit D2, # 12 Exhibit D3, # 13 Exhibit D4, # 14 Exhibit D5, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit E1, # 17 Exhibit F, # 18 Exhibit F1, # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit G1, # 21 Exhibit G2, # 22 Exhibit H, # 23 Exhibit I, # 24 Exhibit J, # 25 Exhibit K, # 26 Exhibit L, # 27 Exhibit M, # 28 Exhibit N, # 29 Exhibit O, # 30 Exhibit O1, # 31 Exhibit O2, # 32 Exhibit O3, # 33 Exhibit O4, # 34 Exhibit O5, # 35 Exhibit O6, # 36 Exhibit O7, # 37 Exhibit P, # 38 Exhibit Q, # 39 Exhibit R)(Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#15

(#15) MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2014 at 10:00AM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wireless Science LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Supplement The Record by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/30/2014.(TCA) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Michelle K Lee.(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2014)

#12

(#12) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS re: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

#5

(#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10465456. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01053-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan R Bolton [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/21/14. (MAW) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE re: Notification To Parties to Agency Proceeding by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Michelle K Lee. (ALS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/16/2014)

#1

No Description Available

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/30/2014.(TCA) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2014 at 10:00AM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Supplement The Record by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DECLARATION of Jon E. Kappes by Plaintiff Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A - 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit A1, # 4 Exhibit A2 - 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit A2 - 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit A3, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit D1, # 11 Exhibit D2, # 12 Exhibit D3, # 13 Exhibit D4, # 14 Exhibit D5, # 15 Exhibit E, # 16 Exhibit E1, # 17 Exhibit F, # 18 Exhibit F1, # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit G1, # 21 Exhibit G2, # 22 Exhibit H, # 23 Exhibit I, # 24 Exhibit J, # 25 Exhibit K, # 26 Exhibit L, # 27 Exhibit M, # 28 Exhibit N, # 29 Exhibit O, # 30 Exhibit O1, # 31 Exhibit O2, # 32 Exhibit O3, # 33 Exhibit O4, # 34 Exhibit O5, # 35 Exhibit O6, # 36 Exhibit O7, # 37 Exhibit P, # 38 Exhibit Q, # 39 Exhibit R)(Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS re: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susan R Bolton [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/21/14. (MAW) (Entered: 07/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Michelle K Lee.(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 07/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE re: Notification To Parties to Agency Proceeding by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Curtin, Victoria) (Entered: 05/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Michelle K Lee. (ALS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10465456. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-01053-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wireless Science LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC, Wireless Science LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10465456 filed by Helferich Patent Licensing LLC, Wireless Science LLC. (Submitted by Victoria Curtin) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ALS) (Entered: 05/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.