This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 02:19:07 (UTC).

Hebron et al v. Directv, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2014 Hebron filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Directv, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable John W. Darrah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-08155

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable John W. Darrah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard Stroening

Brent Yancey

Anthony Harris

Rodney Meeley

Lonny Sampson

Terry Weatherman

Arlandis Bradford

David Kauchak

Larry Blanchard

Robert Hebron

Defendants

Multiband Corp.

Directv, LLC

Directsat USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan D O'Dell

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Ryan D. O'dell

Attorney at Stueve Siegel Hanson Llp

550 West C Street, Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Maureen Ann Salas

Attorney at Werman Salas P.C.

77 W. Washington, Suite 1402

Chicago, IL 60602

Todd C. Werts

Attorney at Lear Werts Llp

2003 W. Broadway, Ste. 107

Columbia, MO 65203

Douglas M. Werman

Attorney at Werman Salas P.C.

77 West Washington, Suite 1402

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Tiliakos

Attorney at Duane Morris Llp

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Christina J. Fletcher

Attorney at Duane Morris Llp

1540 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

Emily Louise Hussey

Attorney at Duane Morris, LLP

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Mark Albert Bradford

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Natalie F. Hrubos

Attorney at Duane Morris Llp

One Riverfront Plaza, 1037 Raymond Blvd, Suite 1800

Newark, NJ 07102

Elizabeth Bethea McRee

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601-1692

Elizabeth Diane Winiarski

Attorney at Jones Day (CH)

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Patricia J. Martin

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

211 Noth Broadway, Suite 1500

St. Louis, MO 63102

Colin D. Dougherty

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Alexa A Santora

Attorney at Fox Rothschild Llp

1030 15Th St Nw, Suite 380E

Washington, DC 20005

Emily G Rottier

Attorney at Butler Rubin Saltarelli & Boyd LLP

70 West Madison St., Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60602

Heather Kathreen Afra

Attorney at Butler Rubin Saltarelli & Boyd Llp

70 West Madison St., Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60602

Jason S Dubner

Attorney at Butler Rubin Saltarelli & Boyd LLP

Three First National Plaza, 70 West Madison Suite 1800

Chicago, IL 60602

Zachary P Arbitman

Attorney at Fox Rothschild,llp

Po Box 3001, 10 Sentry Pkwy, Suite 200

Blue Bel, PA 19422

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#97

#98

#99

#100

#101

#102

#103

#104

#105

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/13/2015.Mailed notice(rm, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum opinion and order, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [ 62 , 76 ] are granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Count Iare granted without prejudice except as to Plaintiffs Harris's and Meeley's overtime claims against DirectSat. Defendants Motions to Dismiss Count II are granted without prejudice. Defendants Motions to Dismiss Counts III and IV are granted without prejudice. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Count V are granted with prejudice. Plaintiffs may file, within thirty days of this Order, an amended complaint as to the allegations in Counts I, II, III, and IV, if they can do so in strict compliance with Rule 11. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 10/13/2015. Mailed notice(rm, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: Status hearing held and continued to 11/19/15 at 9:30 a.m. Opinion to follow. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE by Natalie F. Hrubos of Change of Address (Hrubos, Natalie) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John W. Darrah: The Court's 9/21/15 order is amended as follows: Status hearing/ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [62, 76] set for October 7, 2015 is reset to October 13, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's Conditional Motion to Seek Leave to Amend 88 set for September 23, 2015 is reset to October 13, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. No appearances necessary on September 23, 2015 or October 7, 2015. All other dates remain as scheduled. Mailed notice(maf) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) ORDER: Status hearing/ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 62 , 76 set for September 23, 2015 is reset to October 7, 2015 at 9:30 a.m. No appearances necessary on September 23, 2015. All other dates remain as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 9/21/2015. Mailed notice (jc, ) (Entered: 09/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER: Defendant DirecTV, LLC's Uncontested Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of 15 Pages 95 is granted. No appearances necessary on 8/11/2015. All other dates remain as scheduled. Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 7/28/2015. Mailed notice (jc, ) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) REPLY by Defendant Directv, LLC in Support of its Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Winiarski, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) REPLY by Defendant Directsat USA, LLC to motion to dismiss 62 , memorandum in opposition to motion, 87 in Support of its Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dougherty, Colin) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Diane Winiarski for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 95 before Honorable John W. Darrah on 8/11/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Winiarski, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10052833. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(O'dell, Ryan) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10052796. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hanson, George) (Entered: 11/12/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2014. Status hearing set for 12/16/2014 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/24/2014:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Directsat USA, LLC by Jonathan David Christman (Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Directsat USA, LLC by Colin D. Dougherty (Dougherty, Colin) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Directsat USA, LLC by Jason S Dubner (Dubner, Jason) (Entered: 10/23/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Larry Blanchard, Arlandis Bradford, Anthony Harris, Robert Hebron, David Kauchak, Rodney Meeley, Lonny Sampson, Richard Stroening, Aroldo Vaca, Terry Weatherman, Brent Yancey by Maureen Ann Salas (Salas, Maureen) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Larry Blanchard, Arlandis Bradford, Anthony Harris, Robert Hebron, David Kauchak, Rodney Meeley, Lonny Sampson, Richard Stroening, Aroldo Vaca, Terry Weatherman, Brent Yancey by Douglas M. Werman (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Rodney Meeley, Terry Weatherman, Arlandis Bradford, Lonny Sampson, Aroldo Vaca, Larry Blanchard, Richard Stroening, Anthony Harris, Robert Hebron, Brent Yancey, David Kauchak; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9970210.(Werman, Douglas) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DirectSat USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Multiband Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina J. Fletcher(Designation Retained)