This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 00:08:18 (UTC).

Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. ecoShuttle

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Hawk Technology Systems, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ecoShuttle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Michael H. Simon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-01979

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Michael H. Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hawk Technology Systems, LLC

Defendant

ecoShuttle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory J. Myers

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Ave. South, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Timothy S. DeJong

Attorney at Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter, PC

209 S.W. Oak Street, Fifth Floor

Portland, OR 97204

Defendant Attorney

Julianne Ross Davis

Attorney at Lane Powell, PC

601 Sw Second Avenue, Suite 2100

Portland, OR 97204-3158

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Gregory J. Myers (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: gjmyers. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#17

(#17) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

#16

(#16) MINUTES ORDER - The Court held a Rule 16 conference and adopted the deadlines and procedures set forth in the attached Order. Timothy S. DeJong present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Julianne Ross Davis present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bridget Montero. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#3

(#3) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory J. Myers . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4332235. Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#14

(#14) Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#7

(#7) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Myers for Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4332235 issued. Signed on 10/20/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) ORDER - Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 12 . Answer is due by 12/14/2015. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#12

(#12) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, 1 . Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to ecoShuttle. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#5

(#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/17/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/18/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 3/18/2016. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#9

(#9) Affidavit of Service of Complaint 1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 2 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac 3 , Summons 4 , Discovery order 5 , upon ecoShuttle served on 10/21/2015 Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) Modified entry to link to the other docket entries referenced on pleading as having been served on 10/28/2015 (jtj). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#6

(#6) Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Myers, Gregory) (Entered: 12/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTES ORDER - The Court held a Rule 16 conference and adopted the deadlines and procedures set forth in the attached Order. Timothy S. DeJong present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Julianne Ross Davis present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bridget Montero. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER - Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 12 . Answer is due by 12/14/2015. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, 1 . Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order - Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Appear or Otherwise Respond 10 . Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/23/2015. Setting a Rule 16 Conference is set for 12/15/2015 at 11:00AM in Portland, Courtroom 13B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, 1 . Filed by ecoShuttle. (Davis, Julianne) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Affidavit of Service of Complaint 1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 2 , Motion to Appear Pro Hac 3 , Summons 4 , Discovery order 5 , upon ecoShuttle served on 10/21/2015 Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) Modified entry to link to the other docket entries referenced on pleading as having been served on 10/28/2015 (jtj). (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Attorney Gregory J. Myers (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: gjmyers. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Myers for Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-4332235 issued. Signed on 10/20/2015 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/17/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/18/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 3/18/2016. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to ecoShuttle. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory J. Myers . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4332235. Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (DeJong, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4331897 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: RE43,462 E--6/12/2012--Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. Filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC against ecoShuttle (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (DeJong, Timothy) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.