This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 08:40:00 (UTC).

Haswood et al v. American Polygraph Association et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2014 Haswood filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against American Polygraph Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bradley Ledford

Nancy Farran

Unknown Parties

Elie Lahhoud

Kelley L Bradbury

Melanie Haswood

Dean Bausman

William Reynolds

Devin Brennan

Defendants

Mike Gougler

Charles Slupski

American Polygraph Association

Robert Peters

Pam Shaw

Raymond Nelson

Walt Goodson

Robbie S Bennett

Roy Ortiz

Vickie T Murphy-Carr

Donald Krapohl

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Wayne Rorex

Attorney at Law Office of Barry W Rorex PLC

177 N Church Ave., Ste. 1100

Tucson, AZ 85701

Defendant Attorneys

James Gary Linder

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Whitney M Harvey

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 800

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2014
  • (#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Wayne Rorex on behalf of Dean Bausman, Morgan M Block, Kelley L Bradbury, Devin Brennan, Nancy Farran, Brian Gilmore, Melanie Haswood, Elie Lahhoud, Bradley Ledford, William Reynolds, Timothy Roberts, Dan Thomas, Unknown Parties. (Rorex, Barry) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • (#46) AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION filed by Dean Bausman, Morgan M Block, Kelley L Bradbury, Devin Brennan, Nancy Farran, Brian Gilmore, Melanie Haswood, Elie Lahhoud, Bradley Ledford, William Reynolds, Timothy Roberts, Dan Thomas: Service by Publication upon Robert Peters. Last publication date 8/28/2014. (LSP) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • (#45) AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION filed by Dean Bausman, Kelley L Bradbury, Devin Brennan, Nancy Farran, Brian Gilmore, Melanie Haswood, Elie Lahhoud, Bradley Ledford, William Reynolds, Timothy Roberts, Dan Thomas: Service by Publication upon Roy Ortiz. Last publication date 8/28/2014. (LSP) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • (#44) ORDER granting 43 Defendants American Polygraph Association, Barry Cushman, Charles Slupski, Pam Shaw, George Baranowski, Robert Peters, Walt Goodson, Jamie McCloughan, Raymond Nelson, Mike Goughler, Vickie T. Murphy-Carr, Chad Russell, Donald Krapohl and Donnie Dutton's ("APA Defendants") Motion for Extension of Time. APA Defendants shall have to and including September 2, 2014 in which to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/4/2014.(KFZ) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • (#43) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint by American Polygraph Association, George Baranowski, Barry Cushman, Donnie Dutton, Walt Goodson, Mike Gougler, Donald Krapohl, Jamie McCloughan, Vickie T Murphy-Carr, Raymond Nelson, Robert Peters, Chad Russell, Pam Shaw, Charles Slupski. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Extension of Time)(Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • (#42) NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney M Harvey on behalf of American Polygraph Association, George Baranowski, Barry Cushman, Donnie Dutton, Walt Goodson, Mike Gougler, Donald Krapohl, Jamie McCloughan, Vickie T Murphy-Carr, Raymond Nelson, Robert Peters, Chad Russell, Pam Shaw, Charles Slupski. (Harvey, Whitney) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • (#41) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by William Reynolds. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (LFIG) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • (#40) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Devin Brennan. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (LFIG) (Entered: 07/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • (#39) ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 38 Motion to serve the Defendants Roy Ortiz and Robert Peters by the alternate means of Service by Publication; or in the alternative, ORDERED granting the Plaintiffs additional time to effectuate personal service on Defendants Roy Ortiz and Robert Peters only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED extending the service deadline to and including August 8, 2014. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/29/2014.(LFIG) (Entered: 07/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • (#38) MOTION For Alternate Service of Defendants Ortiz and Peters by Dean Bausman, Morgan M Block, Kelley L Bradbury, Devin Brennan, Nancy Farran, Brian Gilmore, Melanie Haswood, Elie Lahhoud, Bradley Ledford, William Reynolds, Timothy Roberts, Dan Thomas. (KMG) (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#10) *RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 4 Order by Plaintiffs Dean Bausman, Morgan M Block, Kelley L Bradbury, Devin Brennan, Nancy Farran, Brian Gilmore, Melanie Haswood, Elie Lahhoud, Bradley Ledford, William Reynolds, Timothy Roberts, Dan Thomas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit)(KMG) *Document indicates the wrong case number on 7/9/2014 (KMG). (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • (#9) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Melanie Haswood. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (KMG) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • (#8) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Dan Thomas. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (KMG) (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Timothy Roberts: 4428 E Mustang Dr, Eloy, AZ 85131. (KMG) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • (#6) REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Kelley L Bradbury. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (KMG) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PARTY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kelley L Bradbury: 4428 E Mustang Dr., Eloy, AZ 85131. (KMG) (Entered: 07/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • (#4) ORDER that this matter will be dismissed 14 days from the date of this Order if Plaintiffs fail to show good cause before that date his failure to serve the Summons and Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter 14 days from the date of this Order if Plaintiffs fail to respond to this Order within the time stated, and without further notice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/20/2014. (KMG) (Entered: 06/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2014
  • (#3) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/12/2014. (KFZ) (Entered: 02/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX142879. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge G. Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-00253-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX142879 filed by Morgan M Block, Nancy Farran, Brian Gilmore, Melanie Haswood, Unknown Parties, William Reynolds, Elie Lahhoud, Kelley L Bradbury, Dan Thomas, Devin Brennan, Bradley Ledford, Timothy Roberts, Dean Bausman.(BAS) (Entered: 02/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.