This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 01:56:05 (UTC).

Hasan v. Navient Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2014 Hasan filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Navient Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-14196

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Leo T. Sorokin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Syed K. Hasan

Boston, MA 02126

Defendant

Navient Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louis S. Haskell

Attorney at Law Office of Louis S. Haskell

16 Pine Street

Lowell, MA 01851

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea C. Kramer

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP

24 Federal Street, 12Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02110

John T. Graff

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein, LLP

24 Federal Street, 12Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Navient Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5285852 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Graff, John) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Graff on behalf of Navient Solutions, Inc. (Graff, John) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#4

(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Syed K. Hasan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Montes, Mariliz) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/5/2014) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2014: # 2 Remand originally filed but not signed) Modified on 12/5/2014 to replace Motion to Remand with a signed version. Original has been added as an attachment. (Montes, Mariliz). (Entered: 11/21/2014)

#6

(#6) Set Deadline: 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Responses due 12/5/2014. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

#7

(#7) ADDENDUM re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. filed by Syed K. Hasan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

#8

(#8) Opposition re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Graff, John) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

#9

(#9) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND entered. Accordingly, the Motion to Remand is DENIED. Defendants request for fees and costs is DENIED. The Court will hold a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2015, at 2:30 P.M., in courtroom 13. Plaintiff shall appear in person at the conference. re 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. mailed first class certified mail #1387 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

#35

(#35) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff's Motion to Continue his Deposition (#31) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If an attorney has agreed to represent Plaintiff at his deposition and this attorney wishes to continue the date of the deposition, then this attorney shall file a motion with the Court. Alternatively, such counsel may reach an agreement with defense counsel to a revised and definite date provided such date is provides for a prompt deposition. Upon such an agreement to an extension to, for example, July, the Court would entertain a motion to revise the governing schedule to the extent necessary. As the matter presently stands, Plaintiff shall appear for his deposition. denying 31 Motion for Extension of Time. A copy of the Order has been mailed to the Plaintiff by first class and certified mail (Ref# 1639). (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#36

(#36) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Limited Appearance by Syed K. Hasan. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Limited Appearance)(Haskell, Louis) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

#37

(#37) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 24, 2015 to permit Defendant to take the deposition of Plaintiff by Navient Solutions, Inc..(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

#38

(#38) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered The Motion for a Limited Appearance 36 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as neither the plaintiff nor counsel have explained how counsel will represent the Plaintiff for some purposes but not others including, for example, how the defense counsel (or the Court) will know when they may contact plaintiff directly and when they may not. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

#39

(#39) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 37 Defendant's Consented To Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deposition to permit Defendant to take the deposition of Plaintiff on or before July 24, 2015. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrea C. Kramer (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

#41

(#41) MOTION for Reconsideration re 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Limited Appearance by Syed K. Hasan.(Haskell, Louis) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#42

(#42) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED for the purpose of the deposition; Plaintiff is pro se for all other purposes. Only counsel may assert objections at the deposition. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

#43

(#43) Copy of 42 Order on Motion for Reconsideration mailed to Plaintiff on 6/24/2015. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Copy of 42 Order on Motion for Reconsideration mailed to Plaintiff on 6/24/2015. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED for the purpose of the deposition; Plaintiff is pro se for all other purposes. Only counsel may assert objections at the deposition. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Reconsideration re 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Limited Appearance by Syed K. Hasan.(Haskell, Louis) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrea C. Kramer (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 37 Defendant's Consented To Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deposition to permit Defendant to take the deposition of Plaintiff on or before July 24, 2015. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered The Motion for a Limited Appearance 36 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as neither the plaintiff nor counsel have explained how counsel will represent the Plaintiff for some purposes but not others including, for example, how the defense counsel (or the Court) will know when they may contact plaintiff directly and when they may not. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to July 24, 2015 to permit Defendant to take the deposition of Plaintiff by Navient Solutions, Inc..(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Limited Appearance by Syed K. Hasan. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Limited Appearance)(Haskell, Louis) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff's Motion to Continue his Deposition (#31) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If an attorney has agreed to represent Plaintiff at his deposition and this attorney wishes to continue the date of the deposition, then this attorney shall file a motion with the Court. Alternatively, such counsel may reach an agreement with defense counsel to a revised and definite date provided such date is provides for a prompt deposition. Upon such an agreement to an extension to, for example, July, the Court would entertain a motion to revise the governing schedule to the extent necessary. As the matter presently stands, Plaintiff shall appear for his deposition. denying 31 Motion for Extension of Time. A copy of the Order has been mailed to the Plaintiff by first class and certified mail (Ref# 1639). (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/17/2015 to conduct Plaintiff's deposition filed by Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. A Scheduling Conference has been set for 1/12/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: # 1 Scheduling order)(Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND entered. Accordingly, the Motion to Remand is DENIED. Defendants request for fees and costs is DENIED. The Court will hold a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2015, at 2:30 P.M., in courtroom 13. Plaintiff shall appear in person at the conference. re 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. mailed first class certified mail #1387 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 12/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Opposition re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Navient Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Graff, John) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ADDENDUM re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. filed by Syed K. Hasan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Set Deadline: 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Responses due 12/5/2014. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 11/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Syed K. Hasan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Montes, Mariliz) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/5/2014) (Montes, Mariliz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2014: # 2 Remand originally filed but not signed) Modified on 12/5/2014 to replace Motion to Remand with a signed version. Original has been added as an attachment. (Montes, Mariliz). (Entered: 11/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Graff on behalf of Navient Solutions, Inc. (Graff, John) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Navient Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5285852 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Form)(Graff, John) (Entered: 11/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.