This case was last updated from PACER on 06/02/2016 at 08:17:00 (UTC).

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2015 HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES and JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES

Judge

JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CARL OWENS

WANDA A OWENS

SUSAN P CLARK

ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC

CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC

SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC

JAMES A CLARK

ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEVEN JAMES KYLE

Attorney at BOVIS KYLE BURCH ETC LLC - ATLANTA GA

200 Ashford Ctr N, Ste 500

Atlanta, GA 30338

DAVID ALLEN HARRIS

Attorney at BOVIS KYLE BURCH ETC LLC - ATLANTA GA

200 Ashford Ctr N, Ste 500

Atlanta, GA 30338

Defendant Attorneys

JOEL STEVEN CARTER

Attorney at HENRY BUCHANAN HUDSON ETC - TALLAHASSEE FL

2508 Barrington Cir

Tallahassee, FL 32308

KATHRYN MICHELLE TAGERT

Attorney at BLANKENSHIP JORDAN PA - CHIPLEY FL

1512 Hwy 90

Chipley, FL 32428

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jem) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Amended Summons by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY re 1 Complaint,, (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Reissued as to CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC. (jem) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL STEVEN CARTER on behalf of JAMES A CLARK, SUSAN P CLARK, CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC (CARTER, JOEL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by JAMES A CLARK, SUSAN P CLARK, CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC. (CARTER, JOEL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN MICHELLE TAGERT on behalf of CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC (TAGERT, KATHRYN) (Entered: 09/07/2015)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC. (TAGERT, KATHRYN) (Entered: 09/07/2015)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. JAMES A CLARK served on 8/17/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. SUSAN P CLARK served on 8/17/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC served on 8/15/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#17

(#17) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/14/2015. (Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2015. Discovery due by 1/6/2016.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. The unopposed motion, ECF No. 9 , of the defendants Carl Owens, Wanda A. Owens, and Southern Way Realty, Inc., to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. The deadline is extended to 9/28/2015. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/14/2015. (jem) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Insurance Services Group for HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#20

(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC. (CARTER, JOEL) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#21

(#21) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Clark Insurance Services, Inc. on 8/31/15, filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ALLEN HARRIS on behalf of HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (HARRIS, DAVID) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ALLEN HARRIS on behalf of HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (HARRIS, DAVID) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Clark Insurance Services, Inc. on 8/31/15, filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 10/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC. (CARTER, JOEL) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Insurance Services Group for HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. The unopposed motion, ECF No. 9 , of the defendants Carl Owens, Wanda A. Owens, and Southern Way Realty, Inc., to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. The deadline is extended to 9/28/2015. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/14/2015. (jem) (Entered: 09/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/14/2015. (Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2015. Discovery due by 1/6/2016.) (jcw) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC served on 8/15/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. SUSAN P CLARK served on 8/17/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. JAMES A CLARK served on 8/17/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. WANDA A OWENS served on 8/15/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC served on 8/17/2015, answer due 9/8/2015. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC. (TAGERT, KATHRYN) (Entered: 09/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHRYN MICHELLE TAGERT on behalf of CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC (TAGERT, KATHRYN) (Entered: 09/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by JAMES A CLARK, SUSAN P CLARK, CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC. (CARTER, JOEL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL STEVEN CARTER on behalf of JAMES A CLARK, SUSAN P CLARK, CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, CARL OWENS, WANDA A OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC (CARTER, JOEL) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Reissued as to CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC. (jem) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE Amended Summons by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY re 1 Complaint,, (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jem) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JAMES A CLARK, SUSAN P CLARK, CLARK INSURANCE SERVICES INC, ENOLA AVIATION & DEVELOPMENT LLC, ENOLA CONTRACTING SERVICES INC, CARL OWENS, WANDA OWENS, SOUTHERN WAY REALTY INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1129-3333753.), filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. A, # 2 Exh. B, # 3 Summons - Enola Contracting, # 4 Summons - Enola Aviation, # 5 Summons - Carl Owens, # 6 Summons - Wanda Owens, # 7 Summons - James Clark, # 8 Summons - Susan Clark, # 9 Summons - Clark Ins Svs, # 10 Summons - Southern Way Realty) (KYLE, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less