This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 00:19:49 (UTC).

Harris v. R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company

Case Summary

On 09/08/2015 Harris filed an Other lawsuit against R J Reynolds Vapor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-04075

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerod Harris

Defendant

R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Burke

Attorney at Scott + Scott LLP

707 Broadway, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

John Jasnoch

Attorney at Scott + Scott LLP

707 Broadway, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

Troy Erik Terpening

Attorney at Scott and Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

707 Broadway, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

Abigail Dana Blodgett

Attorney at Lexington law Group

503 Divisadero Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Donna F Solen

Attorney at Lexington Law Group

503 Divisidero Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Yifan Kate Lv

Attorney at Scott and Scott, Attorneys at Law, LLP

707 Broadway, Suite 1000

San Diego, CA 92101

Joseph P. Guglielmo

Attorney at Scott & Scott LLP

405 Lexington Avenue, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10174

Mark N. Todzo

Attorney at Lexington Law Group, LLP

503 Divisadero Street

San Francisco, CA 94117

Erin Green Comite

Attorney at Scott & Scott, LLP

156 South Main Street

Colchester, CT 06415

Defendant Attorneys

Bailey J. Langner

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr.

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Cheryl A. Sabnis

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard A. Schneider

Attorney at King Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jerod Harris.. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2015) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING PROPER VENUE PURSUAN TO CAL. CIVIL CODE 1780(d) by Jerod Harris. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2015) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerod Harris (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

#45

(#45) REPLY (re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ) filed byR.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#46

(#46) OBJECTIONS to re 34 Request for Judicial Notice, of Two Documents in Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#47

(#47) NOTICE by Jerod Harris re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Revised Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 2/16/2016) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

#48

(#48) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/17/2016) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

#49

(#49) CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#50

(#50) CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#51

(#51) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference and Motion hearing held on 3/2/2016. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

#52

(#52) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Langner, Bailey) (Filed on 3/3/2016) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

#53

(#53) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Jerod Harris for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2016) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Jerod Harris for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2016) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Langner, Bailey) (Filed on 3/3/2016) (Entered: 03/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference and Motion hearing held on 3/2/2016. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/17/2016) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) NOTICE by Jerod Harris re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Revised Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 2/16/2016) (Entered: 02/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) OBJECTIONS to re 34 Request for Judicial Notice, of Two Documents in Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) REPLY (re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ) filed byR.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/5/2016) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. Responses due by 1/29/2016. Replies due by 2/5/2016. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl A. Sabnis (Sabnis, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/7/2015) (Entered: 10/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jerod Harris (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING PROPER VENUE PURSUAN TO CAL. CIVIL CODE 1780(d) by Jerod Harris. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2015) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jerod Harris.. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2015) (Entered: 09/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-9816758.). Filed by Jerod Harris. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/8/2015) Modified on 9/9/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less