This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 06:36:45 (UTC).

Harman v. MRS Associates Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2014 Harman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against MRS Associates Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge G Murray Snow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00985

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Harman

Defendants

MRS Associates Incorporated

Unknown Parties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Trinette G Kent

Attorney at Kent Law Offices

10645 N Tatum Blvd., Ste. 200-192

Phoenix, AZ 85028

Defendant Attorney

Damian Patrick Richard

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel LLP

1545 Hotel Circle S, Ste. 150

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10434633 filed by Fred Harman. (submitted by Trinette Kent) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Fred Harman. (submitted by Trinette Kent) (REK) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10434633. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Mark E. Aspey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-00985-PHX-MEA. Magistrate Election form attached.. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to MRS Associates Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#5

(#5) ORDER that Plaintiff Fred Harman shall execute and file within 14 days of the entry of this order his written election to either consent to the exercise of jurisdiction over this matter by a magistrate judge or a written election to have this case reassigned to a United States district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 5/8/14. (MAP) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

#6

(#6) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by MRS Associates Incorporated.(Richard, Damian) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS Associates Incorporated. (Richard, Damian) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

#9

(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Fred Harman: Return of Service re: Summons upon MRS Associates, Inc. on 05/21/2014. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal: This matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/22/14. (LSP) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fred Harman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

#19

(#19) ORDER that this matter will be, without further Order of this Court, dismissed with prejudice within 60 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating any pending hearings; denying all pending motions as moot; directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on September 23, 2014 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/25/2014. (ALS) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Fred Harman. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#17

(#17) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

#16

(#16) ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference for 8/8/2014 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/3/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

#15

(#15) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) that have not yet appeared and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/3/2014. (ALS) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-14-985-PHX-GMS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause deadline is hereby vacated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

#13

(#13) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal: This matter is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and without costs to any party. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/22/14. (LSP) (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fred Harman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 08/20/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER that this matter will be, without further Order of this Court, dismissed with prejudice within 60 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating any pending hearings; denying all pending motions as moot; directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on September 23, 2014 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/25/2014. (ALS) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Fred Harman. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Setting Rule 16 Case Management Conference for 8/8/2014 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/3/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) that have not yet appeared and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/3/2014. (ALS) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-14-985-PHX-GMS. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause deadline is hereby vacated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - That Defendant shall show cause in writing on or before July 18, 2014, why they should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply with the Court's prior order. If Defendant properly complies with the Court's June 11, 2014, order on or before July 18, 2014, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a district judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 7/2/14. (MAP) (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to MRS Associates Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Fred Harman: Return of Service re: Summons upon MRS Associates, Inc. on 05/21/2014. (Kent, Trinette) (Entered: 06/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS Associates Incorporated. (Richard, Damian) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by MRS Associates Incorporated.(Richard, Damian) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 05/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER that Plaintiff Fred Harman shall execute and file within 14 days of the entry of this order his written election to either consent to the exercise of jurisdiction over this matter by a magistrate judge or a written election to have this case reassigned to a United States district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 5/8/14. (MAP) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to MRS Associates Incorporated. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10434633. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Mark E. Aspey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-14-00985-PHX-MEA. Magistrate Election form attached.. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Fred Harman. (submitted by Trinette Kent) (REK) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10434633 filed by Fred Harman. (submitted by Trinette Kent) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK) (Entered: 05/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.