This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 11:01:28 (UTC).

Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC v. Google Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Google Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero (Settlement) and Hon. Vince Chhabria. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-03065

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero (Settlement)

Judge

Hon. Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC

Defendant

Google Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stevenson Moore, V

Attorney at Ni, Wang and Associates, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Ln., Ste 310

Dallas, TX 75231

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Law Firm, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Ste 310

Dallas, TX 75231

Kris S. LeFan

Attorney at Lowe & Associates, P.C.

11400 Olympic Blvd., Suite 640

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Timothy Tiewei Wang

Attorney at Ni, Wang and Associates, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill, Ste 310

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey James Toney

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP

Two Midtown Plaza, Suite 1500, 1349 West Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Heather S. Kim

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

John W Downing

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP - Redwood Shores

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Marcus Alan Barber

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, Friedman LLP

1349 W. Peachtree Street, N.W., Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Jonathan Keith Waldrop

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres & Friedman LLP - Atlanta

1349 W Peachtree Street, Nw, Suite 1500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Robert Perry Watkins, III

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres and Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Michael Edwin Jones

Attorney at Potter Minton PC

110 N College, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Jonathan K. Waldrop

Attorney at Kasowitz Benson Torres and Friedman LLP

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 200

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Darcy Lachelle Jones

Attorney at Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman LLP

1349 Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4985831.), filed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Tiewei Wang on behalf of Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC (Wang, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

#7

(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

#8

(#8) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-6. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/21/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC. for Google Inc. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

#39

(#39) Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#38

(#38) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE date of 10/28/15 at 9;30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#37

(#37) Letter from Plaintiff Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC and Defendant Google Inc. regarding settlement to Judge Spero. (Ni, Hao) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#36

(#36) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC. (Ni, Hao) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#35

(#35) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero on 10/13/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

#34

(#34) Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#33

(#33) Notice of Settlement Conference & Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference as to Hall v. DropBox (15-cv-3064 VC) is set for 10/21/15 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Settlement conference as to Hall v. Google (15-cv-3065 VC) is set for 10/28/15 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/10/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

#32

(#32) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephonic Scheduling/Settlement Conference held on 9/9/2015. Parties advised the Court that Hall v. Box (15-cv-3063 VC) has settled. Settlement conference for Hall v. Dropbox (15-cv-3064 VC) set for 10/21/15 at 9:30 AM. Settlement conference for Hall v. Google (15-cv-3065 VC) set for 10/28/15 at 9:30 AM. Parties shall exchange offers and meet in person by 10/9/15. Settlement conference statements for 15-cv-3064 VC and 15-cv-3065 VC due by 10/14/15. FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

#31

(#31) CLERK'S NOTICE Telephonic Scheduling/ Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE date of 10/28/15 at 9;30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Letter from Plaintiff Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC and Defendant Google Inc. regarding settlement to Judge Spero. (Ni, Hao) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal filed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC. (Ni, Hao) (Filed on 10/19/2015) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero on 10/13/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015) (Entered: 10/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc.. (Waldrop, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Notice of Settlement Conference & Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference as to Hall v. DropBox (15-cv-3064 VC) is set for 10/21/15 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Settlement conference as to Hall v. Google (15-cv-3065 VC) is set for 10/28/15 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/10/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015) (Entered: 09/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephonic Scheduling/Settlement Conference held on 9/9/2015. Parties advised the Court that Hall v. Box (15-cv-3063 VC) has settled. Settlement conference for Hall v. Dropbox (15-cv-3064 VC) set for 10/21/15 at 9:30 AM. Settlement conference for Hall v. Google (15-cv-3065 VC) set for 10/28/15 at 9:30 AM. Parties shall exchange offers and meet in person by 10/9/15. Settlement conference statements for 15-cv-3064 VC and 15-cv-3065 VC due by 10/14/15. FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) CLERK'S NOTICE Telephonic Scheduling/ Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/28/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015) (Entered: 08/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Change Venue by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Aamir Kazi Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer, # 2 Ex A - SBOT Daniel Wayne Son, # 3 Ex B - SBOT Simon L, # 4 Ex C - 784308, # 5 Ex D - Assignment Search_ 6539401, # 6 Ex E - Reel 034687 Frame 0348, # 7 Ex F - SE Hall Art of Incorporation, # 8 Ex G - SE Hall Cert of Change of Registered Office, # 9 Ex H - SE Hall 2015 Corp Record, # 10 Ex I - MMCA - Mini_Micro Computer Applications, INC, # 11 Ex J - PersonalWeb D101, # 12 Ex K - Oracle paragraph 1, # 13 Ex L - www.oracle.com timeline, # 14 Ex M - www.indiana.edu, # 15 Ex N - Tandem paragraph 3, # 16 Ex O - Mosher Article, # 17 Ex P - TDF article index with Mosher, # 18 Ex Q - Sybase paragraph 4, # 19 Ex R - Sybase paragraph 6-1, # 20 Ex S - Sybase paragraph 6-2, # 21 Ex T - Sybase paragraph 6-3, # 22 Ex U - Oracle's symmetric replication technology and implications for application design, # 23 Ex V - Peter S Lim Linkedin, # 24 David Nickels Declaration ISO Mtn to Transfer, # 25 Jennifer Ceran Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer, # 26 Michael Jaynes Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer, # 27 Sean Li Declaration ISO Motion to Transfer, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC. for Google Inc. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-6. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/21/2015. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Tiewei Wang on behalf of Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC (Wang, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc. (nkl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC (Moore, Stevenson) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4985831.), filed by Hall Data Sync Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less