This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:58:31 (UTC).

Hagopian v. Seattle et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2015 Hagopian filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Seattle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01055

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Hagopian

Defendants

Jane Doe

Chief of Police Kathleen O'Toole

Kathleen O'Toole

Seattle Police Department

jane doe Officer

City of Seattle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Bible

Attorney at James Bible Law Group

14205 Se 36Th Street Suite 100

Bellevue, WA 98006

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Thomas Myerberg

Attorney at SEATTLE CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2050

Seattle, WA 98104-7097

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4070154) Attorney James Bible added to party Jesse Hagopian(pty:pla), filed by Jesse Hagopian.(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#2

(#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and summons by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#6

(#6) WRONG DOCUMENT POSTED; DISREGARD THIS FILING. Letter from Clerk to Plaintiff advising of case number and judge assignment. (DJ) Modified on 6/30/2015 (DJ). (Entered: 06/30/2015)

7 #1

Summons

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to defendant(s) City of Seattle. (MD) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Jane Doe Police Officer. (MD) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Kathleen O'Toole. (MD) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and summons by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#4

(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and summons by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian. (Bible, James) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

7 #3

Summons

7 #2

Summons

#7

No Description Available

#12

(#12) ANSWER to 1 Complaint Defendants City of Seattle and The Seattle Police Department's Answer to the Complaint & Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND Attorney Andrew Thomas Myerberg added to party City of Seattle(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Thomas Myerberg added to party Seattle Police Department(pty:dft) by City of Seattle, Seattle Police Department.(Myerberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Thomas Myerberg on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Police Department. (Myerberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Myerberg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 10/17/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2015, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/21/2016, Motions due by 4/20/2016, Discovery completed by 5/20/2016, Dispositive motions due by 6/20/2016, Motions in Limine due by 9/12/2016, Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2016, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/5/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/5/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 10/17/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14206 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2015, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/21/2016, Motions due by 4/20/2016, Discovery completed by 5/20/2016, Dispositive motions due by 6/20/2016, Motions in Limine due by 9/12/2016, Pretrial Order due by 10/5/2016, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/5/2016, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/5/2016, Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 09/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. (Myerberg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Thomas Myerberg on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Police Department. (Myerberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to 1 Complaint Defendants City of Seattle and The Seattle Police Department's Answer to the Complaint & Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND Attorney Andrew Thomas Myerberg added to party City of Seattle(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Thomas Myerberg added to party Seattle Police Department(pty:dft) by City of Seattle, Seattle Police Department.(Myerberg, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2015, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/24/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/31/2015, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Kathleen O'Toole. (MD) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Jane Doe Police Officer. (MD) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to defendant(s) City of Seattle. (MD) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WRONG DOCUMENT POSTED; DISREGARD THIS FILING. Letter from Clerk to Plaintiff advising of case number and judge assignment. (DJ) Modified on 6/30/2015 (DJ). (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian. (Bible, James) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and summons by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and summons by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS and summons by Plaintiff Jesse Hagopian (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4070154) Attorney James Bible added to party Jesse Hagopian(pty:pla), filed by Jesse Hagopian.(Bible, James) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less