This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2016 at 00:09:22 (UTC).

Gyorke-Takatri et al v. Nestle USA, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2015 Gyorke-Takatri filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Nestle USA, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-03702

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Katie Silver

Michelle Gyorke-Takatri

Defendants

Nestle USA, Inc

Gerber Products Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Joseph Zevin

Attorney at Stanley Law Group

10021 Willow Creek Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92131

John Roddy

Attorney at Bailey & Glasser LLP

125 Summer Street, 10Th Floor, Suite 1030

Boston, MA 02110

Stephen Henry Gardner

Attorney at Stanley Law Group

6116 N. Central Expy, Ste. 1500

Dallas, TX 75206

Elizabeth Ryan

Attorney at Bailey and Glasser LLP

125 Summer Street, 10Th Floor, Suite 1030

Boston, MA 02110

Amanda Marie Howell

Attorney at Stanley Law Group

6116 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75206

John J Roddy

Attorney at Bailey and Glasser LLP

99 High Street, Suite 304

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant Attorneys

Arash V Sadat

Attorney at White & Case LLP

Rachel J Feldman

Attorney at White and Case LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bryan Alexander Merryman

Attorney at White & Case LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; No Process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 15-546850. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-9756165). Filed by Gerber Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#2

(#2) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#5

(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#6

(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Gerber Products Company . (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#8

(#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant Gerber Products Company to Respond to Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Gerber Products Company. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/17/2015) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#51

(#51) ORDER of USCA: The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) is denied. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#50

(#50) Acknowledgment Receipt from San Francisco County Superior Court re remand order, docket entries. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

#49

(#49) USCA Case Number 15-80192 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

#48

(#48) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING MOTIONS FOR STAY, LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, AND TO SHORTEN TIME AS MOOT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 44 Motion to Stay; denying 45 Motion to Shorten Time (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#47

(#47) RESPONSE (re 45 MOTION to Shorten Time ON MOTION TO: (1) STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER; (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; (3) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO STAY ENTRY ) filed byMichelle Gyorke-Takatri, Katie Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Roddy)(Roddy, John) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#46

(#46) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerber Products Company re 45 MOTION to Shorten Time ON MOTION TO: (1) STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER; (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; AND (3) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO STAY ENTRY AND E, 44 MOTION to Stay re 42 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION TO STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REMAND ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO DETERMINING THE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

#45

(#45) MOTION to Shorten Time ON MOTION TO: (1) STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER; (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; (3) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO STAY ENTRY; DECLARATION OF RACHEL J. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT filed by Gerber Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Rachel J. Feldman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#44

(#44) MOTION to (1) Stay Entry and Effect of re 42 Order on Motion to Remand, (2) For Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Remand Order, (3) For Leave to Submit Additional Evidence Relevant to Determining the Amount in Controversy filed by Gerber Products Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/24/2015. Replies due by 12/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#43

(#43) Clerk's Letter to San Francisco County Superior Court re remanding case. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER of USCA: The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1453(c) is denied. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) Acknowledgment Receipt from San Francisco County Superior Court re remand order, docket entries. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) USCA Case Number 15-80192 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING MOTIONS FOR STAY, LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, AND TO SHORTEN TIME AS MOOT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 44 Motion to Stay; denying 45 Motion to Shorten Time (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) RESPONSE (re 45 MOTION to Shorten Time ON MOTION TO: (1) STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER; (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; (3) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO STAY ENTRY ) filed byMichelle Gyorke-Takatri, Katie Silver. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Roddy)(Roddy, John) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerber Products Company re 45 MOTION to Shorten Time ON MOTION TO: (1) STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER; (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; AND (3) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO STAY ENTRY AND E, 44 MOTION to Stay re 42 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Remand,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, MOTION TO STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REMAND ORDER AND FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO DETERMINING THE AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 11/10/2015) (Entered: 11/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION to Shorten Time ON MOTION TO: (1) STAY ENTRY AND EFFECT OF REMAND ORDER; (2) FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; (3) FOR LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME ON MOTION TO STAY ENTRY; DECLARATION OF RACHEL J. FELDMAN IN SUPPORT filed by Gerber Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Rachel J. Feldman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION to (1) Stay Entry and Effect of re 42 Order on Motion to Remand, (2) For Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Remand Order, (3) For Leave to Submit Additional Evidence Relevant to Determining the Amount in Controversy filed by Gerber Products Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 11/24/2015. Replies due by 12/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Clerk's Letter to San Francisco County Superior Court re remanding case. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Remand; granting 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Exhibit A to the Levitan Declaration is ORDERED SEALED. The hearing set for November 17, 2015 is hereby VACATED. This action is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015) (Entered: 11/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerber Products Company re 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant Gerber Products Company to Respond to Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/17/2015) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant Gerber Products Company to Respond to Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss filed by Gerber Products Company. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/17/2015) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Civil Cover Sheet by Gerber Products Company . (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Gerber Products Company re 1 Notice of Removal. (Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; No Process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 15-546850. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-9756165). Filed by Gerber Products Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Merryman, Bryan) (Filed on 8/13/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.