This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:54:34 (UTC).

Guzzo et al v. Wyoming Governor et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2014 Guzzo filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Wyoming Governor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Honorable Scott W Skavdahl and Honorable Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00200

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Honorable Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carl Oleson

Brie Barth

Shelly Montgomery

Rob Johnston

Wyoming Equality

Bonnie Robinson

Anne Marie Guzzo

Charles Killion

Ivan Williams

Defendants

Laramie County Clerk

Wyoming Human Resources Division Administrator

Wyoming Governor

Wyoming Department of Administration and Information Director

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arash Jahanian

Attorney at RATHOD MOHAMEDBHAI

1518 Blake Street

Denver, CO 80202

Christopher F Stoll

Attorney at NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS

870 Market Street, Suite 370

San Francisco, CA 94102

Thomas W Stoever

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-1370

Qusair Mohamedbhai

Attorney at RATHOD MOHAMEDBHAI

1518 Blake Street

Denver, CO 80202

Lincoln James Lyman

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

370 Seventeenth Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Shannon P Minter

Attorney at NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS

870 Market Street, Suite 370

San Francisco, CA 94102

Tracy L Zubrod

Attorney at ZUBROD LAW OFFICE

P O Box 81

Cheyenne, WY 28003-0081

Defendant Attorneys

Bernard P Haggerty

Attorney at Laramie County Attorney's Office

310 West 19Th Street, Suite 320

Cheyenne, WY 82001

Mark Towne Voss

Attorney at LARAMIE COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

310 West 19Th Street, Suite 320, P O Box 608

Cheyenne, WY 82003-0608

Martin L Hardsocg

Attorney at WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL

123 Capitol Building

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Peter K Michael

Attorney at WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

123 Capitol Building

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Ryan T Schelhaas

Attorney at WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

123 Capitol Building

Cheyenne, WY 82002

James C Kaste

Attorney at Wyoming Attorney General's Office

2320 Capitol Avenue

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Michael M Robinson

Attorney at WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

123 Capitol Building

Cheyenne, WY 82002

Jared Scott Crecelius

Attorney at BAILEY STOCK & HARMON PC

Po Box 1557

Cheyenne, WY 82003-1557

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (four summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY020391.) filed by Shelly Montgomery, Bonnie Robinson, Charles Killion, Brie Barth, Wyoming Equality, Rob Johnston, Anne Marie Guzzo, Carl Oleson, Ivan Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg) Text Modified on 10/7/2014 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 10/07/2014)

#2

(#2) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality, four (4) issued. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 10/07/2014)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Wyoming Governor served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Wyoming Department of Administration and Information Director served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Wyoming Human Resources Division Administrator served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Laramie County Clerk served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for L. James Lyman to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting 8 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting L. James Lyman for Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams and Wyoming Equality by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

#87

(#87) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl; The Court is in receipt of a check from Laramie County in the amount of $20.96, which the County asserts constitutes its share of costs that were previously ordered by the Court Docket entries 83 & 84 . The Court does not know how the County came to this calculation as the Court did not break down the order of costs by defendant. The Clerk of Court for the District of Wyoming shall return the amount of $20.96 to Laramie County. Laramie County should coordinate with the other parties to determine how the order of costs should be split and paid. Laramie County shall send the appropriate amount directly to the respective plaintiffs' attorney(s), not to this Court. If desired, Laramie County can file a Notice of Compliance after it pays the order of costs to serve as record of payment.(Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#86

(#86) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl; The Court is in receipt of a check from the Laramie County Clerk in the amount of $2,259.84. The Court previously ordered Defendant Laramie County to pay this amount as attorneys' fees. See docket entry 81 . In conformity with the Court's 81 Order Granting In Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, the Clerk of Court for the District of Wyoming shall distribute the amount paid by the Laramie County Clerk as follows: $1,731.84 to Arnold & Porter LLP, and $528.00 to Zubrod Law Office, PC.(Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

#85

(#85) E-FILING ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD. INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Motions filing deadline 1/18/2016. Motion response deadline 2/1/2016. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 2/17/2016 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Other Fact Witness Deadline 12/4/2015 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 10/5/2015. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 11/4/2015. Discovery due by 1/18/2016. Stipulation Deadline 2/25/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2016 01:00 PM in Judge Skavdahl Chambers (Room No. 210) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Jury Trial (5 Days/Stacked #1) set for 3/28/2016 09:30 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl.(Court Staff, szr) Modified on 5/15/2015 (Court Staff, szr). (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#84

(#84) CLERK'S Bill of Costs regarding 71 Bill of Costs and 78 Supplemental Bill of Costs, filed by Plaintiff Shelly Montgomery, Plaintiff Brie Barth, Plaintiff Anne Marie Guzzo, Plaintiff Wyoming Equality, Plaintiff Ivan Williams, Plaintiff Rob Johnston, Plaintiff Bonnie Robinson, Plaintiff Charles Killion, Plaintiff Carl Oleson. Plaintiffs awarded costs in the amount of $567.90. (Court Staff, srw) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#83

(#83) FILED IN ERROR - BILL OF COSTS filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Court Staff, srw) Modified on 5/8/2015 (Court Staff, srw). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#82

(#82) Supplemental RESPONSE to 78 Bill of Costs,, Supplement, filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Administration and Information Director, Wyoming Human Resources Division Administrator. (Schelhaas, Ryan) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

#81

(#81) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting in part 69 Motion for Attorney Fees. See Order for further detail. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#80

(#80) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl, providing leave for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' amended bill of costs. Pursuant to this Court's order 73 , Plaintiffs filed an amended bill of costs with supplemental documentation on March 25, 2015 78 . The amount requested in that amended bill of costs is different than the amount requested in Plaintiffs' first bill of costs 71 . Accordingly, Defendants may file a supplemental response to the amended bill of costs, if they deem it necessary, on or before April 10, 2015. Any award of costs will then be determined by the Clerk of Court's office in accordance with Local Rule 54.2.(Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

#79

(#79) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin denying 77 Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive) (Court Staff, sjgc) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl; The Court is in receipt of a check from Laramie County in the amount of $20.96, which the County asserts constitutes its share of costs that were previously ordered by the Court Docket entries 83 & 84 . The Court does not know how the County came to this calculation as the Court did not break down the order of costs by defendant. The Clerk of Court for the District of Wyoming shall return the amount of $20.96 to Laramie County. Laramie County should coordinate with the other parties to determine how the order of costs should be split and paid. Laramie County shall send the appropriate amount directly to the respective plaintiffs' attorney(s), not to this Court. If desired, Laramie County can file a Notice of Compliance after it pays the order of costs to serve as record of payment.(Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl; The Court is in receipt of a check from the Laramie County Clerk in the amount of $2,259.84. The Court previously ordered Defendant Laramie County to pay this amount as attorneys' fees. See docket entry 81 . In conformity with the Court's 81 Order Granting In Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, the Clerk of Court for the District of Wyoming shall distribute the amount paid by the Laramie County Clerk as follows: $1,731.84 to Arnold & Porter LLP, and $528.00 to Zubrod Law Office, PC.(Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) E-FILING ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD. INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Motions filing deadline 1/18/2016. Motion response deadline 2/1/2016. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 2/17/2016 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Other Fact Witness Deadline 12/4/2015 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 10/5/2015. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 11/4/2015. Discovery due by 1/18/2016. Stipulation Deadline 2/25/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2016 01:00 PM in Judge Skavdahl Chambers (Room No. 210) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Jury Trial (5 Days/Stacked #1) set for 3/28/2016 09:30 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl.(Court Staff, szr) Modified on 5/15/2015 (Court Staff, szr). (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) CLERK'S Bill of Costs regarding 71 Bill of Costs and 78 Supplemental Bill of Costs, filed by Plaintiff Shelly Montgomery, Plaintiff Brie Barth, Plaintiff Anne Marie Guzzo, Plaintiff Wyoming Equality, Plaintiff Ivan Williams, Plaintiff Rob Johnston, Plaintiff Bonnie Robinson, Plaintiff Charles Killion, Plaintiff Carl Oleson. Plaintiffs awarded costs in the amount of $567.90. (Court Staff, srw) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) FILED IN ERROR - BILL OF COSTS filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Court Staff, srw) Modified on 5/8/2015 (Court Staff, srw). (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Supplemental RESPONSE to 78 Bill of Costs,, Supplement, filed by Defendants Wyoming Department of Administration and Information Director, Wyoming Human Resources Division Administrator. (Schelhaas, Ryan) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting in part 69 Motion for Attorney Fees. See Order for further detail. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl, providing leave for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' amended bill of costs. Pursuant to this Court's order 73 , Plaintiffs filed an amended bill of costs with supplemental documentation on March 25, 2015 78 . The amount requested in that amended bill of costs is different than the amount requested in Plaintiffs' first bill of costs 71 . Accordingly, Defendants may file a supplemental response to the amended bill of costs, if they deem it necessary, on or before April 10, 2015. Any award of costs will then be determined by the Clerk of Court's office in accordance with Local Rule 54.2.(Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 03/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin denying 77 Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive) (Court Staff, sjgc) (Entered: 03/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) Supplemental BILL OF COSTS filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality, SUPPLEMENT re 73 Order,, filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Stoever, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing on 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2014 10:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Court Staff, stbd) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting 8 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting L. James Lyman for Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams and Wyoming Equality by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.(Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for L. James Lyman to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support of Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Laramie County Clerk served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Wyoming Human Resources Division Administrator served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Wyoming Department of Administration and Information Director served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anne Marie Guzzo. Wyoming Governor served on 10/7/2014, answer due on 10/28/2014 (Zubrod, Tracy) (Entered: 10/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Brie Barth, Anne Marie Guzzo, Rob Johnston, Charles Killion, Shelly Montgomery, Carl Oleson, Bonnie Robinson, Ivan Williams, Wyoming Equality, four (4) issued. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 10/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (four summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY020391.) filed by Shelly Montgomery, Bonnie Robinson, Charles Killion, Brie Barth, Wyoming Equality, Rob Johnston, Anne Marie Guzzo, Carl Oleson, Ivan Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg) Text Modified on 10/7/2014 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 10/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.