This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2016 at 20:36:41 (UTC).

Gust, Inc. v. AlphaCap Ventures, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2015 Gust, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-06192

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gust, Inc.

Defendants

AlphaCap Ventures, LLC

Richard Juarez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Van Eichner

Frank A. Bruno

Defendant Attorney

Marie McCrary

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11247417)Document filed by Gust, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Asserted Patents Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Asserted Patents Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Related Cases)(Eichner, Samuel) Modified on 8/7/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gust, Inc..(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AlphaCap Ventures, LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gust, Inc.. (Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. (dgo) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT against AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. Document filed by Gust, Inc..(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#7

(#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Samuel Van Eichner on behalf of Gust, Inc.. New Address: White and Williams LLP, One Penn Plaza, 250 West 34th Street Suite 4110, New York, New York, USA 10119, 212-714-3073. (Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2015 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/11/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

#41

(#41) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF RICHARD JUAREZS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(2). Document filed by Richard Juarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Richard Juarez)(McCrary, Marie) Modified on 1/29/2016 (db). (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#42

(#42) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Richard Juarez. (McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#43

(#43) DECLARATION of Richard Juarez in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Richard Juarez. (McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

#44

(#44) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Frank A. Bruno dated February 8, 2016 re: Richard Juarez's Motion to Dismiss and Jurisdictional Discovery in Connection Therewith. Document filed by Gust, Inc..(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#45

(#45) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 44 Letter filed by Gust, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Juarez's counsel has informed the Court that he intends to respond to Plaintiff's letter. He shall have until February 11, 2016 to do so. A telephone conference is hereby scheduled on February 16, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. The parties shall jointly call chambers at (212) 805-0162 at that time. Plaintiff's deadline to oppose Mr. Juarez's motion is adjourned and will be reset at the conference. So ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/9/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

#46

(#46) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Marie A. McCrary dated 2/11/2016 re: Richard Juarezs Response to Gusts February 8, 2016 Letter to the Court. Document filed by Richard Juarez. (Attachments: # 1 Gust's Deposition Notice of Richard Juarez, # 2 Gust's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Richard Juarez)(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#47

(#47) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Marie A. McCrary dated 2/23/2016 re: Notice Regarding Richard Juarezs Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #40). Document filed by Richard Juarez.(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#48

(#48) JOINDER to join re: 18 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P 11., 17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 13(A) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Richard Juarez.(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#49

(#49) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER terminating 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate item number 40 on the docket. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/23/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ORDER terminating 40 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate item number 40 on the docket. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/23/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) JOINDER to join re: 18 MOTION for Sanctions NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P 11., 17 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 13(A) AND FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6). . Document filed by Richard Juarez.(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Marie A. McCrary dated 2/23/2016 re: Notice Regarding Richard Juarezs Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #40). Document filed by Richard Juarez.(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Marie A. McCrary dated 2/11/2016 re: Richard Juarezs Response to Gusts February 8, 2016 Letter to the Court. Document filed by Richard Juarez. (Attachments: # 1 Gust's Deposition Notice of Richard Juarez, # 2 Gust's Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Richard Juarez)(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 44 Letter filed by Gust, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Juarez's counsel has informed the Court that he intends to respond to Plaintiff's letter. He shall have until February 11, 2016 to do so. A telephone conference is hereby scheduled on February 16, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. The parties shall jointly call chambers at (212) 805-0162 at that time. Plaintiff's deadline to oppose Mr. Juarez's motion is adjourned and will be reset at the conference. So ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/9/2016) (cf) (Entered: 02/09/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Frank A. Bruno dated February 8, 2016 re: Richard Juarez's Motion to Dismiss and Jurisdictional Discovery in Connection Therewith. Document filed by Gust, Inc..(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) DECLARATION of Richard Juarez in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Richard Juarez. (McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Richard Juarez. (McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF RICHARD JUAREZS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(2). Document filed by Richard Juarez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Richard Juarez)(McCrary, Marie) Modified on 1/29/2016 (db). (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Richard Juarez. Responses due by 2/10/2016(McCrary, Marie) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (laq) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2015 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/11/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Samuel Van Eichner on behalf of Gust, Inc.. New Address: White and Williams LLP, One Penn Plaza, 250 West 34th Street Suite 4110, New York, New York, USA 10119, 212-714-3073. (Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/12/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COMPLAINT against AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. Document filed by Gust, Inc..(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. (dgo) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to AlphaCap Ventures, LLC, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gust, Inc.. (Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gust, Inc..(Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Eichner, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against AlphaCap Ventures, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11247417)Document filed by Gust, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Asserted Patents Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Asserted Patents Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Related Cases)(Eichner, Samuel) Modified on 8/7/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less