This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:12:53 (UTC).

Gunsul v. The Boeing Company

Case Summary

On 01/22/2015 Gunsul filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against The Boeing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moira Gunsul

Woodinville, WA 98072

Defendants

Aetna Life Insurance Company

The Boeing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick J Kang

Attorney at PREMIER LAW GROUP

1408 140Th Place Ne

Bellevue, WA 98007

Defendant Attorneys

Erin M Wilson

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC

1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4200

Seattle, WA 98101-2338

Sarah E Swale

Attorney at LANE POWELL PC

1420 Fifth Avenue, Ste 4200

Seattle, WA 98111-9402

Kristina Markosova

Attorney at RIDDELL WILLIAMS

1001 4Th Ave Plaza, Ste 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

Laurence A Shapero

Attorney at RIDDELL WILLIAMS

1001 4Th Ave Plaza, Ste 4500

Seattle, WA 98154

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 15-2-00143-4-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-3884433), filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Complaint for Damages, # 3 Exhibit Order Setting Civil Case Schedule, # 4 Exhibit Case Information Cover Sheet and Area Designation, # 5 Exhibit Summons)(Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

#2

(#2) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (PM) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 1 Notice of Removal, filed on 1/22/2015 was improperly signed by KRISTINA MARKOSAVA. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." Do not re-file this document;please be sure all future documents are properly signed. Thank you. (PM) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Wage Withholding and Breach of Contract by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/20/2015, (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Laurence A. Shapero filed by Defendant The Boeing Company re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Wage Withholding and Breach of Contract (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint; by The Boeing Company.(Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Boeing Company, filed by Moira Gunsul.(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul re 8 Amended Complaint (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#63

(#63) Supplemental DECLARATION of Moira Gunsul in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Boeing's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#64

(#64) ERRATA re 51 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#65

(#65) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul, TO RESPONSE to 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment re FMLA and WFLA Claims (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#66

(#66) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2015, (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

#67

(#67) ORDER denying without prejudice 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#68

(#68) Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/2/2015, (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#69

(#69) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Leave To Withdrawal as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff by parties (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#70

(#70) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF; Moira Gunsul is now appearing pro se by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)cc Moira Gunsul (Entered: 09/21/2015)

#71

(#71) Stipulated MOTION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2015, (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) Stipulated MOTION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2015, (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 10/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFF; Moira Gunsul is now appearing pro se by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS)cc Moira Gunsul (Entered: 09/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Leave To Withdrawal as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff by parties (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/2/2015, (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) ORDER denying without prejudice 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2015, (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 08/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul, TO RESPONSE to 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment re FMLA and WFLA Claims (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) ERRATA re 51 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Supplemental DECLARATION of Moira Gunsul in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Boeing's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul re 43 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) DECLARATION of Laurence A. Shapero in Support of Boeing's Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment RE FMLA and WFLA Claims filed by Defendant The Boeing Company re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment re FMLA and WFLA Claims (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 07/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/9/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/16/2015, Joint Status Report due by 3/23/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 02/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Moira Gunsul re 8 Amended Complaint (Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Boeing Company, filed by Moira Gunsul.(Kang, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint; by The Boeing Company.(Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of Laurence A. Shapero filed by Defendant The Boeing Company re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Wage Withholding and Breach of Contract (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Wage Withholding and Breach of Contract by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/20/2015, (Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 1 Notice of Removal, filed on 1/22/2015 was improperly signed by KRISTINA MARKOSAVA. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." Do not re-file this document;please be sure all future documents are properly signed. Thank you. (PM) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (PM) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 15-2-00143-4-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-3884433), filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Complaint for Damages, # 3 Exhibit Order Setting Civil Case Schedule, # 4 Exhibit Case Information Cover Sheet and Area Designation, # 5 Exhibit Summons)(Shapero, Laurence) (Entered: 01/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less