This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2016 at 02:16:29 (UTC).

Guardian Media Technologies Ltd v. Target Corp

Case Summary

On 01/31/2014 Guardian Media Technologies Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Target Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-00760

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams

Judge

Judge Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guardian Media Technologies Ltd

Defendant

Target Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank C Olah

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

777 South Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Larry D Thompson, Jr

Attorney at Antonelli Harrington and Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd, Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Matthew J Antonelli

Attorney at Antonelli Harrington and Thompson LLP

4306 Yoakum Blvd, Suite 450

Houston, TX 77006

Daniel S Agle

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

777 South Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Charles S Barquist

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Dylan James Raife

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Target Corp. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd.(et) (mg). (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#2

(#2) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Target Corp. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. (et) (mg). (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Larry D Thompson, Jr for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Matthew J Antonelli for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#8

(#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. (Agle, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

#9

(#9) CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 2/6/14 addressed to dagle@klinedinstlaw.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Judge for further proceedings. (mg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

#39

(#39) TEXT ONLY ENTRY IN CHAMBERS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference 29 is continued from 09/08/14 to 09/15/14 at 1:30 pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#40

(#40) ANSWER to Counterclaims of Target filed by Counterdefendant Guardian Media Technologies Ltd.(Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

#41

(#41) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint 40 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and the document must also include the Judge's initials after the case number as follows: CV 14-0760 PSG (PLAx).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ab) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Matthew J Antonelli counsel for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Changing Address to 4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450; Houston, Texas 77006. Filed by Plaintiff Matthew J. Antonelli. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Larry D Thompson, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Changing Address to 4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450; Houston, Texas 77006. Filed by Plaintiff Larry D. Thompson, Jr.. (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

#44

(#44) Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

#45

(#45) TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) Counsel hereby notified that the notice of deficiency done on 9/5/14 inadvertently indicated that a notice of interested parties was required which was done in error, counsel has complied with local rule 7.1.-1, please disregard that portion of the deficiency notice. A. Bridges, Relief Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 9/12/2014 (ab). (Entered: 09/12/2014)

#46

(#46) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Court has received and considered the parties' Joint Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order ("Protective Order 44 "). The Court is unable to adopt the Protective Order as stipulated to by the parties for the following reasons: **See Order for details.** (ch) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

#47

(#47) MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (Filed on 07-24-14 on all cases); SCHEDULING CONFERENCE granting 32 Motion to Consolidate Cases Hearing held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having considered all papers submitted in support of and in opposition to the Motion referenced above, and the oral argument presented today, the Court GRANTS the Motion, and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES the following actions, to be reopened if a trial date is set. CV 14-757-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-758-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-760-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-762-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-764-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-767-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-769-PSG (PLAx). Counsel shall now file all future pleadings in the low number case: CV 13-8369-PSG (PLAx). With respect to the Scheduling Conference, the Court will issue scheduling order this week. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (Filed on 07-24-14 on all cases); SCHEDULING CONFERENCE granting 32 Motion to Consolidate Cases Hearing held before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Having considered all papers submitted in support of and in opposition to the Motion referenced above, and the oral argument presented today, the Court GRANTS the Motion, and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSES the following actions, to be reopened if a trial date is set. CV 14-757-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-758-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-760-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-762-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-764-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-767-PSG (PLAx); CV 14-769-PSG (PLAx). Counsel shall now file all future pleadings in the low number case: CV 13-8369-PSG (PLAx). With respect to the Scheduling Conference, the Court will issue scheduling order this week. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Court has received and considered the parties' Joint Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order ("Protective Order 44 "). The Court is unable to adopt the Protective Order as stipulated to by the parties for the following reasons: **See Order for details.** (ch) (Entered: 09/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) Counsel hereby notified that the notice of deficiency done on 9/5/14 inadvertently indicated that a notice of interested parties was required which was done in error, counsel has complied with local rule 7.1.-1, please disregard that portion of the deficiency notice. A. Bridges, Relief Courtroom Deputy Clerk for Judge Philip S. Gutierrez.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY Modified on 9/12/2014 (ab). (Entered: 09/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Larry D Thompson, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Changing Address to 4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450; Houston, Texas 77006. Filed by Plaintiff Larry D. Thompson, Jr.. (Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Matthew J Antonelli counsel for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Changing Address to 4306 Yoakum Blvd., Suite 450; Houston, Texas 77006. Filed by Plaintiff Matthew J. Antonelli. (Antonelli, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint 40 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and the document must also include the Judge's initials after the case number as follows: CV 14-0760 PSG (PLAx).. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ab) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ANSWER to Counterclaims of Target filed by Counterdefendant Guardian Media Technologies Ltd.(Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) TEXT ONLY ENTRY IN CHAMBERS by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference 29 is continued from 09/08/14 to 09/15/14 at 1:30 pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Thompson, Larry) (Entered: 08/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 02/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 2/6/14 addressed to dagle@klinedinstlaw.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Judge for further proceedings. (mg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. (Agle, Daniel) (Entered: 02/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Matthew J Antonelli for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Larry D Thompson, Jr for Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd. (et) (mg). (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Target Corp. (et) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendant Target Corp. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Guardian Media Technologies Ltd.(et) (mg). (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guardian Media Technologies Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles S. Barquist