This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 09:33:56 (UTC).

Griffin v. Adams and Associates of Nevada et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 Griffin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Adams and Associates of Nevada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-12668

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Griffin

Defendants

Shriver Job Corps Center

Adams and Associates, Inc.,

Jamie Wilson

Adams and Associates of Nevada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael O. Shea

Attorney at Law Office of Michael O. Shea, P.C.

3 Crane Park Drive, Suite 7

Wilbraham, MA 01095

Defendant Attorneys

Richard S. Loftus, Jr.

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP

12Th Floor, 24 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

David Bliss Wilson

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein

24 Federal Street, 12Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

Andrea C. Kramer

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Catherine E. Reuben

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP

12Th Floor, 24 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5076094 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea C. Kramer on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine E. Reuben on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Reuben, Catherine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#5

(#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson. (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Jamie Wilson served on 6/26/2014, answer due 7/17/2014. (Shea, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, August 1, 2014 to respond to Motion to Dismiss and to answer Amended Complaint by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

#23

(#23) Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

#24

(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center. (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrea C. Kramer (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by David Bliss Wilson on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Wilson, David) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Loftus, Jr on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Loftus, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#29

(#29) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Loftus, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

#30

(#30) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery to be completed by 10/13/15. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 11/10/15. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 12/8/15. Expert discovery to be completed by 1/12/16. Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by 11/10/15. Status conference set for 11/9/15 at 2:00PM. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

#31

(#31) ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 11/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 11/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact discovery to be completed by 10/13/15. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 11/10/15. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 12/8/15. Expert discovery to be completed by 1/12/16. Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by 11/10/15. Status conference set for 11/9/15 at 2:00PM. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Loftus, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Loftus, Jr on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Loftus, Richard) (Entered: 07/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Appearance by David Bliss Wilson on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Wilson, David) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrea C. Kramer (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center. (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 12/15/2014. Defendant to respond to plaintiff's settlement demand by 12/29/14. Initial disclosures due by 12/29/14. Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2015 unless good cause show. Fact discovery due by 8/14/15. Plaintiff's expert disclosure due by 9/11/15. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 10/9/15. Expert discovery to be completed by 11/13/2015. Summary Judgment Motions due by 9/11/2015. Opposition due by 10/9/15. If summary judgment filed, plaintiff's expert disclosures due within 30 days of the Court's ruling. Defendant's expert disclosures due 30 days after plaintiff's disclosures. Expert discovery 30 days after defendant's disclosures. Status Conference set for 9/8/2015 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Michael Shea for the plaintiff.) (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion to Dismiss to 8/1/14. (Hourihan, Lisa) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Friday, August 1, 2014 to respond to Motion to Dismiss and to answer Amended Complaint by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 07/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Jamie Wilson served on 6/26/2014, answer due 7/17/2014. (Shea, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson. (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson.(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 07/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine E. Reuben on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Reuben, Catherine) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea C. Kramer on behalf of Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson (Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adams and Associates of Nevada, Adams and Associates, Inc.,, Shriver Job Corps Center, Jamie Wilson ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5076094 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kramer, Andrea) (Entered: 06/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less