This case was last updated from PACER on 05/27/2016 at 16:53:09 (UTC).

Greenspan v. IAC/InterActiveCorp et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2014 Greenspan filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against IAC/InterActiveCorp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Hon. Ronald M. Whyte and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:14-CV-04187

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Ronald M. Whyte

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brad Greenspan

Defendants

Geoff Yang

News Corp

Google, Inc.

IAC/InterActiveCorp

David Carlick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Lee Hogue

Attorney at Hogue Belong

430 Nutmeg Street, 2Nd Floor

San Diego, CA 92103

Bryce Aaron Dodds

Attorney at Hogue and Belong

430 Nutmeg Street, Second Floor

San Diego, CA 92103

Tyler Jay Belong

Attorney at Hogue and Belong

430 Nutmeg Street, Second Floor

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorneys

Lee H. Rubin

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

Two Palo Alto Square, Suite 300

Palo Alto, CA 94306-2112

Anastasia A Angelova

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Kurt A. Kappes

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1201 K Street, Suite 1100

Sacramento, CA 95814

James Ian Serota

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to David Carlick, Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, News Corp, Geoff Yang. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

#6

(#6) FIRST AMENDED ANTITRUST CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, News Corp. Filed by Brad Greenspan. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 12/30/2014) Modified text on 12/31/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2014)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IAC/InterActiveCorp.. (Kappes, Kurt) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/13/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

#22

(#22) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL and (Proposed) Order; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Brad Greenspan. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 3/18/2015. Replies due by 3/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tyler J. Belong ISO Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 3/4/2015) Text modified on 3/5/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2015)

#24

(#24) Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

#25

(#25) DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE IN NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF COURT ORDER filed by Brad Greenspan. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 4/1/2015) Text modified on 4/2/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#26

(#26) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2015. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2015 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/20/2015. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#27

(#27) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/15/2015 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/8/2015. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/23/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2015)

#28

(#28) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Show Cause Hearing - Non Evidentiary held on 5/15/2015. No appearance was made by the plaintiff. Case was called at 9:05 and 9:23 and still no appearance by the plaintiff. The Court to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute the case. The Court to issue an order of dismissal. The matter is submitted. Court Reporter Name: Lee-Anne Shortridge. FTR Time: [9:05 to 9:06]. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: M. Ducharme. This is a text only Minute Entry (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#29

(#29) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/15/2015. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#30

(#30) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/15/2015. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/15/2015. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/15/2015. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Show Cause Hearing - Non Evidentiary held on 5/15/2015. No appearance was made by the plaintiff. Case was called at 9:05 and 9:23 and still no appearance by the plaintiff. The Court to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute the case. The Court to issue an order of dismissal. The matter is submitted. Court Reporter Name: Lee-Anne Shortridge. FTR Time: [9:05 to 9:06]. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: M. Ducharme. This is a text only Minute Entry (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2015) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/15/2015 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/8/2015. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/23/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/1/2015. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2015 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/20/2015. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE IN NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF COURT ORDER filed by Brad Greenspan. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 4/1/2015) Text modified on 4/2/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015) (Entered: 03/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL and (Proposed) Order; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Brad Greenspan. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 3/18/2015. Replies due by 3/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tyler J. Belong ISO Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel, # 2 (Proposed) Order)(Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 3/4/2015) Text modified on 3/5/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015) (Entered: 02/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SECOND AMENDED ANTITRUST CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, News Corp. Filed by Brad Greenspan. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 2/19/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES I SEROTA FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR IN PRO HAC VICE; and (Proposed) Order) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9213531.) filed by IAC/InterActiveCorp. (Kappes, Kurt) (Filed on 1/15/2015) Text modified on 1/16/2015 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/13/2015. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015) (Entered: 01/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IAC/InterActiveCorp.. (Kappes, Kurt) (Filed on 1/12/2015) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIRST AMENDED ANTITRUST CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, News Corp. Filed by Brad Greenspan. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 12/30/2014) Modified text on 12/31/2014 (dhmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to David Carlick, Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, News Corp, Geoff Yang. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014) (Entered: 09/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8925560.). Filed byBrad Greenspan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Belong, Tyler) (Filed on 9/16/2014) (Entered: 09/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less