This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2016 at 01:22:25 (UTC).

Greathorse Shipping, Ltd. v. Oldendorf Carriers GMBH & Co, KG

Case Summary

On 07/16/2015 Greathorse Shipping, Ltd filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Oldendorf Carriers GMBH Co, KG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby and Judge Eldon E. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02651

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby

Judge

Judge Eldon E. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tiger Bulk No. 2, Ltd.

Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.

Defendant

Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adelaida J. Ferchmin

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Daniel Alfred Tadros

Attorney at Chaffe McCall LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70163-2300

Defendant Attorney

Kevin J. LaVie

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2015 re 14 MOTION to Compel Acceptable Counter Security filed by Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG. After argument, motion was taken under submission. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (dno) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#4

(#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Vessel to Load or Discharge Cargo, Burn Fuel and Move Within the Port by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#9

(#9) WRIT of of Attachment issued. (3-USM)(plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#21

(#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 11/2/2015. The parties discussed Oldendorff's Motion to Compel Acceptable Security. R. Doc. 14. (dno) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clc) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#17

(#17) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Acceptable Counter Security by Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum)(LaVie, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

#6

(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG filed by Tiger Bulk No. 2, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Attorney Adelaida J. Ferchmin added to party Tiger Bulk No. 2, Ltd.(pty:selreq).(Ferchmin, Adelaida) Modified on 7/17/2015 (plh). (3cc: USM) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#20

(#20) ORDER Status Conference set for 11/2/2015 02:00 PM by telephone. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(jrc) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

#24

(#24) Notice of Docket Call set for 4/27/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. by Clerk(dno) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

#23

(#23) ORDER & REASONS that Oldendorff's 14 Motion to Compel Acceptable Security is DENIED. IS IS FURTHER ORDERED that Oldendorff and Tiger Bulk will post bonds as security regarding the claims at issue. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/9/15. (dno) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/28/15. (dno) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#7

(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint; **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have a header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Writ of of Attachment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/16/15. (3cc: USM)(plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#2

(#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Order Authorizing The Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Garnishment by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#19

(#19) REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG re 14 MOTION to Compel Acceptable Counter Security. (dno) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

#3

(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Motion to Allow Vessel Movement by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#16

(#16) IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument regarding Oldendorff's Motion to CompelAcceptable Counter Security, 14 , will be held on October 30, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will submit all replies or other supporting memoranda by October 28, 2015. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/21/15.(dno) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Notice of Docket Call set for 4/27/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. by Clerk(dno) (Entered: 03/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER & REASONS that Oldendorff's 14 Motion to Compel Acceptable Security is DENIED. IS IS FURTHER ORDERED that Oldendorff and Tiger Bulk will post bonds as security regarding the claims at issue. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/9/15. (dno) (Entered: 11/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2015 re 14 MOTION to Compel Acceptable Counter Security filed by Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG. After argument, motion was taken under submission. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (dno) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 11/2/2015. The parties discussed Oldendorff's Motion to Compel Acceptable Security. R. Doc. 14. (dno) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER Status Conference set for 11/2/2015 02:00 PM by telephone. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(jrc) (Entered: 10/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG re 14 MOTION to Compel Acceptable Counter Security. (dno) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/28/15. (dno) (Entered: 10/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Acceptable Counter Security by Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum)(LaVie, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) IT IS ORDERED that Oral Argument regarding Oldendorff's Motion to CompelAcceptable Counter Security, 14 , will be held on October 30, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will submit all replies or other supporting memoranda by October 28, 2015. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 10/21/15.(dno) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tiger Bulk No. 2, Ltd. re 14 MOTION to Compel Acceptable Counter Security . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit C-2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Tadros, Daniel) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting 3 Motion to Allow Vessel Movement. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/16/15. (3cc: USM)(plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WRIT of of Attachment issued. (3-USM)(plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 2 Motion for Writ of of Attachment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/16/15. (3cc: USM)(plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint; **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have a header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (plh) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co. KG filed by Tiger Bulk No. 2, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)Attorney Adelaida J. Ferchmin added to party Tiger Bulk No. 2, Ltd.(pty:selreq).(Ferchmin, Adelaida) Modified on 7/17/2015 (plh). (3cc: USM) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clc) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Allow Vessel to Load or Discharge Cargo, Burn Fuel and Move Within the Port by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Motion to Allow Vessel Movement by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Writ of Order Authorizing The Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Garnishment by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Oldendorff Carriers GMBH & Co, KG (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Affidavit)Attorney Adelaida J. Ferchmin added to party Greathorse Shipping, Ltd.(pty:pla).(Ferchmin, Adelaida) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/16/2015) (plh). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2015) (plh). Modified on 7/16/2015 (plh). (3cc: USM) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.