This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 13:04:46 (UTC).

Gray et al v. Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Gray filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-04398

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amy Gray

Armando Herrera

Defendants

Keurig, Inc.

Keurig Green Mountain Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Thomas H. Burt

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Betsy Carol Manifold

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman and Herz

750 B Street, Symphony Towers Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101-5050

Rachele R Rickert

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz

750 B Street Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Marisa C. Livesay

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz

750 B Street, Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Francis M Gregorek

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz

750 B Street Suite 2770

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

George Stephen Cary

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., Keurig, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6882570.), filed by Amy Gray, Armando Herrera. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-00696-WQH-NLS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Rickert, Rachele)(cxl) (cap). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (cap). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Amy Gray, Armando Herrera of case(s) 3:14-cv-00678 re 1 Complaint, and Declaration of Service. (Rickert, Rachele) Modified on 3/28/2014 - Proposed Low Number Order was prepared re lower-numbered case 14cv678-DMS-KSC. (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE: Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. Judge William Q. Hayes, Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 14cv696-DMS-KSC. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/4/2014. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/28/2014. (Related case: 14cv678-DMS-KSC) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/04/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis M. Gregorek on behalf of Amy Gray, Armando Herrera (Gregorek, Francis)Attorney Francis M. Gregorek added to party Amy Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Francis M. Gregorek added to party Armando Herrera(pty:pla)(aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Carol Manifold on behalf of Amy Gray, Armando Herrera (Manifold, Betsy)Attorney Betsy Carol Manifold added to party Amy Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Betsy Carol Manifold added to party Armando Herrera(pty:pla) (aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa C Livesay on behalf of Amy Gray, Armando Herrera (Livesay, Marisa)Attorney Marisa C Livesay added to party Amy Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Marisa C Livesay added to party Armando Herrera(pty:pla) (aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of MDL Filing: Memorandum of Respondent Rogers in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Actions for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings (kaj) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of MDL Filing: Interested Parties Shirley Schroeder, Constance Werthe, Amy Gray and Armando Herrera's Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Related Action, # 2 Notice of Related Action)(kaj) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/16/2014)

#50

(#50) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Bradley J. Demuth dated 01/26/2015 re: Non-party document preservation notice. Document filed by Todd W. Springer, All Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Yelda Mesbah Bartlett, Bay Valley Foods, LLC, Lavinia Simona Biasell, Kenneth B. Burkley, Holly Ann Buss, Richard Constantino, John R Cusimano, Cusimano Carstar Collison Inc., William Daly, William Daly, Roger Davidson, Jonna Dugan, Michael J. Flanagan, Amy Gray, Patricia Hall, Matthew Hashem, Armando Herrera, Judy Hoyer, Mary Hudson, JBR, Inc., Teena Marie Johnson, Darlene M. Kennedy, Lori Jo Kirkhart, John Lohin, James G. Long, Linda Major, Brier Miller Minor, Tracy Elizabeth Moreno, David Wayne Nation, Patricia J. Nelson, Ney Silverman Insurance Associates, L.L.C., Ken Overton, Timothy Quackenbush, Lorie Rehma, Sally Rizzo, Henry A. Rocker, Gregory Rose, Jeffrey Rosen, David Rosenthal, Lauren Jill Schneider, Shirley Schroeder, Sturm Foods, Inc., Rhett Montgomery Tanselle, Treehouse Foods, Inc., Constance Werthe, Toni Williams, Michael J. Flanagan, Darlene M. Kennedy, Jonna Dugan, JBR, Inc. (d/b/a Rogers Family Company), Lorie Rehma, Patricia J. Nelson, Jonna Dugan, Amy Gray, Patricia Hall, Armando Herrera, Mary Hudson, Brier Miller Minor, Patricia J. Nelson, Lorie Rehma, JBR, Inc., David Rosenthal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

#49

(#49) ORDER: All Plaintiffs have requested leave to file Amended Complaints and supporting exhibits under seal and to file redacted versions thereof on the public docket. Plaintiffs seek to redact material designated as confidential under the protective order governing this litigation, (Doc. 189), as well as material designated as confidential under a protective order governing prior litigation between Defendant Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., and Plaintiff JBR, Inc. Defendant has not objected to these requests. All requests by Plaintiffs are therefore GRANTED with respect to all proposed redactions. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule and appropriate page limits for any anticipated motions to dismiss. Consistent with my previous ruling, (Doc. 155), each motion to dismiss shall be briefed separately. The parties shall file a joint status report by December 15, 2014, setting forth a proposed briefing schedule and proposed page limits and, if unable to reach agreement, identifying any disputes that I must resolve. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/1/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(lmb) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#48

(#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 9/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#47

(#47) Redaction of (40 in 1:14-cv-01671-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-04414-VSB, 28 in 1:14-cv-04392-VSB, 72 in 1:14-cv-00905-VSB, 69 in 1:14-cv-04242-VSB, 30 in 1:14-cv-01836-VSB, 32 in 1:14-cv-02530-VSB, 25 in 1:14-cv-02582-VSB, 37 in 1:14-cv-01609-VSB, 40 in 1:14-cv-04391-VSB, 25 in 1:14-cv-02670-VSB, 31 in 1:14-cv-04405-VSB, 26 in 1:14-cv-02219-VSB, 44 in 1:14-cv-03790-VSB, 143 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-02692-VSB, 34 in 1:14-cv-03018-VSB, 39 in 1:14-cv-04398-VSB, 31 in 1:14-cv-04403-VSB, 27 in 1:14-cv-04407-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-01716-VSB, 23 in 1:14-cv-03032-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-02267-VSB, 32 in 1:14-cv-04399-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-02255-VSB, 39 in 1:14-cv-01963-VSB) Transcript,, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#46

(#46) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 9/3/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#45

(#45) Redaction of (23 in 1:14-cv-02582-VSB, 38 in 1:14-cv-01671-VSB, 70 in 1:14-cv-00905-VSB, 28 in 1:14-cv-01836-VSB, 37 in 1:14-cv-01963-VSB, 27 in 1:14-cv-01716-VSB, 35 in 1:14-cv-01609-VSB, 22 in 1:14-cv-02692-VSB, 26 in 1:14-cv-04392-VSB, 23 in 1:14-cv-02670-VSB, 32 in 1:14-cv-03018-VSB, 38 in 1:14-cv-04391-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-02219-VSB, 25 in 1:14-cv-04407-VSB, 37 in 1:14-cv-04398-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-04403-VSB, 22 in 1:14-cv-04414-VSB, 27 in 1:14-cv-02255-VSB, 30 in 1:14-cv-02530-VSB, 21 in 1:14-cv-03032-VSB, 30 in 1:14-cv-04399-VSB, 67 in 1:14-cv-04242-VSB, 22 in 1:14-cv-02267-VSB, 42 in 1:14-cv-03790-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-04405-VSB, 141 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB) Transcript,, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

#44

(#44) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Kenneth B. Burkley, Roger Davidson, Judy Hoyer, James G. Long, Linda Major, Sally Rizzo, Henry A. Rocker, David Rosenthal, Todd W. Springer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

#43

(#43) ORDER NO. 8 (RULING ON PREVIOUSLY PRODUCED DOCUMENTS): Plaintiffs in all four related actions within this multidistrict litigation have requested that the Court lift its previous restriction, (Doc. 76 ), on the use of certain documents produced by Defendant Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. ("Keurig") in previous litigation against Plaintiff JBR, Inc. ("JBR"). Some Plaintiffs have represented that they intend to incorporate material from those documents in an amended complaint. (Doc. 182 .) For the reasons stated below, to the extent consistent with the parties' obligations under all applicable protective orders and only for the limited purpose of filing any amended complaints, Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(ajs) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#42

(#42) ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a request by counsel by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. ("Keurig"), for leave to file under seal: (1) portions of a letter opposing Plaintiffs' request to make immediate use of certain previously produced documents; and (2) Exhibit B in support of the letter. Because the specified portions of the letter and Exhibit B contain material designated as highly confidential by the parties, Keurig's request to file those documents under seal in GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Bradley J. Demuth dated 01/26/2015 re: Non-party document preservation notice. Document filed by Todd W. Springer, All Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Yelda Mesbah Bartlett, Bay Valley Foods, LLC, Lavinia Simona Biasell, Kenneth B. Burkley, Holly Ann Buss, Richard Constantino, John R Cusimano, Cusimano Carstar Collison Inc., William Daly, William Daly, Roger Davidson, Jonna Dugan, Michael J. Flanagan, Amy Gray, Patricia Hall, Matthew Hashem, Armando Herrera, Judy Hoyer, Mary Hudson, JBR, Inc., Teena Marie Johnson, Darlene M. Kennedy, Lori Jo Kirkhart, John Lohin, James G. Long, Linda Major, Brier Miller Minor, Tracy Elizabeth Moreno, David Wayne Nation, Patricia J. Nelson, Ney Silverman Insurance Associates, L.L.C., Ken Overton, Timothy Quackenbush, Lorie Rehma, Sally Rizzo, Henry A. Rocker, Gregory Rose, Jeffrey Rosen, David Rosenthal, Lauren Jill Schneider, Shirley Schroeder, Sturm Foods, Inc., Rhett Montgomery Tanselle, Treehouse Foods, Inc., Constance Werthe, Toni Williams, Michael J. Flanagan, Darlene M. Kennedy, Jonna Dugan, JBR, Inc. (d/b/a Rogers Family Company), Lorie Rehma, Patricia J. Nelson, Jonna Dugan, Amy Gray, Patricia Hall, Armando Herrera, Mary Hudson, Brier Miller Minor, Patricia J. Nelson, Lorie Rehma, JBR, Inc., David Rosenthal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 01/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ORDER: All Plaintiffs have requested leave to file Amended Complaints and supporting exhibits under seal and to file redacted versions thereof on the public docket. Plaintiffs seek to redact material designated as confidential under the protective order governing this litigation, (Doc. 189), as well as material designated as confidential under a protective order governing prior litigation between Defendant Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., and Plaintiff JBR, Inc. Defendant has not objected to these requests. All requests by Plaintiffs are therefore GRANTED with respect to all proposed redactions. The parties are ordered to meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule and appropriate page limits for any anticipated motions to dismiss. Consistent with my previous ruling, (Doc. 155), each motion to dismiss shall be briefed separately. The parties shall file a joint status report by December 15, 2014, setting forth a proposed briefing schedule and proposed page limits and, if unable to reach agreement, identifying any disputes that I must resolve. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/1/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(lmb) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 9/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Redaction of (40 in 1:14-cv-01671-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-04414-VSB, 28 in 1:14-cv-04392-VSB, 72 in 1:14-cv-00905-VSB, 69 in 1:14-cv-04242-VSB, 30 in 1:14-cv-01836-VSB, 32 in 1:14-cv-02530-VSB, 25 in 1:14-cv-02582-VSB, 37 in 1:14-cv-01609-VSB, 40 in 1:14-cv-04391-VSB, 25 in 1:14-cv-02670-VSB, 31 in 1:14-cv-04405-VSB, 26 in 1:14-cv-02219-VSB, 44 in 1:14-cv-03790-VSB, 143 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-02692-VSB, 34 in 1:14-cv-03018-VSB, 39 in 1:14-cv-04398-VSB, 31 in 1:14-cv-04403-VSB, 27 in 1:14-cv-04407-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-01716-VSB, 23 in 1:14-cv-03032-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-02267-VSB, 32 in 1:14-cv-04399-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-02255-VSB, 39 in 1:14-cv-01963-VSB) Transcript,, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 9/3/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Redaction of (23 in 1:14-cv-02582-VSB, 38 in 1:14-cv-01671-VSB, 70 in 1:14-cv-00905-VSB, 28 in 1:14-cv-01836-VSB, 37 in 1:14-cv-01963-VSB, 27 in 1:14-cv-01716-VSB, 35 in 1:14-cv-01609-VSB, 22 in 1:14-cv-02692-VSB, 26 in 1:14-cv-04392-VSB, 23 in 1:14-cv-02670-VSB, 32 in 1:14-cv-03018-VSB, 38 in 1:14-cv-04391-VSB, 24 in 1:14-cv-02219-VSB, 25 in 1:14-cv-04407-VSB, 37 in 1:14-cv-04398-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-04403-VSB, 22 in 1:14-cv-04414-VSB, 27 in 1:14-cv-02255-VSB, 30 in 1:14-cv-02530-VSB, 21 in 1:14-cv-03032-VSB, 30 in 1:14-cv-04399-VSB, 67 in 1:14-cv-04242-VSB, 22 in 1:14-cv-02267-VSB, 42 in 1:14-cv-03790-VSB, 29 in 1:14-cv-04405-VSB, 141 in 1:14-md-02542-VSB) Transcript,, Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Kenneth B. Burkley, Roger Davidson, Judy Hoyer, James G. Long, Linda Major, Sally Rizzo, Henry A. Rocker, David Rosenthal, Todd W. Springer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(Demuth, Bradley) (Entered: 11/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) ORDER NO. 8 (RULING ON PREVIOUSLY PRODUCED DOCUMENTS): Plaintiffs in all four related actions within this multidistrict litigation have requested that the Court lift its previous restriction, (Doc. 76 ), on the use of certain documents produced by Defendant Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. ("Keurig") in previous litigation against Plaintiff JBR, Inc. ("JBR"). Some Plaintiffs have represented that they intend to incorporate material from those documents in an amended complaint. (Doc. 182 .) For the reasons stated below, to the extent consistent with the parties' obligations under all applicable protective orders and only for the limited purpose of filing any amended complaints, Plaintiffs' request is GRANTED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(ajs) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a request by counsel by Keurig Green Mountain, Inc. ("Keurig"), for leave to file under seal: (1) portions of a letter opposing Plaintiffs' request to make immediate use of certain previously produced documents; and (2) Exhibit B in support of the letter. Because the specified portions of the letter and Exhibit B contain material designated as highly confidential by the parties, Keurig's request to file those documents under seal in GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/21/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 10/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Daniel Johnson, Jr. dated 10/21/2014 re: use of previously produced documents. Document filed by JBR, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02542-VSB et al.(Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 10/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of MDL Filing: Notice of Appearance, Rule 5.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Interested Party Plaintiffs Cusimano Carstar Collision, Inc. and John R. Cusimano's Response in Support of Plaintiff Ney Silverman Associates, LLC's Motion for the Transfer of Related Actions to the Southern District of New York for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, Schedule of Actions; Exhibits A-E, Certificate of Service (cd attached) (kaj) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of MDL Filing: Interested Parties Shirley Schroeder, Constance Werthe, Amy Gray and Armando Herrera's Response in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Related Action, # 2 Notice of Related Action)(kaj) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of MDL Filing: Memorandum of Respondent Rogers in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Actions for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings (kaj) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa C Livesay on behalf of Amy Gray, Armando Herrera (Livesay, Marisa)Attorney Marisa C Livesay added to party Amy Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Marisa C Livesay added to party Armando Herrera(pty:pla) (aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Betsy Carol Manifold on behalf of Amy Gray, Armando Herrera (Manifold, Betsy)Attorney Betsy Carol Manifold added to party Amy Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Betsy Carol Manifold added to party Armando Herrera(pty:pla) (aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis M. Gregorek on behalf of Amy Gray, Armando Herrera (Gregorek, Francis)Attorney Francis M. Gregorek added to party Amy Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Francis M. Gregorek added to party Armando Herrera(pty:pla)(aef). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE: Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. Judge William Q. Hayes, Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes no longer assigned to case. The new case number is 14cv696-DMS-KSC. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/4/2014. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/28/2014. (Related case: 14cv678-DMS-KSC) (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 04/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Amy Gray, Armando Herrera of case(s) 3:14-cv-00678 re 1 Complaint, and Declaration of Service. (Rickert, Rachele) Modified on 3/28/2014 - Proposed Low Number Order was prepared re lower-numbered case 14cv678-DMS-KSC. (mdc) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (cap). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Keurig Green Mountain, Inc., Keurig, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6882570.), filed by Amy Gray, Armando Herrera. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:14-cv-00696-WQH-NLS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Rickert, Rachele)(cxl) (cap). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/18/2014.] (Entered: 03/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.