This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:37:40 (UTC).

Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority v. Oltrin Solutions LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2014 Grand Strand Water Sewer Authority filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Oltrin Solutions LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Honorable Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-02800

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Judge

Honorable Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority

Defendants

Oltrin Solutions LLC

JCI Jones Chemicals Inc

Trinity Manufacturing Inc

Olin Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Solomon B Cera

Attorney at Cera LLP

595 Market Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Brent W Johnson

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll

1100 New York Ave Nw, West Tower Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005-3934

Lucy G Massopust

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek

120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel C Hedlund

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLC

120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Pamela A Markert

Attorney at Cera LLP

595 Market Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Emmy L Levens

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll

1100 New York Ave Nw, West Tower Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005-3934

Henrietta U Golding

Attorney at McNair Law Firm

Po Box 336

Myrtle Beach, SC 29578

Defendant Attorneys

Susan Miller Huber

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw and Hinson

1900 Independence Center, 101 N Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Cary Baxter Davis

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw and Hinson

1900 Independence Center, 101 N Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Stephen M Cox

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw and Hinson

Po Box 12070

Rock Hill, SC 29731

Mark W Merritt

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw and Hinson

1900 Independence Center, 101 N Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Lawrence Carlton Moore

Attorney at Robinson Bradshaw and Hinson

1900 Independence Center, 101 N Tryon Street, Suite 1900

Charlotte, NC 28246

Walker Heinitsh Willcox

Attorney at Willcox Buyck and Williams

Po Box 1909

Florence, SC 29503-1909

Michael Marshall Briley

Attorney at Schumaker Loop and Kendrick

1000 Jackson Street

Toledo, OH 43604

Robert W Turken

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Lori P Lustrin

Attorney at Bilzin Sumberg Baena Price and Axelrod

1450 Brickell Avenue, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

C Philip Campbell, Jr

Attorney at Shumaker Loop and Kendrick

101 East Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 2800

Tampa, FL 33602

Marguerite S Willis

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet (Cola)

Po Drawer 2426

Columbia, SC 29201

Daniel C Leonardi

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office (Cola)

1901 Assembly Street, Suite 200

Columbia, SC 29201

Thomas J Dillickrath

Attorney at Baker Botts

1299 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Suite 2180

Washington, DC 20004

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JCI Jones Chemicals Inc, Olin Corporation, Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-5437952.), filed by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. Service due by 11/13/2014.(prou, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority.(prou, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to JCI Jones Chemicals Inc, Olin Corporation, Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. JCI Jones Chemicals Inc served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014; Olin Corporation served on 7/17/2014, answer due 8/7/2014; Oltrin Solutions LLC served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014; Trinity Manufacturing Inc served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service)(Golding, Henrietta) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite S Willis on behalf of Olin Corporation (Willis, Marguerite) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Leonardi on behalf of Olin Corporation (Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by JCI Jones Chemicals Inc, Olin Corporation, Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas J. Dillickrath ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5484245) by Olin Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Connor Lavery ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5484281) by Olin Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#123

(#123) NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 2/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom #3, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (ltap, ) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

#122

(#122) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/10/2015.(prou, ) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

#121

(#121) DECLARATION by Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney General Letter - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney General Letter - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 - NC Attorney General Letter - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 - NC Attorney General Letter - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - SC Attorney General Letter - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 3 - SC Attorney General Letter - Part 2)(Cox, Stephen). Modified on 12/3/2015 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user and to add descriptions to exhibits (prou, ). (Entered: 12/02/2015)

#120

(#120) MOTION Prelimiinary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice, # 2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit B - Settlement Notice, # 4 Exhibit C - Claim Form, # 5 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving the Settlement, Certifying the Settlement Class, and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Golding, Henrietta). Modified on 11/24/2015 to replace with corrected documents provided by filing user and to add descriptions to exhibits (prou, ). (Entered: 11/23/2015)

#118

(#118) ORDER granting 114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lucy G. Massopust. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/2/2015.(prou, ) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

#116

(#116) TEXT ORDER: The Court construes the parties' Notification of Proposed Settlement and Joint Request for Stay of Litigation Pending Further Settlement Proceedings (Dkt. No. 115) as a motion to stay proceedings for 90 days. The Court GRANTS this motion and stays the proceedings for 90 days from the date of this order. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/26/15. (ltap, ) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#115

(#115) NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Request for Stay of Litigation by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority (Golding, Henrietta) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

#114

(#114) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lucy G. Massopust ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6182920) by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lucy G. Massopust)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Golding, Henrietta) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

#113

(#113) REPLY by JCI Jones Chemicals Inc to 102 Order,, . (Willcox, Walker) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

98 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#123) NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 2/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom #3, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (ltap, ) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, AND AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/10/2015.(prou, ) (Entered: 12/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) DECLARATION by Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney General Letter - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - US Attorney General Letter - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 - NC Attorney General Letter - Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 - NC Attorney General Letter - Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 - SC Attorney General Letter - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 3 - SC Attorney General Letter - Part 2)(Cox, Stephen). Modified on 12/3/2015 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user and to add descriptions to exhibits (prou, ). (Entered: 12/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) MOTION Prelimiinary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Authorization to Disseminate Notice, # 2 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit B - Settlement Notice, # 4 Exhibit C - Claim Form, # 5 Proposed Order Preliminarily Approving the Settlement, Certifying the Settlement Class, and Authorizing Dissemination of Notice)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Golding, Henrietta). Modified on 11/24/2015 to replace with corrected documents provided by filing user and to add descriptions to exhibits (prou, ). (Entered: 11/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) ORDER granting 114 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lucy G. Massopust. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/2/2015.(prou, ) (Entered: 11/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) TEXT ORDER: The Court construes the parties' Notification of Proposed Settlement and Joint Request for Stay of Litigation Pending Further Settlement Proceedings (Dkt. No. 115) as a motion to stay proceedings for 90 days. The Court GRANTS this motion and stays the proceedings for 90 days from the date of this order. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/26/15. (ltap, ) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Request for Stay of Litigation by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority (Golding, Henrietta) (Entered: 10/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lucy G. Massopust ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-6182920) by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lucy G. Massopust)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Golding, Henrietta) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) REPLY by JCI Jones Chemicals Inc to 102 Order,, . (Willcox, Walker) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) REPLY by Trinity Manufacturing Inc to 102 Order,, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TMI Record Retention Policy)(Cox, Stephen) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A. Ostoyich ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5484292) by Olin Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Connor Lavery ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5484281) by Olin Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas J. Dillickrath ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5484245) by Olin Corporation. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by JCI Jones Chemicals Inc, Olin Corporation, Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/25/2014. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel C Leonardi on behalf of Olin Corporation (Leonardi, Daniel) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Marguerite S Willis on behalf of Olin Corporation (Willis, Marguerite) (Entered: 08/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. JCI Jones Chemicals Inc served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014; Olin Corporation served on 7/17/2014, answer due 8/7/2014; Oltrin Solutions LLC served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014; Trinity Manufacturing Inc served on 7/16/2014, answer due 8/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service)(Golding, Henrietta) (Entered: 07/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to JCI Jones Chemicals Inc, Olin Corporation, Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc. (prou, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority.(prou, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JCI Jones Chemicals Inc, Olin Corporation, Oltrin Solutions LLC, Trinity Manufacturing Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-5437952.), filed by Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. Service due by 11/13/2014.(prou, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.