This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 07:23:52 (UTC).

Graham Springs LLC v. Zazzle Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2015 Graham Springs LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zazzle Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00775

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Defendant

Zazzle Inc.

Counter Claimants

Checks in the Mail, Inc. d/b/a iPrint.com

Printingforless.com, Inc.

Consolidated Defendants

Deluxe Small Business Sales, Inc. d/b/a PsPrint

Beaucoup Wedding Favors, Inc.

Costco Wholesale Corporation

CustomInk, LLC

Picaboo Corporation

Advanced Media Corporation d/b/a 48hourprint.com

Logo Sportswear Inc.

Cimpress USA, Incorporated d/b/a Vistaprint

Schurman Fine Papers

Adorama Pix LLC

Zenfolio Inc.

XO Group Inc.

District Photo, Inc. d/b/a InkGarden.com

Miller's, Inc. d/b/a mpix.com

Printograph, Inc. d/b/a GotPrint.com

Teespring, Inc.

ooShirts, Inc.

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Wasif H Qureshi

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC-Houston

1221 Mckinney Street, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77010

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Kenneth Larus

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Charles W Goehringer, Jr

Attorney at Germer PLLC

550 Fannin St, Suite 400

Beaumont, TX 77701

Tonya M. Gray

Attorney at Andrews Kurth LLP

1717 Main St, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Gregory Scott Bishop

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP - Redwood City

333 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 400

Redwood City, CA 94065-1434

Michael Charles Smith

Attorney at Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith, LLP-Marshall

P O Box 1556

Marshall, TX 75671-1556

Allen Franklin Gardner

Attorney at Gillam & Smith LLP

102 N College, Suite 800

Tyler, TX 75702

Stewart Mesher

Attorney at Conley Rose PC

13413 Galleria Circle, Suite 100

Austin, TX 78738

Kent E Baldauf, Jr.

Attorney at The Webb Law Firm

One Gateway Center, Ste. 1200, 420 Ft. Duquesne Boulevard

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

John M Hintz

Attorney at Rimon, P.C.

245 Park Avenue, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10167

Brett M Schuman

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP San Francisco

Three Embarcadero Center, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Counter Claimant Attorney

David M Barkan

Other Attorneys

Keith Bryan Davis

Attorney at Jones Day - Dallas

2727 North Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201-1515

William J Robinson

Attorney at Foley & Lardner - Los Angeles

555 South Flower Street, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2411

Clyde Moody Siebman

Attorney at Siebman Burg Phillips & Smith LLP

300 N Travis St

Sherman, TX 75090-0070

Darin Michael Klemchuk

Attorney at Klemchuk LLP - Dallas

8150 North Central Expressway, 10Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75206

Scott E Yackey

Attorney at Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 4200

Dallas, TX 75201

William F Long

Christopher John Schwegmann

Attorney at Lynn Tillotson Pinker & Cox, LLP

2100 Ross Ave, Ste 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Zazzle Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5203532.), filed by Graham Springs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Graham Springs LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Graham Springs LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/19/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Zazzle Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Zazzle Inc. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Zazzle Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif H Qureshi on behalf of Zazzle Inc. (Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

#135

(#135) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Cimpress USA, Incorporated d/b/a Vistaprint by Graham Springs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

#136

(#136) RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Provide Commerce, Inc. d/b/a Personal Creations' Motion for Sanctions filed by Provide Commerce, Inc. d/b/a Personal Creations . (Robinson, William) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#137

(#137) ORDER granting 135 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Cimpress USA, Incorporated d/b/a Vistaprint (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv778). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

#138

(#138) ORDER granting 132 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice XO Group Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv776). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#139

(#139) ORDER granting 133 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Adorama Pix LLC (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv902). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

#140

(#140) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss 123Print, Inc. by Graham Springs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

#141

(#141) ORDER granting 140 Motion to Dismiss. 123Print, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/16/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

#142

(#142) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

#143

(#143) ORDER withdrawing 18 Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#143) ORDER withdrawing 18 Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/26/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#142) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#141) ORDER granting 140 Motion to Dismiss. 123Print, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/16/15. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#140) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss 123Print, Inc. by Graham Springs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#139) ORDER granting 133 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Adorama Pix LLC (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv902). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#138) ORDER granting 132 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice XO Group Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv776). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/15. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#137) ORDER granting 135 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Cimpress USA, Incorporated d/b/a Vistaprint (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv778). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#136) RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Provide Commerce, Inc. d/b/a Personal Creations' Motion for Sanctions filed by Provide Commerce, Inc. d/b/a Personal Creations . (Robinson, William) (Entered: 10/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#135) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Cimpress USA, Incorporated d/b/a Vistaprint by Graham Springs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 10/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stewart Mesher on behalf of Adorama Pix LLC (Mesher, Stewart) (Entered: 10/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zazzle Inc..( Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif H Qureshi on behalf of Zazzle Inc. (Qureshi, Wasif) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Zazzle Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Zazzle Inc. (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/27/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Zazzle Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/19/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Graham Springs LLC. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Graham Springs LLC (Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Zazzle Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5203532.), filed by Graham Springs LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansley, Austin) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less