This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 18:59:03 (UTC).

GOOGLE, INC. v. DIGITAL CITIZENS ALLIANCE et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2015 GOOGLE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against DIGITAL CITIZENS ALLIANCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson and District Judge Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-MC-00560

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson

Judge

District Judge Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Google Inc.

Respondents

JENNER & BLOCK

Digital Citizens Alliance

Motion Picture Association of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Veronica S. Ascarrunz - PHV

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI, PC - Washington

1700 K Street, Nw, 5Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Daniel J. Mulholland

Attorney at FORMAN, WATKINS, KRUTZ & TARDY, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 22608, 200 S. Lamar Street, Suite 100 (39201-4099)

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

David H. Kramer - PHV

Attorney at WILSON, SONSINI, GOODRICH & ROSATI, PC - Palo Alto

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Fred Krutz, III

Attorney at FORMAN, WATKINS, KRUTZ & TARDY, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 22608, 200 S. Lamar St., Ste. 100 (39201-4099)

Jackson, MS 39225-2608

Michael H. Rubin - PHV

Attorney at WILSON, SONSINI, GOODRICH & ROSATI, PC - San Francisco

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower, Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Respondent Attorneys

David A. Handzo - PHV

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP - Washington, DC

1099 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Christopher Tompkins - PHV

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP - Chicago

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

J. Brad Pigott

Attorney at PIGOTT & JOHNSON, P.A.

775 North Congress Street

Jackson, MS 39202

Norman M. Hirsch - PHV

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP - Chicago

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

Jonathan S. Massey - PHV

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL, LLP - Washington

1325 G St. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Eli J. Kay-Oliphant - PHV

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL, LLP - Chicago

50 East Washington St., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60607

Jeremy M. Creelan - PHV

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK, LLP - New York

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION to Compel as to DIGITAL CITIZENS ALLIANCE ( Filing fee $ 46 receipt number 4616070644.) filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2015.] (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Compel as to MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2015.] (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Compel as to JENNER & BLOCK LLP by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2015.] (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#37

(#37) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:15-mc-00707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#38

(#38) ORDERED THAT Google's Motion to Transfer is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer Google Inc.'s Rule 45 motions to compel compliance with subpoenas (Doc. 1,4,5) to the USDC for the Southern District of Mississippi. (TLC) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#39

(#39) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting Google's Motion to Transfer its Motions to Compel to the Southern District of MS. (TLC) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Krutz, III on behalf of Google Inc. (Krutz, Fred) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Mulholland on behalf of Google Inc. (Mulholland, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brad Pigott on behalf of JENNER & BLOCK, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (Pigott, J.) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#45

(#45) Letter sent to J. Massey on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#46

(#46) Letter sent to D. Kramer on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#47

(#47) Letter sent to E. Kay-Oliphant on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#48

(#48) Letter sent to N. Hirsch on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#49

(#49) Letter sent to D. Handzo on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#50

(#50) Letter sent to J. Creelan on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#51

(#51) Letter sent to V. Ascarrunz on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#53

(#53) RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Compel, 52 Attachment Letter Brief filed by Google, filed by Digital Citizens Alliance (Kay-Oliphant - PHV, Eli) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) RESPONSE to Motion re 1 MOTION to Compel, 52 Attachment Letter Brief filed by Google, filed by Digital Citizens Alliance (Kay-Oliphant - PHV, Eli) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) ATTACHMENT re 1 MOTION to Compel Letter to Court Regarding Motion to Compel by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Krutz, Fred) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) Letter sent to V. Ascarrunz on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) Letter sent to J. Creelan on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) Letter sent to D. Handzo on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Letter sent to N. Hirsch on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Letter sent to E. Kay-Oliphant on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Letter sent to D. Kramer on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Letter sent to J. Massey on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) Letter sent to M. Rubin on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Letter sent to C. Tompkins on 10/20/2015 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (ND) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brad Pigott on behalf of JENNER & BLOCK, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc. (Pigott, J.) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Mulholland on behalf of Google Inc. (Mulholland, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Fred Krutz, III on behalf of Google Inc. (Krutz, Fred) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting Google's Motion to Transfer its Motions to Compel to the Southern District of MS. (TLC) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDERED THAT Google's Motion to Transfer is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer Google Inc.'s Rule 45 motions to compel compliance with subpoenas (Doc. 1,4,5) to the USDC for the Southern District of Mississippi. (TLC) (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:15-mc-00707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Compel as to JENNER & BLOCK LLP by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2015.] (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Compel as to MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, INC. by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2015.] (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Compel as to DIGITAL CITIZENS ALLIANCE ( Filing fee $ 46 receipt number 4616070644.) filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Michael Rubin, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(jf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/6/2015.] (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JENNER & BLOCK LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTION PICTURE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Mulholland