Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 22:19:57 (UTC).

Goodman v. ACE American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 Goodman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ACE American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy and Judge Claire V Eagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:15-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy

Judge

Judge Claire V Eagan

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Abbey Goodman

Counter Claimant

ACE American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorneys

David Royce Keesling

James Francis Kelly

Timothy Scott Kittle

Counter Claimant Attorneys

Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr

David Yita Loh

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Abbey Goodman (Keesling, David) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1450646) by Abbey Goodman (Keesling, David) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to ACE American Insurance Company (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent ACE Limited for ACE American Insurance Company) by ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: 2 Complaint ) by ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/8/2015) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Having reviewed the docket entry and/or PDF for Dkt #6, the Court has determined that the pdf also contains a Counterclaim. Attorney Graydon Luthey is hereby directed to re-file the Counterclaim forthwith. (Re: 6 Answer ) (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/9/2015 to add text (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#9

(#9) COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Abbey Goodman by ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing ACE American Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Attorney(s) David Yita Loh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1469969) by ACE American Insurance Company (With attachments) (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (re Atty David Yita Loh for defendant) ; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

#13

(#13) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: 9 Counterclaim ) by Abbey Goodman (Kittle, Timothy) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: 9 Counterclaim ) by Abbey Goodman (Kittle, Timothy) (Entered: 06/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (re Atty David Yita Loh for defendant) ; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Attorney(s) David Yita Loh to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1469969) by ACE American Insurance Company (With attachments) (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing ACE American Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Abbey Goodman by ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Having reviewed the docket entry and/or PDF for Dkt #6, the Court has determined that the pdf also contains a Counterclaim. Attorney Graydon Luthey is hereby directed to re-file the Counterclaim forthwith. (Re: 6 Answer ) (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 6/9/2015 to add text (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/8/2015) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: 2 Complaint ) by ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent ACE Limited for ACE American Insurance Company) by ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company (Luthey, Graydon) (Entered: 06/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to ACE American Insurance Company (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1450646) by Abbey Goodman (Keesling, David) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Abbey Goodman (Keesling, David) (Entered: 05/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Scott Kittle