This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2016 at 17:40:51 (UTC).

Gonzalez v. Con-Way Freight Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2014 Gonzalez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Con-Way Freight Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-03009

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moises Gonzalez

Defendants

Verifications, Inc.

Does 1 through 500

Con-Way Freight Inc.

First Advantage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander Isaac Dychter

Attorney at Dychter Law Offices, APC

1010 Second Avenue, Suite 1835

San Diego, CA 92101

Walter L. Haines

Attorney at United Employees Law Group, PC

5500 Bolsa Avenue, Suite 201

Huntington Beach, CA 92649

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew C. Crane

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Craig J Mariam

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Esther Slater McDonald

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Frederick T. Smith

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Kirstie M. Simmerman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Jennifer L. Mora

Attorney at Littler & Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East, 5Ht Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Ronald A. Peters

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

50 West San Fernando Street, 15Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#37

#38

#39

#41

#42

#43

#44

#45

#46

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER granting 45 Joint Motion. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), all claims asserted against Defendant Con-Way Freight, Inc. are dismissed. The claims asserted by Plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice, and the claims asserted on behalf of a putative class are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear his or its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/25/2015. (aef) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Con-way Freight Inc. by Moises Gonzalez. (Dychter, Alexander) (aef). (Entered: 09/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a telephonic Case Management Conference was held. A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on April 7, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mitchell Dembin at 333 West Broadway, Suite 1180, San Diego, CA 92101. Confidential settlement briefs are due on or before March 28, 2016, the parties shall submit directly to Magistrate Judge Dembin's chambers (via hand delivery or email address efile_dembin@casd.uscourts.gov) Absent good cause, requests for continuances will not be considered unless submitted in writing no fewer than seven (7) days prior to the scheduled conference. The dates setting the Pre-Trial Conference, Trial and related dates will be issued in a separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/31/2015.(aef) (Entered: 07/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER Granting 41 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Verifications, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), the Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Verifications, Inc. is granted. Plaintiff's individual claims against Verifications, Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims on behalf of the putative class are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear his or its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/24/2015. (aef) (Entered: 06/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Minute Entry for proceedings scheduled before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: On June 23, 2015, Plaintiff Moises Gonzalez and Defendant Verifications filed a joint motion to dismiss. (ECF No. 41). Therefore, the telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference currently scheduled for June 24, 2015, is VACATED and no appearance is required.(no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Verifications, Inc. by Moises Gonzalez. (Dychter, Alexander)(aef). (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STATUS REPORT by Moises Gonzalez. (Dychter, Alexander) (aef). (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Telephonic Case Management Conference was not held on 6/19/2015. Neither counsel for Plaintiff nor counsel for Defendant Con-Way Freight appeared. Order to follow. (no document attached) (atk) Modified on 6/19/2015-to replace counsel text; NEF regenerated (aef). (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Peters, Ronald) (aef). (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet, re 33 Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. (cap) (Entered: 05/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer to initial complaint by not more than 30 days re 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have up to and including February 13, 2015 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/2/15. (dls) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moises Gonzalez re 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Initial Complaint by not more than 30 Days (L.R. 7.2 and 12.1) (Dychter, Alexander) (QC email sent re incorrect format) (dls). (Entered: 01/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Initial Complaint by not more than 30 Days (L.R. 7.2 and 12.1) by Moises Gonzalez. (Dychter, Alexander) (dls). (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting 5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The joint motion is granted. No later than January 30, 2015, Defendants Verifications, Inc. and First Advantage Corporation shall file and serve their respective responses to the complaint, if any. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/5/15. (dls) (Entered: 01/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NON Opposition re 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Initial Complaint by not more than 30 days (L.R. 7.2 and 12.1) filed by Con-Way Freight Inc.. (Mora, Jennifer) (dls). (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Initial Complaint by not more than 30 days (L.R. 7.2 and 12.1) by First Advantage Corporation, Verifications, Inc.. (Crane, Andrew)Attorney Andrew C. Crane added to party First Advantage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew C. Crane added to party Verifications, Inc.(pty:dft) (dls). (Entered: 12/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Con-Way Freight Inc. (fth)(jrd) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Con-Way Freight Inc. Proposed Low Number Order not prepared - No Related Cases (fth)(jrd) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Con-Way Freight Inc. (fth)(jrd) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Con-Way Freight Inc.(no document attached)(fth)(jrd) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Advantage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Esther Slater McDonald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig J Mariam