This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/23/2018 at 20:24:53 (UTC).

Global Communications, Inc. v. ZCWC Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2014 Global Communications, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ZCWC Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Victor B. Kenton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-09951

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Victor B. Kenton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Communications, Inc.

Defendants

Zinwell Corp.

ZCWC Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart R Fraenkel

Attorney at Nelson and Fraenkel LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Guy M Burns

Attorney at Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel and Burns LLP

403 East Madison Street Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33602

James C Bradley

Attorney at Richardson Pattrick Westbrook and Brickman

1017 Chuck Dawley Boulevard, Po Box 1007

Mount Pleasant, SC 29465

John Wiley Horton

Attorney at Pennington PA

215 South Monroe Street Suite 200

Tallahassee, FL 32311

Timothy Patrick Dillon

Attorney at Law Offices of Timothy P Dillon

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

Louis Touton

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street Suite 5000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Tharan Gregory Lanier

Attorney at Jones Day

1755 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303

Alexis Adian Smith

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2300

Frederick L McKnight

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Steven John Corr

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#75

#73

#72

#71

RESTRICTED

#70

#69

#68

67 #1

Supplement Supplemental Claim Construction Materials

#53

#7

6 #1

CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

#3

#2

#1

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant ZCWC Inc..(Touton, Louis) (Entered: 01/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to the Status Reports indicating that a settlement has been reached (Dkt. #72 , #73 ), the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for February 1, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by January 25, 2016, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. The final ruling on the Markman Hearing, February 22, 2016 hearing on the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 57), August 29, 2016 Final Pretrial Conference and Exhibit Conference, and September 20, 2016 Trial are vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) STATUS REPORT , Notice of Settlement, and Joint Request for Stay filed by Defendant ZCWC Inc.. (Touton, Louis) (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) STATUS REPORT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant ZCWC Inc.. (Touton, Louis) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/1/15, 9:00 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2016. (Joko, Alexander) (Entered: 12/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexis Adian Houle counsel for Defendant ZCWC Inc.. Adding Tharan Gregory Lanier as counsel of record for ZCWC Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant and counterclaimant ZCWC Inc.. (Houle, Alexis) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Frederick L McKnight counsel for Defendant ZCWC Inc.. Adding Rick McKnight as counsel of record for ZCWC Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant and counterclaimant ZCWC Inc.. (Attorney Frederick L McKnight added to party ZCWC Inc.(pty:dft))(McKnight, Frederick) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) MINUTES OF Markman Hearing held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The markman hearing is held. The Court has reviewed the parties' respective in advance of the hearing and provides counsel with a tentative ruling. Counsel review the tentative ruling, which shall be returned to the Clerk upon the conclusion of the parties' respective presentations. The Court grants the parties' request to extend the deadline to file a response to the motion for summary judgment so long as all briefing is filed with the Court at least two weeks prior to the hearing date. Plaintiff and Defendant each give a presentation. The matter is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and on a ruling will issue.Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (bp) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) NOTICE OF LODGING filed PLAINITFF'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS re Notice of Lodging #53 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Claim Construction Materials)(Fraenkel, Stuart) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE OF LODGING filed by ZCWC Re Supplemental Markman Presentation Materials re Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #54 (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Markman Presentation Materials)(Houle, Alexis) (Entered: 11/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2015
  • (#10) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY** MINUTES (In Chambers) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams under the Civil Consent Pilot Project. The parties are reminded to review the time requirements for consent set forth in the Notice to Counsel that was issued at the time of the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff is instructed to forthwith serve a copy of this Order on all parties that have already been served with the summons and complaint, or to serve all parties with a copy of this Order at the time of service of the summons and complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY (es) (Entered: 01/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Guy M Burns for Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc., re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jp) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney John Wiley Horton for Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc., re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jp) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney James C Bradley for Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc., re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (jp) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge) (jp) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc.. (Dillon, Timothy) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Global Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dillon, Timothy) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc.. (Dillon, Timothy) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc., (Dillon, Timothy) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14987526 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Global Communications, Inc.. (Attorney Timothy Patrick Dillon added to party Global Communications, Inc.(pty:pla))(Dillon, Timothy) (Entered: 12/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Logan McKnight(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tharan Gregory Lanier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexis Adian Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven John Corr