This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 20:00:20 (UTC).

Glenville Shell LLC v. Ferrellgas, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2014 Glenville Shell LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Ferrellgas, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Gary A. Fenner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-00918

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Gary A. Fenner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glenville Shell LLC

Defendants

Ferrellgas Partners L.P.

Amerigas Partners, L.P.

UGI Corporation

Ken Janish

AmeriGas Propane, Inc.

Ferrellgas, L.P.

Amerigas Propane, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Josh Bradley Ewing

Attorney at Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

20 First Plaza N.W., Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Kit A Pierson

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Sellers & Toll, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 500

Washginton, DC 20005

Jennifer J. Price

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

911 Main Street, Ste. 2000

Kansas City, MO 64105

Emmy Levens

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Sellers & Toll, PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 500

Washtington, DC 20005

Richard F. Lombardo

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

Vincent James Ward

Attorney at Freedman Boyd Hollander Goldberg Urias & Ward PA

20 First Plaza Nw, Suite 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Anne Elizabeth Smith

Attorney at Shaffer Lombardo Shurin

2001 Wyandotte Street

Kansas City, MO 64108

Joseph Goldberg

Attorney at Freedman, Boyd, Hollander et al

20 First Plaza, Ste. 700

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Isaac Diel

Attorney at Sharp McQueen

6900 College Blvd., Suite 285

Overland Park, KS 66211

Richard A Koffman

Attorney at Cohen, Milstein, Sellers & Toll PLLC

1100 New York Avenue Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Craig S. O'Dear

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

1200 Main St., Suite 3800

Kansas City, MO 64105

Niall Edmund Lynch

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Daniel M. Wall

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Catesby Ann Major

Attorney at Bryan Cave, LLP-KCMO

1200 Main Street, Suite 3800

Kansas City, MO 64105

Jesse B. McKeithen

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Brandon J.B. Boulware

Attorney at Rouse, Hendricks, German, May, PC

1201 Walnut St., 20Th Floor

Kansas City, MO 64106

Kate Gehl

777 E Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Elizabeth A.N. Haas

777 E. Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Jay N. Varon

Attorney at Foley & Lardner, LLP

3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20007

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3105836.), filed by Glenville Shell LLC.(Diel, Isaac) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Glenville Shell LLC. (Diel, Isaac) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 06/27/2014)

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/02/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/02/2014)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP . (Major, Catesby) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#5

(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP. (Major, Catesby) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#6

(#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, UGI Corporation. (Boulware, Brandon) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/25/2014)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, UGI Corporation . (Boulware, Brandon) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 5 Defendants Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. and Ferrellgas, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Deadline to answer or otherwise respond extended to 9/26/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 7/28/14. (sj) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER. Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, and UGI Corporation's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint 6 is GRANTED, and the deadline is extended to 9/26/2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 7/28/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/28/2014)

#102

(#102) ORDER granting (104) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (96) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (95) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (96) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (86) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (96) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (99) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (104) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (86) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (93) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (81) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (105) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (88) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (89) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting (144) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting (104) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (101) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (75) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting (90) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting (73) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting (91) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (82) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (80) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (74) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (68) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (76) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (103) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (71) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (72) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (69) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (74) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (69) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (68) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting (87) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 4/20/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#101

(#101) Joint MOTION to amend/correct Order regarding Submission of Time and Expense Reports filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Speed Stop 32, Inc., Yocum Oil Company, Inc., Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/4/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Lombardo, Richard) Notice of docket modification: A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/17/2015 as Document No. 96-1, Attachment 1: Exhibit Proposed Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. NEF regenerated. (Greg Melvin) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#100

(#100) ORDER denying (94) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; denying (86) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; denying (85) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; denying (86) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; denying (76) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; denying (86) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; denying (89) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; denying (94) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; denying (76) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; denying (83) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; denying (71) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; denying (95) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; denying (78) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; denying (79) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; denying (124) motion to sever in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; denying (93) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; denying (91) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; denying (65) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; denying (80) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; denying (63) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; denying (81) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; denying (72) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; denying (70) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; denying (64) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; denying (58) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; denying (66) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; denying (93) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; denying (61) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; denying (62) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; denying (59) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; denying (64) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; denying (59) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; denying (58) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; denying (77) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 4/9/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

#99

(#99) ORDER granting (101) motion for extension of time to file suggestions in opposition and reply suggestions re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (93) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (92) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (93) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (83) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (93) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (96) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (101) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (83) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (90) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (78) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (102) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (85) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (86) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting (141) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting (101) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (98) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (72) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting (87) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting (70) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting (88) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (79) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (77) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (71) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (65) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (73) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (100) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (68) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (69) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (66) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (71) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (66) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (65) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting (84) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAFSuggestions in opposition/response due by 5/14/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. Reply suggestions due by 6/15/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court Signed on 4/6/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

#98

(#98) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to (75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF) MOTION for order, (99 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 84 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 88 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 91 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 77 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 91 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 70 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 69 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 81 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 76 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 69 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 75 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 81 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 71 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 96 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 100 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 138 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 94 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 91 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF) Suggestions in Support of Motion,,,,,,,, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, (85 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 82 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 136 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 99 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 86 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF) Suggestions in Support of Motion,,, filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Yocum Oil Company, Inc., Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC, Speed Stop 32, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Lombardo, Richard) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#97

(#97) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (83 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 91 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 59 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 79 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 95 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 80 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 76 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 72 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 86 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 61 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 94 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 85 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 124 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 76 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 58 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 93 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 71 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 93 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 86 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 65 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 94 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 77 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 58 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 86 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 59 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 78 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF) MOTION to sever and Request to Hold Motion in Abeyance filed by Brooks Elliott Harlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael S. Harvey, Arthur Hull, Gregory Ludvigsen, Alan Rockwell, Sean Venezia. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Harlow, Brooks) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#96

(#96) SUGGESTIONS in support re (75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Niall Edmund Lynch on behalf of Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF. This document was originally docketed as Document #132. Due to an ECF issue, the filer was unable to spread the entry. This document is being refiled to spread the entry to the associated cases.(Jones, Robin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#95

(#95) Joint MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Niall Edmund Lynch on behalf of AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF. This document was originally docketed as Document #131. Due to an ECF issue, the filer was unable to spread the entry. This document is being refiled to spread the entry to the associated cases. (Jones, Robin) Modified on 3/31/2015 (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#94

(#94) ORDER granting (96) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (88) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (87) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (88) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (78) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (88) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (91) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (96) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (78) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (85) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (73) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (97) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (80) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (81) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting (127) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting (96) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (93) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (67) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting (82) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting (65) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting (83) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (74) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (72) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (66) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (60) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (68) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (95) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (63) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (64) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (61) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (66) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (61) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (60) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting (79) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 3/24/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) ORDER granting (104) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (96) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (95) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (96) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (86) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (96) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (99) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (104) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (86) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (93) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (81) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (105) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (88) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (89) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting (144) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting (104) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (101) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (75) motion to amend/correct in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting (90) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting (73) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting (91) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (82) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (80) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (74) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (68) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (76) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (103) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (71) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (72) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (69) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (74) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (69) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (70) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (68) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting (87) motion to amend/correct in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 4/20/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Joint MOTION to amend/correct Order regarding Submission of Time and Expense Reports filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Speed Stop 32, Inc., Yocum Oil Company, Inc., Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/4/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Lombardo, Richard) Notice of docket modification: A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/17/2015 as Document No. 96-1, Attachment 1: Exhibit Proposed Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. NEF regenerated. (Greg Melvin) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) ORDER denying (94) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; denying (86) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; denying (85) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; denying (86) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; denying (76) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; denying (86) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; denying (89) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; denying (94) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; denying (76) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; denying (83) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; denying (71) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; denying (95) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; denying (78) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; denying (79) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; denying (124) motion to sever in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; denying (93) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; denying (91) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; denying (65) motion to sever in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; denying (80) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; denying (63) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; denying (81) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; denying (72) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; denying (70) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; denying (64) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; denying (58) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; denying (66) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; denying (93) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; denying (61) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; denying (62) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; denying (59) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; denying (64) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; denying (59) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; denying (60) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; denying (58) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; denying (77) motion to sever in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 4/9/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ORDER granting (101) motion for extension of time to file suggestions in opposition and reply suggestions re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (93) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (92) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (93) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (83) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (93) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (96) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (101) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (83) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (90) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (78) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (102) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (85) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (86) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting (141) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting (101) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (98) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (72) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting (87) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting (70) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting (88) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (79) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (77) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (71) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (65) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (73) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (100) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (68) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (69) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (66) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (71) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (66) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (67) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (65) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting (84) motion for extension of time to file response/reply re (98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF) MOTION for order, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAFSuggestions in opposition/response due by 5/14/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. Reply suggestions due by 6/15/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court Signed on 4/6/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 04/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Joint MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to (75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF) MOTION for order, (99 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 84 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 88 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 91 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 77 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 91 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 70 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 69 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 81 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 76 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 69 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 75 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 81 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 71 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 96 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 100 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 138 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 94 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 91 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF) Suggestions in Support of Motion,,,,,,,, (135 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 67 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 84 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 85 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 98 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Indirect Purhasers' Consolidated Class Action Complaint, (85 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 82 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 136 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 99 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 86 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF) Suggestions in Support of Motion,,, filed by Richard F. Lombardo on behalf of Yocum Oil Company, Inc., Johnson Auto Electric, Inc., Morgan-Larson, LLC, Speed Stop 32, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/20/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Lombardo, Richard) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re (83 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 91 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 59 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 79 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 95 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 80 in 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 76 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 72 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 86 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 81 in 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 61 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 94 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 85 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 124 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 76 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 58 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 60 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 93 in 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 71 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 93 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 86 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 65 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 94 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 77 in 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 58 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 86 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 59 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 78 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF) MOTION to sever and Request to Hold Motion in Abeyance filed by Brooks Elliott Harlow on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael S. Harvey, Arthur Hull, Gregory Ludvigsen, Alan Rockwell, Sean Venezia. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Harlow, Brooks) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) SUGGESTIONS in support re (75 in 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 87 in 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 90 in 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 137 in 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 89 in 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 95 in 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 64 in 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 63 in 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 66 in 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 99 in 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 97 in 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 93 in 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 69 in 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 65 in 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 74 in 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 83 in 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 90 in 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 98 in 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 80 in 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 76 in 4:14-cv-00986-GAF, 68 in 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 82 in 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 70 in 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 62 in 4:14-cv-00974-GAF) MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Niall Edmund Lynch on behalf of Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF. This document was originally docketed as Document #132. Due to an ECF issue, the filer was unable to spread the entry. This document is being refiled to spread the entry to the associated cases.(Jones, Robin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) Joint MOTION for order to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Niall Edmund Lynch on behalf of AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF. This document was originally docketed as Document #131. Due to an ECF issue, the filer was unable to spread the entry. This document is being refiled to spread the entry to the associated cases. (Jones, Robin) Modified on 3/31/2015 (Jones, Robin). (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) ORDER granting (96) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04164-GAF; granting (88) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04168-GAF; granting (87) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04178-GAF; granting (88) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00635-GAF; granting (78) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04184-GAF; granting (88) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04189-GAF; granting (91) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04190-GAF; granting (96) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04193-GAF; granting (78) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04197-GAF; granting (85) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04198-GAF; granting (73) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04202-GAF; granting (97) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04214-GAF; granting (80) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04234-GAF; granting (81) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04265-GAF; granting (127) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-md-02567-GAF; granting (96) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00917-GAF; granting (93) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00918-GAF; granting (67) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 2:14-cv-04285-GAF; granting (82) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00968-GAF; granting (65) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00970-GAF; granting (83) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00969-GAF; granting (74) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00986-GAF; granting (72) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00985-GAF; granting (66) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00971-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00972-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00973-GAF; granting (60) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00974-GAF; granting (68) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00975-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00976-GAF; granting (95) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00977-GAF; granting (63) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00978-GAF; granting (64) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00979-GAF; granting (61) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00980-GAF; granting (66) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00981-GAF; granting (61) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00982-GAF; granting (62) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00984-GAF; granting (60) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00983-GAF; granting (79) motion for leave to file excess pages in case 4:14-cv-00967-GAF Signed on 3/24/15 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Mitchell, Lisa) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) Joint MOTION for leave to file excess pages for Suggestions Related to Defendants' Joint Motions to Dismiss Indirect Purchaser and Direct Purchaser Complaints filed by Jay N. Varon on behalf of Amerigas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., Amerigas Propane, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., AmeriGas Partners, LP, Amerigas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas Partners L.P., Ferrellgas, L.P., UGI Corporation, Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP, UGI Corporation, Amerigas Partners, L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Amerigas Propane L.P., Ferrellgas L.P., AmeriGas Propane, LP, Ferrellgas L.P., AmeriGas Partners, LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2015 unless otherwise directed by the court. Associated Cases: 4:14-md-02567-GAF, 2:14-cv-04164-GAF, 2:14-cv-04168-GAF, 2:14-cv-04178-GAF, 2:14-cv-04184-GAF, 2:14-cv-04189-GAF, 2:14-cv-04190-GAF, 2:14-cv-04193-GAF, 2:14-cv-04197-GAF, 2:14-cv-04198-GAF, 2:14-cv-04202-GAF, 2:14-cv-04214-GAF, 2:14-cv-04234-GAF, 2:14-cv-04265-GAF, 2:14-cv-04285-GAF, 4:14-cv-00635-GAF, 4:14-cv-00917-GAF, 4:14-cv-00918-GAF, 4:14-cv-00967-GAF, 4:14-cv-00968-GAF, 4:14-cv-00969-GAF, 4:14-cv-00970-GAF, 4:14-cv-00971-GAF, 4:14-cv-00972-GAF, 4:14-cv-00973-GAF, 4:14-cv-00974-GAF, 4:14-cv-00975-GAF, 4:14-cv-00976-GAF, 4:14-cv-00977-GAF, 4:14-cv-00978-GAF, 4:14-cv-00979-GAF, 4:14-cv-00980-GAF, 4:14-cv-00981-GAF, 4:14-cv-00982-GAF, 4:14-cv-00983-GAF, 4:14-cv-00984-GAF, 4:14-cv-00985-GAF, 4:14-cv-00986-GAF(Varon, Jay) (Entered: 03/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER. On the court's own motion, all defendants' deadlines to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint are hereby extended to November 10, 2014, to accommodate the proceedings before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and to reduce confusion by aligning the defendants' response deadlines. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 8/29/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER. Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, and UGI Corporation's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint 6 is GRANTED, and the deadline is extended to 9/26/2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 7/28/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 5 Defendants Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. and Ferrellgas, L.P.'s Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Deadline to answer or otherwise respond extended to 9/26/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 7/28/14. (sj) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, UGI Corporation . (Boulware, Brandon) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Defendants AmeriGas Partners, LP, AmeriGas Propane, Inc., AmeriGas Propane, LP, UGI Corporation. (Boulware, Brandon) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP. (Major, Catesby) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Ferrellgas, LP . (Major, Catesby) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/02/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 07/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Glenville Shell LLC. (Diel, Isaac) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-3105836.), filed by Glenville Shell LLC.(Diel, Isaac) [Transferred from ksd on 10/24/2014.] (Entered: 06/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.