This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2016 at 17:40:37 (UTC).

Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC v. Sanchez et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2014 Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sanchez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Juan Sanchez

Patrick Elwell

La Merced De Pueblo De Chilili Board of Trustees

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant

Patrick Elwell

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Juan Sanchez

La Merced De Pueblo De Chilili Board of Trustees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Sarah K Downey

Attorney at Foster Rieder & Jackson, PC

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 1500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Geoffrey D. Rieder

Attorney at Foster Rieder & Jackson PC

Po Box 1607

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1607

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Narciso Garcia, Jr.

Attorney at Narciso Garcia Jr Esq

2033 San Mateo Blvd Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Richard D. Barish

Attorney at Espinosa & Associates PC

100 Sun Avenue Ne, Suite 204

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Leonard Espinosa

Attorney at Espinosa & Associates PC

100 Sun Avenuene, 204

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Richard D. Barish

Attorney at Espinosa & Associates PC

100 Sun Avenue Ne, Suite 204

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Leonard Espinosa

Attorney at Espinosa & Associates PC

100 Sun Avenuene, 204

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Narciso Garcia, Jr.

Attorney at Narciso Garcia Jr Esq

2033 San Mateo Blvd Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87110

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Misrepresentation, Breach of Contract and Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2014)

#2

(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 01/09/2014)

#3

(#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Espinosa and Richard D. Barish on behalf of Patrick Elwell (Barish, Richard) Modified text on 9/29/2014 (mr). (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Juan Sanchez, La Merced De Pueblo De Chilili Board of Trustees, COUNTERCLAIM against Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC by Patrick Elwell. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Barish, Richard) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 09/30/2014)

#7

(#7) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (stw) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 5 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC.(Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

#10

(#10) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. U.S. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough is no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

#47

(#47) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Settlement Conference held on 3/16/2015. Case settled. The parties will submit dismissal documents within twenty (20) days. (kc) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#46

(#46) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference held on 3/6/2015. (kc) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

#45

(#45) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Rescheduling Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference AS TO TIME ONLY. Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2015 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call chambers on its "Meet Me" conference line at (505) 348-2347. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

#44

(#44) RESPONSE to Motion re 39 MOTION for Supplement , 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

#43

(#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC on Amended Initial Disclosures (Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

#42

(#42) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan With Changes and Setting Case Management Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/17/2015; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2015; Defendants' Expert Witness List due 7/1/2015; Discovery Motions due by 09/08/2015; Pretrial Motion due by 9/18/2015; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2015; Pretrial Order due by 11/17/2015.(kc) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#41

(#41) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Continued Scheduling Conference held on 2/17/2015. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

#40

(#40) Joint Status Report (Amended) by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC (Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/16/2015)

#39

(#39) SUPPLEMENT to Motion to Dismiss by Juan Sanchez. re 13 (Garcia, Narciso) Modified text on 1/30/2015 (yc). (Entered: 01/29/2015)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Settlement Conference held on 3/16/2015. Case settled. The parties will submit dismissal documents within twenty (20) days. (kc) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference held on 3/6/2015. (kc) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Rescheduling Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference AS TO TIME ONLY. Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2015 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties are to call chambers on its "Meet Me" conference line at (505) 348-2347. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc) (Entered: 03/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) RESPONSE to Motion re 39 MOTION for Supplement , 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC on Amended Initial Disclosures (Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan With Changes and Setting Case Management Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/17/2015; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2015; Defendants' Expert Witness List due 7/1/2015; Discovery Motions due by 09/08/2015; Pretrial Motion due by 9/18/2015; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/3/2015; Pretrial Order due by 11/17/2015.(kc) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Continued Scheduling Conference held on 2/17/2015. (kc) (Entered: 02/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Joint Status Report (Amended) by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC (Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 02/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) SUPPLEMENT to Motion to Dismiss by Juan Sanchez. re 13 (Garcia, Narciso) Modified text on 1/30/2015 (yc). (Entered: 01/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Elwell's Cross-Claims. (tah) (Entered: 01/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc) (Entered: 10/27/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. U.S. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough is no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mr) (Entered: 10/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 5 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC.(Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/17/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Robert Hayes Scott no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (stw) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 09/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Juan Sanchez, La Merced De Pueblo De Chilili Board of Trustees, COUNTERCLAIM against Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC by Patrick Elwell. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Barish, Richard) (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Espinosa and Richard D. Barish on behalf of Patrick Elwell (Barish, Richard) Modified text on 9/29/2014 (mr). (Entered: 09/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions. Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 01/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Misrepresentation, Breach of Contract and Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Georgia Film Fund Seventeen Productions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Rieder, Geoffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.