This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 09:24:05 (UTC).

Geiger et al v. Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2014 Geiger filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Robert E. Blackburn and Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert E. Blackburn

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Defendants

A L Martial Arts, Inc.

United Partners- Laguna Niguel LLC

United Partners - Westminster LLC

Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East

Frank (I) Ley

United Partners - Vista LLC

United Partners-Hacienda Heights LLC

United Partners-Chandler LLC

Kata 7, LLC

United Partners - Kansas City 1 LLC

United Partners-Grayhawk LLC

United Partners - La Canada LLC

Masters United V LLC

United Partners - Sandy LLC

United Partners - Broomfield LLC

Z-Ultimate Parker

United Parnters-Utah LLC

United Partners-Scottsdale 1 LLC

United Partners-Colorado #3 LLC

United Partners - Ken Caryle LLC

175 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Edward Francis

Attorney at Thomas E. Francis, P.C., Law Offices of

695 Town Center Drive, Suite 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

John Patrick Glenn

Attorney at John Glenn, P.C., The Law Firm of

155 East Boardwalk Drive, #400

Fort Collins, CO 80525

Other Attorneys

Christopher Barr Davlin

Attorney at Davlin Law Firm, P.C.

2329 West Main Street, Suite 209

Littleton, CO 80120

Katie A. Allison

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Todd Allen Wells

Attorney at Gleason Wells, PC

1615 California Street, Suite 616

Denver, CO 80202

Emmy A. Langley

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Coren Ray Hinkle

Attorney at Gleason Wells, PC

1615 California Street, Suite 616

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3711931)Attorney Todd Allen Wells added to party Zach Geiger(pty:pla), filed by Zach Geiger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Robert Abelardo, # 2 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Zach Geiger, # 3 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Adam Goldstein, # 4 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Ryan King, # 5 Exhibit Notice of Decision, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, # 6 Exhibit Affidavit of James Faber, # 7 Exhibit Affidavit of Robert Abelardo, # 8 Exhibit Affidavit of Zach Geiger, # 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Adam Goldstein, # 10 Exhibit Affidavit of Ryan King, # 11 Exhibit Affidavit of Roger Oberdier, # 12 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Opportunity to Join Lawsuit to Recover Back and Overtime Wages, # 13 Exhibit Proposed Notice Of A Class Action Lawsuit, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 15 Summons Paul Taylor Summons in a Civil Action, # 16 Summons William Clark Summons in a Civil Action, # 17 Summons Kris Eszlinger Summons in a Civil Action, # 18 Summons Frank Ley Summons in a Civil Action, # 19 Summons Hans Prosch Summons in a Civil Action, # 20 Summons Masters United III LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 21 Summons Masters United 11 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 22 Summons Masters United X, Inc. Summons in a Civil Action, # 23 Summons Kata 7 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 24 Summons Masters United I LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 25 Summons Masters United III LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 26 Summons Masters United V LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 27 Summons Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 28 Summons Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 29 Summons Z-Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 30 Summons Z-Ultimate University of Martial Arts Professionals LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 31 Summons Z-Ultimate Events LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 32 Summons AL Martial Arts Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 33 Summons WLC Management, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 34 Summons Masters United VI LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 35 Summons Masters United 8 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 36 Summons Masters United 15 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 37 Summons United Partners Broomfield LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 38 Summons United Partners Castle Rock LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 39 Summons United Partners Centennial LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 40 Summons United Partners Chicago #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 41 Summons United Partners Colorado Springs 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 42 Summons United Partners Denver LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 43 Summons United Partners Denver South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 44 Summons United Partners Fort Collins LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 45 Summons United Partners Glenview LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 46 Summons United Partners Highlands Ranch LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 47 Summons United Partners Highlands Ranch 2 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 48 Summons United Partners Kansas City 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 49 Summons United Partners Kansas City #3 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 50 Summons United Partners Kansas City #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 51 Summons United Partners Ken Caryle LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 52 Summons United Partners Lafayette LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 53 Summons United Partners Lakewood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 54 Summons United Partners Leawood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 55 Summons United Partners Littleton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 56 Summons United Partners Longmont LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 57 Summons United Partners Olathe LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 58 Summons United Partners Overland Park North LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 59 Summons United Partners Overland Park South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 60 Summons United Partners Parker LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 61 Summons United Partners Skokie LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 62 Summons United Partners Smokey Hill LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 63 Summons United Partners Thornton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 64 Summons United Partners West Arvada LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 65 Summons United Partners Westminster LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 66 Summons United Partners Wheat Ridge LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 67 Summons Z-Ultimate Colorado Springs Summons in a Civil Action, # 68 Summons Z-Ultimate Denver Summons in a Civil Action, # 69 Summons Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East Summons in a Civil Action, # 70 Summons Z-Ultimate Parker Summons in a Civil Action, # 71 Summons Z-Ultimate Smokey Hills Summons in a Civil Action, # 72 Summons Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 73 Summons Masters United 12 LLC Summons in a Civil Action)(Wells, Todd) (Entered: 01/28/2014)

#2

(#2) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. Summonses not issued. Defendants names must match the name of the party being served on summons. Please resubmit summonses using the Summons Request event. (dbera, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland for non-dispositive motions. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/29/14. Text Only Entry (rebsec,) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC, a California limited liability company; Paul Taylor, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; William Clark, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Kris Eszlinger, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Frank Ley, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Hans Prosch, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Masters United III LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona limited liability company; Masters United 11, LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona limited liability company; Masters United X, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona corporation; Kata 7, LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC, a California limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLC, a California limited liability company; Z-Ultimate University of Martial Arts Professionals LLC, a California limited liability company; Masters United I LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a California limited liability company; Masters United III LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a California limited liability company; Masters United V LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a California limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Events LLC, a Colorado limited liability company; A L Martial Arts, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado corporation; WLC Management, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado corporation; Masters United VI LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; Masters United 8 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; Masters United 15 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Broomfield LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Castle Rock LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Centennial LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Chicago #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Colorado Springs 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Denver LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Denver South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Fort Collins LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Glenview LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Highlands Ranch LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Highlands Ranch 2 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Kansas City 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Kansas City #3 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Kansas City #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Ken Caryle LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Lafayette LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Lakewood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Leawood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Littleton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Longmont LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Olathe LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Overland Park North LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Overland Park South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Parker LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Skokie LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Smokey Hill LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Thornton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners West Arvada LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Westminster LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Wheat Ridge LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Colorado Springs, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Denver, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Parker, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Smokey Hills, a Colorado business; by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING 5 Summons Request. Summonses were not attached to the docket entry so they will not be issued. Text Only Entry. (klyon, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)

#7

(#7) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. The following Summonses were not issued as they were duplicates: 1-25, 1-27, 1-29, 1-39, 1-41, 1-43, 1-45, 1-50, 1-52, 1-56, 1-57, 1-61, 1-66. And 1-73 was not issued as the Defendant listed on the PDF is not a party to the case per the caption of the 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons, # 27 Summons, # 28 Summons, # 29 Summons, # 30 Summons, # 31 Summons, # 32 Summons, # 33 Summons, # 34 Summons, # 35 Summons, # 36 Summons, # 37 Summons, # 38 Summons, # 39 Summons, # 40 Summons, # 41 Summons, # 42 Summons, # 43 Summons) (klyon, ) (Entered: 01/31/2014)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Z=Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLc by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

#142

(#142) ANSWER and Affirmative Defense to 22 Amended Complaint by United Partners - Encino LLC, United Partners-Encino LLC. (Glenn, John) Modified text and linkage on 5/14/2015 (alowe). (Entered: 05/14/2015)

#143

(#143) MINUTE ORDER: the Parties will submit no later than the close of business May 19, 2015, a summary table of all issues that require court attention, in addition to the pending motions, for the hearing set for May 20, 2015. Further, Consent Forms due to Plaintiffs' counsel 6/10/2015; Designation due by 10/30/2015; Discovery due by 1/29/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2016; Status Report due by 6/17/2015; Status Conference set for 6/22/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/15. (nywlc1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#144

(#144) MINUTE ORDER: in addition to the four topics outlined in 143 , the Parties should be prepared to discuss at the June 22, 2015 Discovery Status Conference the status of named Defendants who have not yet been served or who have been served, but have not answered or otherwise responded. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/15. Text Only Entry (nywlc1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#145

(#145) COURTROOM MINUTES for additional Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/2015. Deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings: July 17, 2015. Deadline to file a motion to decertify: January 15, 2016. Discovery cut-off: January 29, 2016. Dispositive motion deadline: February 29, 2016. Parties are advised of informal discovery dispute process.(nywlc1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#146

(#146) Joint STATUS REPORT Conferral Spreadsheet by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Davlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

#147

(#147) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum 134 is GRANTED, with separate Order to issue. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions 114 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs' 3rd Motion to Compel 131 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Parties shall file a formal supplement to discovery responses, including certification, and a proposed Protective Order on or before 6/3/2015. Separate order to issue. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, ) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

#148

(#148) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/22/15 DENYING 134 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum w Exhibit A filed by Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Unemployment Insurance. The Division is directed to produce the responsive documents to the Second Subpoena on May 29, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-205 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294, or as otherwise agreed to in writing by Plaintiffs and the Division. FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of the Court is directed to RESTRICT document [#114-12] with a Level 1 Restriction. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#149

(#149) AMENDED COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall file a formal supplement to discovery responses, including certification, and a proposed Protective Order on or before 6/10/2015. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

#150

(#150) ORDER denying 114 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Compel. Defendants must supplement their discovery responses, consistent with this Order, no later than June 10, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/26/15. (nywlc1) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#150) ORDER denying 114 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Compel. Defendants must supplement their discovery responses, consistent with this Order, no later than June 10, 2015. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/26/15. (nywlc1) (Entered: 05/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#149) AMENDED COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall file a formal supplement to discovery responses, including certification, and a proposed Protective Order on or before 6/10/2015. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#148) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/22/15 DENYING 134 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum w Exhibit A filed by Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, Division of Unemployment Insurance. The Division is directed to produce the responsive documents to the Second Subpoena on May 29, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-205 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294, or as otherwise agreed to in writing by Plaintiffs and the Division. FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of the Court is directed to RESTRICT document [#114-12] with a Level 1 Restriction. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#147) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2015 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum 134 is GRANTED, with separate Order to issue. Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery Sanctions 114 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs' 3rd Motion to Compel 131 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Parties shall file a formal supplement to discovery responses, including certification, and a proposed Protective Order on or before 6/3/2015. Separate order to issue. FTR: Courtroom C-205. (bsimm, ) (Entered: 05/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#146) Joint STATUS REPORT Conferral Spreadsheet by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Davlin, Christopher) (Entered: 05/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#145) COURTROOM MINUTES for additional Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/2015. Deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings: July 17, 2015. Deadline to file a motion to decertify: January 15, 2016. Discovery cut-off: January 29, 2016. Dispositive motion deadline: February 29, 2016. Parties are advised of informal discovery dispute process.(nywlc1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) MINUTE ORDER: in addition to the four topics outlined in 143 , the Parties should be prepared to discuss at the June 22, 2015 Discovery Status Conference the status of named Defendants who have not yet been served or who have been served, but have not answered or otherwise responded. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/15. Text Only Entry (nywlc1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#143) MINUTE ORDER: the Parties will submit no later than the close of business May 19, 2015, a summary table of all issues that require court attention, in addition to the pending motions, for the hearing set for May 20, 2015. Further, Consent Forms due to Plaintiffs' counsel 6/10/2015; Designation due by 10/30/2015; Discovery due by 1/29/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 2/29/2016; Status Report due by 6/17/2015; Status Conference set for 6/22/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/18/15. (nywlc1) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#142) ANSWER and Affirmative Defense to 22 Amended Complaint by United Partners - Encino LLC, United Partners-Encino LLC. (Glenn, John) Modified text and linkage on 5/14/2015 (alowe). (Entered: 05/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#141) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 05/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS REQUEST as to United Partners -Wheat Ridge LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Z=Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLc by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 02/03/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. The following Summonses were not issued as they were duplicates: 1-25, 1-27, 1-29, 1-39, 1-41, 1-43, 1-45, 1-50, 1-52, 1-56, 1-57, 1-61, 1-66. And 1-73 was not issued as the Defendant listed on the PDF is not a party to the case per the caption of the 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons, # 27 Summons, # 28 Summons, # 29 Summons, # 30 Summons, # 31 Summons, # 32 Summons, # 33 Summons, # 34 Summons, # 35 Summons, # 36 Summons, # 37 Summons, # 38 Summons, # 39 Summons, # 40 Summons, # 41 Summons, # 42 Summons, # 43 Summons) (klyon, ) (Entered: 01/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING 5 Summons Request. Summonses were not attached to the docket entry so they will not be issued. Text Only Entry. (klyon, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC, a California limited liability company; Paul Taylor, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; William Clark, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Kris Eszlinger, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Frank Ley, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Hans Prosch, individually and in his capacity as owner, partner, and corporate officer; Masters United III LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona limited liability company; Masters United 11, LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona limited liability company; Masters United X, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona corporation; Kata 7, LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, an Arizona limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC, a California limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLC, a California limited liability company; Z-Ultimate University of Martial Arts Professionals LLC, a California limited liability company; Masters United I LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a California limited liability company; Masters United III LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a California limited liability company; Masters United V LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a California limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Events LLC, a Colorado limited liability company; A L Martial Arts, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado corporation; WLC Management, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado corporation; Masters United VI LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; Masters United 8 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; Masters United 15 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Broomfield LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Castle Rock LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Centennial LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Chicago #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Colorado Springs 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Denver LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Denver South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Fort Collins LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Glenview LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Highlands Ranch LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Highlands Ranch 2 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Kansas City 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Kansas City #3 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Kansas City #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Ken Caryle LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Lafayette LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Lakewood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Leawood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Littleton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Longmont LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Olathe LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Overland Park North LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Overland Park South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Parker LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Skokie LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Smokey Hill LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Thornton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners West Arvada LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Westminster LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; United Partners Wheat Ridge LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios, a Colorado limited liability company; Z-Ultimate Colorado Springs, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Denver, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Parker, a Colorado business; Z-Ultimate Smokey Hills, a Colorado business; by Plaintiff Zach Geiger. (Hinkle, Coren) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland for non-dispositive motions. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/29/14. Text Only Entry (rebsec,) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. Summonses not issued. Defendants names must match the name of the party being served on summons. Please resubmit summonses using the Summons Request event. (dbera, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-3711931)Attorney Todd Allen Wells added to party Zach Geiger(pty:pla), filed by Zach Geiger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Robert Abelardo, # 2 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Zach Geiger, # 3 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Adam Goldstein, # 4 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action, Ryan King, # 5 Exhibit Notice of Decision, Colorado Department of Labor and Employment, # 6 Exhibit Affidavit of James Faber, # 7 Exhibit Affidavit of Robert Abelardo, # 8 Exhibit Affidavit of Zach Geiger, # 9 Exhibit Affidavit of Adam Goldstein, # 10 Exhibit Affidavit of Ryan King, # 11 Exhibit Affidavit of Roger Oberdier, # 12 Exhibit Proposed Notice of Opportunity to Join Lawsuit to Recover Back and Overtime Wages, # 13 Exhibit Proposed Notice Of A Class Action Lawsuit, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 15 Summons Paul Taylor Summons in a Civil Action, # 16 Summons William Clark Summons in a Civil Action, # 17 Summons Kris Eszlinger Summons in a Civil Action, # 18 Summons Frank Ley Summons in a Civil Action, # 19 Summons Hans Prosch Summons in a Civil Action, # 20 Summons Masters United III LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 21 Summons Masters United 11 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 22 Summons Masters United X, Inc. Summons in a Civil Action, # 23 Summons Kata 7 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 24 Summons Masters United I LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 25 Summons Masters United III LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 26 Summons Masters United V LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 27 Summons Z-Ultimate Martial Arts Supplies LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 28 Summons Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 29 Summons Z-Ultimate Specialized Accounting LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 30 Summons Z-Ultimate University of Martial Arts Professionals LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 31 Summons Z-Ultimate Events LLC Summons in a Civil Action, # 32 Summons AL Martial Arts Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 33 Summons WLC Management, Inc. d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 34 Summons Masters United VI LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 35 Summons Masters United 8 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 36 Summons Masters United 15 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 37 Summons United Partners Broomfield LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 38 Summons United Partners Castle Rock LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 39 Summons United Partners Centennial LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 40 Summons United Partners Chicago #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 41 Summons United Partners Colorado Springs 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 42 Summons United Partners Denver LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 43 Summons United Partners Denver South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 44 Summons United Partners Fort Collins LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 45 Summons United Partners Glenview LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 46 Summons United Partners Highlands Ranch LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 47 Summons United Partners Highlands Ranch 2 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 48 Summons United Partners Kansas City 1 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 49 Summons United Partners Kansas City #3 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 50 Summons United Partners Kansas City #4 LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 51 Summons United Partners Ken Caryle LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 52 Summons United Partners Lafayette LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 53 Summons United Partners Lakewood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 54 Summons United Partners Leawood LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 55 Summons United Partners Littleton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 56 Summons United Partners Longmont LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 57 Summons United Partners Olathe LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 58 Summons United Partners Overland Park North LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 59 Summons United Partners Overland Park South LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 60 Summons United Partners Parker LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 61 Summons United Partners Skokie LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 62 Summons United Partners Smokey Hill LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 63 Summons United Partners Thornton LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 64 Summons United Partners West Arvada LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 65 Summons United Partners Westminster LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 66 Summons United Partners Wheat Ridge LLC d/b/a Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 67 Summons Z-Ultimate Colorado Springs Summons in a Civil Action, # 68 Summons Z-Ultimate Denver Summons in a Civil Action, # 69 Summons Z-Ultimate Highlands Ranch East Summons in a Civil Action, # 70 Summons Z-Ultimate Parker Summons in a Civil Action, # 71 Summons Z-Ultimate Smokey Hills Summons in a Civil Action, # 72 Summons Z-Ultimate Self Defense Studios Summons in a Civil Action, # 73 Summons Masters United 12 LLC Summons in a Civil Action)(Wells, Todd) (Entered: 01/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less