This case was last updated from PACER on 06/03/2016 at 20:48:39 (UTC).

Garcia et al v. Humana, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2014 Garcia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Humana, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:14-CV-61666

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jacqueline Pagan

Rosa Castellanos

Martha Garcia

Defendants

Humana, Inc.

Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc.

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Tony Atwal

Attorney at Nicholas Kaster, PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eight Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Matthew H. Morgan

Attorney at Nichols Kaster, PLLP

4600 Ids Center, 80 S. Eighth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Gregg I. Shavitz

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group

1515 S Federal Highway, Suite 404

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Paolo Chagas Meireles

Attorney at Shavitz Law Group, P.A.

1515 South Federal Hwy, Suite 404

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

Cherie London Silberman

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks & Smith, LLC

100 North Tampa Street, Po Box 1840

Tampa, FL 33601-1840

James Matthew Coleman

Attorney at Constangy Brooks & Smith

12500 Fair Lakes Circle, Suire 300

Fairfax, VA 22033-3804

Angelique Groza Lyons

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP

Po Box 1840

Tampa, FL 33601-1840

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6931632, filed by Martha Garcia, Jacqueline Pagan, Rosa Castellanos. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s))(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/22/2014)

#2

(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (bb) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc., Humana, Inc. (bb) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

#4

(#4) Order in Actions Brought Under the Fair Labor Standards Act; Statement of Claim due by 8/14/2014. CASE is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for a Settlement conference. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2014. (ps1) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paolo Chagas Meireles on behalf of Rosa Castellanos, Martha Garcia, Jacqueline Pagan. Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles added to party Rosa Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles added to party Martha Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles added to party Jacqueline Pagan(pty:pla). (Meireles, Paolo) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Martha Garcia. Humana, Inc. served on 7/28/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

#7

(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2014. (vp) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

#8

(#8) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2014-75 to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (vp) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Martha Garcia. Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc. served on 7/31/2014, answer due 8/21/2014. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 33 . James M. Coleman, Esq. may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendants Humana Inc. and Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mr. Coleman at jcoleman@constangy.com. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/28/2014. (jrz) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#35

(#35) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time extension of trial date to conduct mediation by Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc., Humana, Inc.. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#36

(#36) PAPERLESS ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE Joint Motion for Extension of Trial Date 35 . The Parties may re-raise this issue in the event mediation is unsuccessful. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2014. (bkd) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

#37

(#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2014. Wendell Locke, Esq. present on behalf of Plaintiff. Luke Savage, Esq. present on behalf of Defendant. Scheduling Order to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 14:30:35/10 mins.) (jrz) ERROR: This entry docketed in the wrong case. Modified on 10/30/2014 (sa). (Entered: 10/30/2014)

#38

(#38) Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2014. Gregg Shavitz, Esq. and Tony Atwal, Esq. present on behalf of Plaintiffs. James Coleman, Esq. and Angelique Lyons, Esq. present on behalf of Defendants. Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 14:40:14 /11 mins.) (jrz) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

#39

(#39) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2014. Discovery due by 2/2/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 11/10/2014. Motions due by 2/17/2015. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/30/2014. (sa) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#40

(#40) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/30/2014. (sa) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

#41

(#41) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Rosa Castellanos, Martha Garcia, Jacqueline Pagan (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) Modified title text on 12/9/2014 (asl). (Entered: 12/09/2014)

#42

(#42) FINAL ORDER of DISMISSAL re 41 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jacqueline Pagan, Rosa Castellanos, Martha Garcia; Dismissing Action without prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/9/2014. (ls) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 12/10/2014)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) FINAL ORDER of DISMISSAL re 41 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jacqueline Pagan, Rosa Castellanos, Martha Garcia; Dismissing Action without prejudice; Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/9/2014. (ls) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69. (Entered: 12/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Rosa Castellanos, Martha Garcia, Jacqueline Pagan (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shavitz, Gregg) Modified title text on 12/9/2014 (asl). (Entered: 12/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/30/2014. (sa) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2014. Discovery due by 2/2/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 11/10/2014. Motions due by 2/17/2015. Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/30/2014. (sa) (Entered: 10/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2014. Gregg Shavitz, Esq. and Tony Atwal, Esq. present on behalf of Plaintiffs. James Coleman, Esq. and Angelique Lyons, Esq. present on behalf of Defendants. Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 14:40:14 /11 mins.) (jrz) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2014. Wendell Locke, Esq. present on behalf of Plaintiff. Luke Savage, Esq. present on behalf of Defendant. Scheduling Order to follow. (Digital/Time in Court: 14:30:35/10 mins.) (jrz) ERROR: This entry docketed in the wrong case. Modified on 10/30/2014 (sa). (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) PAPERLESS ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE Joint Motion for Extension of Trial Date 35 . The Parties may re-raise this issue in the event mediation is unsuccessful. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2014. (bkd) (Entered: 10/30/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time extension of trial date to conduct mediation by Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc., Humana, Inc.. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Lyons, Angelique) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 33 . James M. Coleman, Esq. may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Defendants Humana Inc. and Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mr. Coleman at jcoleman@constangy.com. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 10/28/2014. (jrz) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Coleman. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 664. (ksa) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew H. Morgan. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 4427. (ksa) (Entered: 08/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Martha Garcia. Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc. served on 7/31/2014, answer due 8/21/2014. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/08/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2014-75 to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (vp) (Entered: 08/07/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg for all further proceedings, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/5/2014. (vp) (Entered: 08/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Martha Garcia. Humana, Inc. served on 7/28/2014, answer due 8/18/2014. (Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 08/04/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paolo Chagas Meireles on behalf of Rosa Castellanos, Martha Garcia, Jacqueline Pagan. Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles added to party Rosa Castellanos (pty:pla), Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles added to party Martha Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paolo Chagas Meireles added to party Jacqueline Pagan(pty:pla). (Meireles, Paolo) (Entered: 07/31/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order in Actions Brought Under the Fair Labor Standards Act; Statement of Claim due by 8/14/2014. CASE is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for a Settlement conference. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2014. (ps1) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Humana Health Insurance Company of Florida, Inc., Humana, Inc. (bb) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (bb) (Entered: 07/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-6931632, filed by Martha Garcia, Jacqueline Pagan, Rosa Castellanos. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s))(Shavitz, Gregg) (Entered: 07/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less