This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:00:03 (UTC).

G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc v. Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Richard A Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00391

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Richard A Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Paul T Meiklejohn

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY (WA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6100

Seattle, WA 98104-7043

Ryan Blair Meyer

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY (WA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6100

Seattle, WA 98104-7043

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles Gorenstein

Attorney at BIRCH STEWART KOLASCH BIRCH, LLP

Po Box 747, 8110 Gatehouse Rd, Ste 100E

Falls Church, VA 22042

John D.V. Ferman

Attorney at BIRCH STEWART KOLASCH BIRCH, LLP

Po Box 747, 8110 Gatehouse Rd, Ste 100E

Falls Church, VA 22042

Penny L Caudle

Attorney at BIRCH STEWART KOLASCH BIRCH, LLP

Po Box 747, 8110 Gatehouse Rd, Ste 100E

Falls Church, VA 22042

Chris Robert Youtz

Attorney at SIRIANNI YOUTZ SPOONEMORE HAMBURGER

999 Third Avenue, Ste 3650

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against defendant(s) Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Receipt # 0981-3943135), filed by G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120))(Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc (Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of a Patent action. E-mailed to the US Patent & Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report filed by counsel) (RE) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings mailed on 5/15/2015 (Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chris Robert Youtz on behalf of Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings. (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles Gorenstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4122571 (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D.V. Ferman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4122582 (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Penny L. Caudle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4122594 (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against plaintiff G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc by Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings.(Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#10

(#10) ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles Gorenstein for Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#11

(#11) ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D.V. Ferman for Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#12

(#12) ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Penny L Caudle for Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/23/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/30/2015, Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

#14

(#14) Plaintiff G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc.'s Answer to Counterclaims ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc.(Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 90 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/15/2015) (VE). (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 15 Order Dismissing Case to reflect correct name of defendant (Service of corrected image is attached). (VE) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 15 Order Dismissing Case to reflect correct name of defendant (Service of corrected image is attached). (VE) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 90 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/15/2015) (VE). (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Plaintiff G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc.'s Answer to Counterclaims ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc.(Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/23/2015, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/30/2015, Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2015, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 08/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Penny L Caudle for Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John D.V. Ferman for Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles Gorenstein for Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against plaintiff G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc by Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings.(Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Penny L. Caudle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4122594 (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John D.V. Ferman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4122582 (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles Gorenstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4122571 (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chris Robert Youtz on behalf of Defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings. (Youtz, Chris) (Entered: 08/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings mailed on 5/15/2015 (Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of a Patent action. E-mailed to the US Patent & Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report filed by counsel) (RE) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc (Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against defendant(s) Fritschi AG Swiss Bindings (Receipt # 0981-3943135), filed by G3 Genuine Guide Gear Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120))(Meiklejohn, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less