This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2016 at 03:31:14 (UTC).

Franklin v. Kenney et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2014 Franklin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Kenney. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:14-CV-03243

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Judge

Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Franklin, Sr.

Defendants

Fred Britten

Does 1-8

Dennis Bakewell

Charles Rine

Diane Sabatka-Rine

Michael L. Kenney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy A. Miller

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION - NEBRASKA

941 O Street, Suite 706

Lincoln, NE 68508

Eric W. Kruger

Attorney at ERIC KRUGER

7520 Fairway Drive

Omaha, NE 68152

Joel R. Donahue

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION - NEBRASKA

941 O Street, Suite 706

Lincoln, NE 68508

Defendant Attorney

Amie E. Larson

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE - NEBRASKA

2115 State Capitol Building, P.O. Box 98920

Lincoln, NE 68509-8920

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#40

#41

#42

#43

#44

#45

#46

#47

#48

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Attorney Amy A. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Joshua Franklin, Sr.(Miller, Amy) (Entered: 06/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) TEXT ORDER granting 44 the defendants' Motion to Stay Progression Order Deadline. The deadline to file motions for summary judgment based on qualified immunity is hereby stayed pending resolution of the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Exhaustion 41 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) TEXT ORDER granting 45 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The plaintiff may have until June 12, 2015, to file a response to the defendants' summary judgment motion. The defendants may have until June 22, 2015, to file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (BJC) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Attorney Amy A. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Joshua Franklin, Sr.(Miller, Amy) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION to Stay Progression Order Deadline by Attorney Amie E. Larson on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bakewell, Fred Britten, Michael L. Kenney, Charles Rine, Diane Sabatka-Rine.(Larson, Amie) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 41 , Brief 42 by Attorney Amie E. Larson on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bakewell, Fred Britten, Michael L. Kenney, Charles Rine, Diane Sabatka-Rine. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Shereece Dendy, # 2 Affidavit Robert Madsen, # 3 Exhibit Rules & Regs)(Larson, Amie) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment 41 by Attorney Amie E. Larson on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bakewell, Fred Britten, Michael L. Kenney, Charles Rine, Diane Sabatka-Rine.(Larson, Amie) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Amie E. Larson on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bakewell, Fred Britten, Michael L. Kenney, Charles Rine, Diane Sabatka-Rine.(Larson, Amie) (Entered: 05/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Certificate of Service of Discovery by Attorney Amie E. Larson on behalf of Defendants Dennis Bakewell, Fred Britten, Michael L. Kenney, Charles Rine, Diane Sabatka-Rine.(Larson, Amie) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER adopting 38 Stipulation for production of documents. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL) (Entered: 04/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to defendant Michael L. Kenney regarding Complaint 1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ELE, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to defendant Charles Rine regarding Complaint 1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ELE, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to defendant Diane Sabatka-Rine regarding Complaint 1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ELE, ) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Requested as to Dennis Bakewell regarding Complaint 1 . (Miller, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Requested as to Fred Britten regarding Complaint 1 . (Miller, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Requested as to Michael L. Kenney regarding Complaint 1 . (Miller, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Requested as to Charles Rine regarding Complaint 1 . (Miller, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Requested as to Diane Sabatka-Rine regarding Complaint 1 . (Miller, Amy) (Entered: 12/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett assigned. (NMW) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-2844404), by Attorney Amy A. Miller on behalf of Joshua Franklin, Sr (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Miller, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less