This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 19:12:36 (UTC).

Fox et al v. DC Shoes, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Fox filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against DC Shoes, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are District Judge Richard Voorhees and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:14-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Richard Voorhees

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Joseph Fox

Dirtball Fashion, LLC

Defendants

Quiksilver, Inc.

DC Shoes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Kyle Rogers

P.O. Box 9096

Hickory, NC 28601

Defendant Attorneys

Carlo Frank Van den Bosch

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive, 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Matthew S. DeAntonio

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet

227 W. Trade Street, Suite 1550

Charlotte, NC 28202

Gazal June Pour-Moezzi

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive, 4Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

Corby C. Anderson

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1550

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against DC Shoes, Inc., Quiksilver, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2345500), filed by William Joseph Fox, Dirtball Fashion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#2

(#2) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (smj) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to DC Shoes, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cbb) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Quiksilver, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cbb) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Joseph Fox, Dirtball Fashion, LLC. DC Shoes, Inc. served on 6/20/2014, answer due 7/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Joseph Fox, Quiksilver, Inc. served on 6/20/2014, answer due 7/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Matthew) Modified on 7/2/2014 (smj). (Entered: 07/01/2014)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint, by DC Shoes, Inc., Quiksilver, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 07/09/2014)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. DC Shoes, Inc. answer due 8/1/2014; Quiksilver, Inc. answer due 8/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/10/14. (smj) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DC Shoes, Inc. (DeAntonio, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

#28

(#28) REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (smj) (Entered: 10/14/2014)

#27

(#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Dirtball Fashion, LLC, William Joseph Fox (Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 10/13/2014)

#26

(#26) Parties Notice of Settlement. COURT NOTICE to the Parties: Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 10/9/2014. (Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference. Parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference on or before 9/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/2/2014. (cbb) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

#24

(#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference ("Consent Motion") by Dirtball Fashion, LLC, William Joseph Fox.Responses due by 9/15/2014 (Rogers, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/29/2014)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time To File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference. The parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference on or before 8/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/22/14. (smj) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

#22

(#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference by Dirtball Fashion, LLC, William Joseph Fox.Responses due by 9/8/2014 (Rogers, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/22/2014)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DC Shoes, Inc., Quiksilver, Inc..(Anderson, Corby) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Carlo F. Van den Bosch for DC Shoes, Inc.; added Carlo F. Van den Bosch for Quiksilver, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/16/14. (smj) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) REPORT on the Determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (smj) (Entered: 10/14/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Dirtball Fashion, LLC, William Joseph Fox (Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 10/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Parties Notice of Settlement. COURT NOTICE to the Parties: Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 10/9/2014. (Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference. Parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference on or before 9/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/2/2014. (cbb) (Entered: 09/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Second MOTION for Extension of Time To File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference ("Consent Motion") by Dirtball Fashion, LLC, William Joseph Fox.Responses due by 9/15/2014 (Rogers, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time To File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference. The parties shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference on or before 8/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/22/14. (smj) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference by Dirtball Fashion, LLC, William Joseph Fox.Responses due by 9/8/2014 (Rogers, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 08/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by DC Shoes, Inc., Quiksilver, Inc..(Anderson, Corby) (Entered: 08/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Carlo F. Van den Bosch for DC Shoes, Inc.; added Carlo F. Van den Bosch for Quiksilver, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/16/14. (smj) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gazal Pour-Moezzi for DC Shoes, Inc.; added Gazal Pour-Moezzi for Quiksilver, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/16/14. (smj) (Entered: 07/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quiksilver, Inc. (DeAntonio, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DC Shoes, Inc. (DeAntonio, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. DC Shoes, Inc. answer due 8/1/2014; Quiksilver, Inc. answer due 8/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/10/14. (smj) (Entered: 07/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint, by DC Shoes, Inc., Quiksilver, Inc.. (DeAntonio, Matthew). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 07/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Joseph Fox, Quiksilver, Inc. served on 6/20/2014, answer due 7/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Matthew) Modified on 7/2/2014 (smj). (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by William Joseph Fox, Dirtball Fashion, LLC. DC Shoes, Inc. served on 6/20/2014, answer due 7/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Quiksilver, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cbb) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to DC Shoes, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cbb) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the Filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark numbers contained in complaint. (smj) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction against DC Shoes, Inc., Quiksilver, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2345500), filed by William Joseph Fox, Dirtball Fashion, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.