This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2016 at 13:55:50 (UTC).

FORTIN-BOLDUC v. WESTERN PETROLEUM COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2014 FORTIN-BOLDUC filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against WESTERN PETROLEUM COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON and JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON

Judge

JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISETTE FORTIN-BOLDUC

Defendants

MONTREAL MAINE & ATLANTIC RAILWAY LTD

EDWARD A BURKHARDT

PETROLEUM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC

WORLD FUEL SERVICES CORPORATION

DAKOTA PLAINS TRANSLOADING LLC

WESTERN PETROLEUM CO

DPTS MARKETING LLC

DAKOTA PLAINS MARKETING LLC

DAKOTA PETROLEUM TRANSPORT SOLUTIONS LLC

RAIL WORLD INC

Interested Party

OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF VICTIMS

Trustee

ROBERT J KEACH

Portland, ME 04104-5029

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE W. KURR, JR.

Attorney at GROSS, MINSKY & MOGUL, P.A.

P.O. Box 917

Bangor, ME 04402-0917

Defendant Attorneys

ALAN S. GILBERT

Attorney at DENTON US LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60613

STEVEN LAWRENCE MEROUSE

Attorney at DENTON US LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60613

PATRICK CARR MAXCY

Attorney at DENTON US LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60613

LESLIE M. SMITH

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

NEAL P. DONNELLY

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

JOSHUA D. HADIARIS

Attorney at NORMAN, HANSON & DETROY

Two Canal Plaza, P. O. Box 4600

Portland, ME 04112

PETER J. DETROY, III

Attorney at NORMAN, HANSON & DETROY

Two Canal Plaza, P. O. Box 4600, 774-7000

Portland, ME 04112

MARK FILIP

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

MICHAEL F. COCKSON

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

BRUCE G. JONES

Attorney at FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

MICHAEL J. KANUTE

Attorney at BAKER & DANIELS

311 South Wacker Drive, Suite 4400

Chicago, IL 60606

MICHAEL R. DOCKTERMAN

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

115 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60603

MEGAN COLLEEN HUGO

Attorney at EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

CAL R. BURNTON

Attorney at EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

EDWARD TIMOTHY WALKER

Attorney at EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

DONALD E. FRECHETTE

Attorney at EDWARDS ANGELL PALMER & DODGE LLP

20 Church Street, 20Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Interested Party Attorney

RICHARD P. OLSON

Attorney at PERKINS OLSON

32 Pleasant Street, Po Box 449

Portland, ME 04112-0449

Trustee Attorneys

ROBERT J. KEACH

Attorney at BERNSTEIN SHUR SAWYER & NELSON

100 Middle Street, West Tower, P.O. Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

MICHAEL A. FAGONE

Attorney at BERNSTEIN SHUR SAWYER & NELSON

100 Middle Street, West Tower, P.O. Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

9 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County - Law Division, case number (2013-L-008535) filed by Petroleum Transport Solutions, Western Petroleum Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8686196. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cook County Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Canadian Bankruptcy Court Order)(Smith, Leslie) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rail World, Inc., Edward A Burkhardt by Alan Scott Gilbert (Gilbert, Alan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#3

(#3) Consent and Joinder to Joint Notice of Removal by Edward A Burkhardt, Rail World, Inc. (Gilbert, Alan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#4

(#4) Consent to Joint Notice of Removal by Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC, DPTS Marketing, LLC (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DPTS Marketing, LLC, Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC by Edward Timothy Walker (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#6

(#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#7

(#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by DPTS Marketing, LLC (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DPTS Marketing, LLC, Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC by Michael R. Dockterman (Dockterman, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#9

(#9) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Leslie) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

#114

(#114) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephonic Motion Hearing held re 113 Second MOTION to Extend Time / Extend Settlement Deadline and Amendment Clarification Deadline filed by ROBERT J KEACH. (Court Reporter: FTR) (CWP) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

#115

(#115) ORDER granting 113 Motion to Extend Time to March 20, 2015. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

#116

(#116) STATUS REPORT / Chapter 11 Trustee's Report on Settlement Status by ROBERT J KEACH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Defendants)(MCKEON, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

#117

(#117) ORDER AMENDING AND RESTATING CONSENT ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL IN 1:13-mc-00184-NT re:( Status Report due by 5/22/2015.) By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

#118

(#118) MOTION by Attorney Michael A. Fagone to Withdraw as Attorney by ROBERT J KEACH Responses due by 4/22/2015. (FAGONE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#119

(#119) ORDER granting 118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#120

(#120) NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 6/4/2015 01:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

#121

(#121) NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Trustee's Omnibus Response to (A) Notice of Plaintiffs Annick Roy (O/B/O Jean-Guy Veilleux), Marie-Josee Grimard (O/B/O Henriette Latulippe) Terminating Stay and (B) Motion of Official Committee of Victims for Order, Pursuant to Court's March 23, 2015 Stay Order, to Reimpose Stay and Scheduling Hearing by ROBERT J KEACH (KEACH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

#122

(#122) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Oral Argument held on 6/4/2015. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (rmb) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Oral Argument held on 6/4/2015. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (rmb) (Entered: 06/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Trustee's Omnibus Response to (A) Notice of Plaintiffs Annick Roy (O/B/O Jean-Guy Veilleux), Marie-Josee Grimard (O/B/O Henriette Latulippe) Terminating Stay and (B) Motion of Official Committee of Victims for Order, Pursuant to Court's March 23, 2015 Stay Order, to Reimpose Stay and Scheduling Hearing by ROBERT J KEACH (KEACH, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 6/4/2015 01:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 2 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP) (Entered: 05/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) ORDER granting 118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) MOTION by Attorney Michael A. Fagone to Withdraw as Attorney by ROBERT J KEACH Responses due by 4/22/2015. (FAGONE, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) ORDER AMENDING AND RESTATING CONSENT ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPEAL IN 1:13-mc-00184-NT re:( Status Report due by 5/22/2015.) By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mjlt) (Entered: 03/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) STATUS REPORT / Chapter 11 Trustee's Report on Settlement Status by ROBERT J KEACH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Defendants)(MCKEON, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 03/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) ORDER granting 113 Motion to Extend Time to March 20, 2015. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephonic Motion Hearing held re 113 Second MOTION to Extend Time / Extend Settlement Deadline and Amendment Clarification Deadline filed by ROBERT J KEACH. (Court Reporter: FTR) (CWP) (Entered: 03/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) Second MOTION to Extend Time / Extend Settlement Deadline and Amendment Clarification Deadline by ROBERT J KEACH Responses due by 3/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Canadian Court's Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Canadian Motion, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(MCKEON, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 03/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Consent to Joint Notice of Removal by Dakota Plains Marketing, LLC, Dakota Plains Transloading, LLC (Cockson, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Leslie) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DPTS Marketing, LLC, Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC by Michael R. Dockterman (Dockterman, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by DPTS Marketing, LLC (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DPTS Marketing, LLC, Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC by Edward Timothy Walker (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent to Joint Notice of Removal by Dakota Petroleum Transport Solutions, LLC, DPTS Marketing, LLC (Walker, Edward) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent and Joinder to Joint Notice of Removal by Edward A Burkhardt, Rail World, Inc. (Gilbert, Alan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rail World, Inc., Edward A Burkhardt by Alan Scott Gilbert (Gilbert, Alan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County - Law Division, case number (2013-L-008535) filed by Petroleum Transport Solutions, Western Petroleum Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8686196. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cook County Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Canadian Bankruptcy Court Order)(Smith, Leslie) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/28/2014.] (Entered: 08/29/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less