This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 03:08:14 (UTC).

Fortenberry v. Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2015 Fortenberry filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Moncla Marine Operations, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby and Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-06747

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby

Judge

Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvin B. Fortenberry

Defendant

Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steve Jan Gordon

Attorney at Gordon, Elias & Seely

1811 Bering Drive, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77057

R. Todd Elias

Attorney at Gordon, Elias & Seely

1811 Bering Drive, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77057

Jeffrey Ragan Seely

Attorney at Gordon, Elias & Seely

1811 Bering Drive, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Cade Aaron Evans

Attorney at Allen & Gooch (Lafayette)

2000 Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 400, P. O. Box 81129

Lafayette, LA 70598-1129

Alan J. Meche

Attorney at Allen & Gooch (Lafayette)

2000 Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 400, P. O. Box 81129

Lafayette, LA 70598-1129

Randall K. Theunissen

Attorney at Allen & Gooch (Lafayette)

2000 Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 400, P. O. Box 81129

Lafayette, LA 70598-1129

Alan W. Stewart

Attorney at Allen & Gooch (Lafayette)

2000 Kaliste Saloom Rd., Suite 400, P. O. Box 81129

Lafayette, LA 70598-1129

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice R Todd Elias (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5168518) by Alvin B. Fortenberry. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit certificate of good standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gordon, Steve) Modified on 12/30/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.. (mmv) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (djg) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

#14

(#14) Exparte Motion by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C. of Withdrawal of Document. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meche, Alan) Modified event on 3/17/2016 (mmm). (Entered: 03/16/2016)

#11

(#11) ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT 12. Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C. (Meche, Alan) Modified on 3/16/2016 (mmm). (Entered: 03/15/2016)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C..Attorney Alan J. Meche added to party Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Meche, Alan) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

#16

(#16) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(bwn) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Todd Elias. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/4/2016. (cbs) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#5

(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeff Seely (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5168500) by Alvin B. Fortenberry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Gordon, Steve) Modified on 12/30/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Ragan Seely. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/4/2016. (cbs) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2017 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. All discovery must be completed by 11/23/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)[NEF: KWR](kac) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

#12

(#12) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C. (Meche, Alan) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

#4

(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint. Attachments have duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (mmv) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2016 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (kac) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(bwn) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2017 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt. All discovery must be completed by 11/23/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 3/24/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)[NEF: KWR](kac) (Entered: 03/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Exparte Motion by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C. of Withdrawal of Document. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meche, Alan) Modified event on 3/17/2016 (mmm). (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 11 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. This is a duplicate filing of document 12 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (mmm) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C. (Meche, Alan) (Entered: 03/16/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY OF DOCUMENT 12. Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C. (Meche, Alan) Modified on 3/16/2016 (mmm). (Entered: 03/15/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2016 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (kac) (Entered: 03/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C..Attorney Alan J. Meche added to party Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Meche, Alan) (Entered: 03/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Todd Elias. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/4/2016. (cbs) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Ragan Seely. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/4/2016. (cbs) (Entered: 01/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice R Todd Elias (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5168518) by Alvin B. Fortenberry. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit certificate of good standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gordon, Steve) Modified on 12/30/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeff Seely (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5168500) by Alvin B. Fortenberry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Gordon, Steve) Modified on 12/30/2015 (mmm). (Entered: 12/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 1 Complaint. Attachments have duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (mmv) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Moncla Marine Operations, L.L.C.. (mmv) (Entered: 12/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (djg) (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Alvin B. Fortenberry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)Attorney Steve Jan Gordon added to party Alvin B. Fortenberry(pty:pla).(Gordon, Steve) Modified on 12/15/2015 (mmv). (Entered: 12/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.