This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:23:53 (UTC).

Forseter et al v. Premera Blue Cross

Case Summary

On 03/31/2015 Forseter filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Premera Blue Cross. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Ricardo S Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00499

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Ricardo S Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kayla Joy Sherwood

Eric Forseter

Defendant

Premera Blue Cross

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lynn A Toops

Attorney at COHEN & MALAD

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 42604

Robert S Schachter

Attorney at ZWERLING SCHACHTER & ZWERLING LLP

41 Madison Ave, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Sona R Shah

Attorney at ZWERLING SCHACHTER & ZWERLING LLP

41 Madison Ave, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Richard E Shevitz

Attorney at COHEN & MALAD, LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Irwin B Levin

Attorney at COHEN & MALAD

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Dan Drachler

Attorney at ZWERLING SCHACHTER & ZWERLING

1904 3Rd Ave, Ste 1030

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Premera Blue Cross (Receipt # 0981-3963400) Attorney Dan Drachler added to party Eric Forseter(pty:pla), Attorney Dan Drachler added to party Kayla Joy Sherwood(pty:pla), filed by Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

#2

(#2) Summons electronically issued as to defendant Premera Blue Cross. (PM) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

#3

(#3) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/4/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Do not e-file your response. (PP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. The Court hereby RECUSES itself from presiding over the above-captioned matter. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to REASSIGN this case to another judicial officer. Case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Richard A Jones for all further proceedings. (LMK) Cc to RAJ (Entered: 04/02/2015)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert S. Schachter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967055 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#8

(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sona R. Shah FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967064 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#9

(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Irwin B. Levin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967071 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#13

(#13) ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sona R Shah for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#14

(#14) ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Irwin B Levin for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard E Shevitz for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#16

(#16) ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lynn A Toops for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

#17

(#17) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings; any future filings shall bear cause no C15-499RSM by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER STAYING CASES pending MDL Panel's determination on transfer and consolidation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

#19

(#19) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michele Rowe (CT Corporation Systems - Registered Agent for Premera Blue Cross) on 4/6/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

#20

(#20) NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION, ETC filed before MDL Panel re MDL 2633 in re Premera Blue Cross Customer Data Security Breach (RS) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

#21

(#21) MDL 2633 TRANSFER ORDER in re Premera Blue Cross Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; Oregon; assigned to Judge Michael H Simon. Clerk transferred case electronically through CM/ECF (RS) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MDL 2633 TRANSFER ORDER in re Premera Blue Cross Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; Oregon; assigned to Judge Michael H Simon. Clerk transferred case electronically through CM/ECF (RS) (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION, ETC filed before MDL Panel re MDL 2633 in re Premera Blue Cross Customer Data Security Breach (RS) (Entered: 04/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Michele Rowe (CT Corporation Systems - Registered Agent for Premera Blue Cross) on 4/6/2015, filed by Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER STAYING CASES pending MDL Panel's determination on transfer and consolidation by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S Martinez for all further proceedings; any future filings shall bear cause no C15-499RSM by Judge Richard A Jones. (RS) (Entered: 04/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER re 11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lynn A Toops for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER re 10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard E Shevitz for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re 9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Irwin B Levin for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re 8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sona R Shah for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert S Schachter for Eric Forseter and for Kayla Joy Sherwood, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard E. Shevitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967074 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Irwin B. Levin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967071 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sona R. Shah FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967064 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert S. Schachter FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3967055 (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 04/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. The Court hereby RECUSES itself from presiding over the above-captioned matter. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to REASSIGN this case to another judicial officer. Case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Richard A Jones for all further proceedings. (LMK) Cc to RAJ (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION OF CAMERAS IN THE COURTROOM. The Western District of Washington is participating in the Judiciary's Pilot Project on Cameras in the Courtroom. The project is a 3-year study to evaluate the effects of cameras in the courtrooms. This case is eligible to have proceedings video recorded and made available to the public via the U.S. Court's and Western District of Washington's web sites. Please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk for United States District Judge John C. Coughenour to indicate whether or not you agree to participate in the pilot project. If you should desire to participate, the court will require formal consent for the recording of each scheduled proceeding. Please contact the Courtroom Deputy at: paul_pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov. Do not e-file your response. (PP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case; 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc.; 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion; 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule; 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury; 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 8. Settlement probabilities; and 9. Whether the parties consent to proceed to trial before an assigned magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, arrangements may be made to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (206) 370-8805 at least TEN (10) days prior to the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 8/4/2015 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 04/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons electronically issued as to defendant Premera Blue Cross. (PM) (Entered: 04/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Premera Blue Cross (Receipt # 0981-3963400) Attorney Dan Drachler added to party Eric Forseter(pty:pla), Attorney Dan Drachler added to party Kayla Joy Sherwood(pty:pla), filed by Eric Forseter, Kayla Joy Sherwood. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/31/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less