This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2016 at 14:49:35 (UTC).

Forni v. Resnick, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2014 Forni filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Resnick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Donald C. Nugent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-01070

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Donald C. Nugent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Forni

Defendants

Emma Nichols

BradP.com

Model Mayhem.com

MUZU TV

Blush Gentlemen's Club

Joshua Resnick

Playboy Enterprises, Inc.

TC Avery

Results Radio LLC

John Doe Internet Pornography Company 1-8

KHRD-FM 103.1/93.3 FM Radio

Shutterstock, Inc.

Vegas Cabaret

Playboy Plus Entertainment, Inc.

Amazon.com, Inc.

Euclid Media Group

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. O'Shea

Attorney at O'Shea & Associates

19300 Detroit Road

Rocky River, OH 44116

Defendant Attorneys

Justin D. Flamm

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister - Cincinnati

1800 Firstar Tower, 425 Walnut Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Joyce V. Kimbler

Attorney at Ste. 502

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

Michael J. Spetrino

Attorney at Ste. 540

Two Summit Park Drive

Independence, OH 44131

Robert B. Sutherland

Attorney at Ste. 502

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

David A. Kunselman

Attorney at Miller Goler Faeges Lapine

1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Steven J. Miller

Attorney at Miller Goler Faeges Lapine

1301 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Steven G. Janik

Attorney at Janik - Cleveland

9200 South Hills Blvd.

Cleveland, OH 44147

Deepak Gupta

Attorney at Farella, Braun & Martel

17Th Floor, 235 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nathaniel B. Webb

Attorney at Hahn, Loeser & Parks - Akron

One Gojo Plaza

Akron, OH 44311

Michael P. Sherban

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Robert E. Chudakoff

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Other Attorneys

Laith D. Mosely

Attorney at Raines Feldman

5Th Floor, 9720 Wilshire Blvd.

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Miles J. Feldman

Attorney at Raines Feldman

5Th Floor, 9720 Wilshire Blvd.

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#83

#84

#85

#86

#87

#88

#89

#90

#91

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Order Dismissing Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) Motion to excuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Motion for extension of time to answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Position Statement re: Case Management Conference Agenda filed by Shutterstock, Inc.. (Kunselman, David) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Response to 82 Second Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Shutterstock, Inc.. (Kunselman, David) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Second Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Nicole Forni. (O'Shea, Michael) (Entered: 09/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Blush Strip Club on 6/14/2014, filed on behalf of Nicole Forni. Related document(s) 3 . (K,K) (Entered: 06/16/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Exhibit(s) B to First Amended Complaint filed by Nicole Forni. Related document(s) 5 . (O'Shea, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Exhibit(s) A to First Amended Complaint filed by Nicole Forni. Related document(s) 5 . (O'Shea, Michael) (Entered: 06/10/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR, to be refiled. Request to Clerk for service upon TayaChat by certified mail. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) 5 . (O'Shea, Michael) Modified text 6/11/2014 (C,KA). (Entered: 06/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR, to be refiled. Request to Clerk for service upon Euclid Media Group by certified mail. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) 5 . (O'Shea, Michael) Modified text 6/11/2014 (C,KA). (Entered: 06/09/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Euclid Media Group and TayaChat. Filed by Nicole Forni. (O'Shea, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by Nicole Forni. (O'Shea, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Amazon.com, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., Blush Gentlemen's Club, Blush Strip Club, Clear Channel Communications, Inc., Clover Holdings Limited, Fabulous Vegas Escorts.com, MUZU TV, Model Mayhem.com, Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Playboy Plus Entertainment, Inc., Joshua Resnick, Results Radio LLC, Shutterstock, Inc., UPROXX Media, Inc., Vegas Cabaret, Wallsheaven, Inc., and Edward Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (K,K) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Exhibit(s) A and B to Complaint filed by Nicole Forni. Related document(s) 1 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Resnick Document, # 2 Exhibit TOS Agreement)(O'Shea, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2014, copy of complaint accompanies these exhibits (R,N). (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-6549329. Filed by Nicole Forni. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and all current summons) (O'Shea, Michael) Modified text 5/19/2014 (K,K). (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Results Radio is a litigant

Latest cases where Shutterstock.com is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAYBOY ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant