This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2016 at 05:15:54 (UTC).

Fontem Ventures B.V. et al v. CB Distributors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2014 Fontem Ventures B filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner and Judge George H. Wu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:14-CV-01649

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner

Judge

Judge George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fontem Ventures B.V.

Fontem Holdings 1 B.V.

Defendants

CB Distributors, Inc.

DR Distributors, LLC

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J Song

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Michael Jonathan Wise

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Joseph P Hamilton

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Lauren C Sliger

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Lara J Dueppen

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole M Smith

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Alex S Yap

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Dylan James Raife

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13469527 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Ventures B.V., Fontem Holdings 1 B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Attorney Michael Jonathan Wise added to party Fontem Holdings 1 B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Jonathan Wise added to party Fontem Ventures B.V.(pty:pla))(Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#4

(#4) Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V., (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. Related Case(s): CV11-0367; CV11-6268; CV12-5454; CV12-5455; CV12-5456; CV12-5462; CV12-5466; CV12-5468; CV12-5470; CV12-5472; CV12-5477; CV12-5482; CV14-1645; CV14-1648 (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#6

(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 03/06/2014)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants CB Distributors, Inc., DR Distributors, LLC. (et) (Entered: 03/06/2014)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Gary A. Feess, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 11-00367 GAF(FFMx) (rn) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

#34

(#34) Second Revised Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Hamilton, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

#35

(#35) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph P. Hamilton, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Hamilton, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Decision: Final Written Decision in the Inter Partes Review of Related U.S. Patent No. 8,156,944 B2 filed by Defendants CB Distributors, Inc., DR Distributors, LLC. (Smith, Nicole) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

#37

(#37) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND CONTINUE THE CASE SCHEDULE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a scheduling conference for CV14-8144 on January 22, 2015 at 8:30 a.m., to coincidewith the claim construction hearing in CV 14-01645. In their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, which shall be filed no later than January 15, 2015, the parties shall discuss whether it is possible to implement a schedule for the second and third wave cases that is sufficiently accelerated to warrant consolidating allthree waves. Plaintiff shall serve infringement contentions in the consolidated second and third wave cases, CV14-8144, no later than January 12, 2015. (See minute order for further consolidations details on the first wave) IT IS SO ORDERED. Cases associated with Lead Case CV-14-1645-GW(MRWx) (yl) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

#38

(#38) MINUTES OF TUTORIAL HEARING: Tutoria; Hearing Held. Court hears argument. held before Judge George H. Wu:, Defendants will have until January 13, 2015, to file a two-page brief regarding the recent decision made by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. Plaintiffs response will be due on or before January 16, 2015. The Markman Hearing remains set for January 22, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (shb) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#39

(#39) MINUTES OF CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer. The Court adopts the attached Order re Disputes in Joint Scheduling Conference Report as its Final Order. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will now be filed under Fontem Ventures, B.V., et al. v. NJOY, Inc., et al., CV 14-1645-GW(MRWx). Counsel will be required to file a Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic service of all subsequent filings. The Courts Tentative Rulings on Claims Construction is also circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Claims Construction Hearing is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its ruling.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

#40

(#40) ORDER GRANTING in part Joint Stipulation Regarding Motion Limits by Judge George H. Wu, as follows: The Court orders the following motion limits for Motions due on 9/17/2015. (See attachment Order for further details). (jp) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

#41

(#41) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wise, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

#42

(#42) ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Fontem Ventures B.V. and Fontem Holdings 1 B.V. (together, "Fontem") and Defendants CB Distributors, Inc. and DR Distributors, LLC (together, "CB/DR"), the Court hereby ORDERS as follows:1. All claims and counterclaims between Fontem and CB/DR in Case No. CV14-1649 shall be dismissed without prejudice. 2. Fontem and CB/DR shall each bear its own fees and costs. 3. The Court shall retain jurisdiction of this case for the sole purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement between Fontem and CB/DR. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (cr) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Fontem Ventures B.V. and Fontem Holdings 1 B.V. (together, "Fontem") and Defendants CB Distributors, Inc. and DR Distributors, LLC (together, "CB/DR"), the Court hereby ORDERS as follows:1. All claims and counterclaims between Fontem and CB/DR in Case No. CV14-1649 shall be dismissed without prejudice. 2. Fontem and CB/DR shall each bear its own fees and costs. 3. The Court shall retain jurisdiction of this case for the sole purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement between Fontem and CB/DR. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (cr) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wise, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ORDER GRANTING in part Joint Stipulation Regarding Motion Limits by Judge George H. Wu, as follows: The Court orders the following motion limits for Motions due on 9/17/2015. (See attachment Order for further details). (jp) (Entered: 09/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTES OF CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer. The Court adopts the attached Order re Disputes in Joint Scheduling Conference Report as its Final Order. Parties are advised that all subsequent filings will now be filed under Fontem Ventures, B.V., et al. v. NJOY, Inc., et al., CV 14-1645-GW(MRWx). Counsel will be required to file a Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic service of all subsequent filings. The Courts Tentative Rulings on Claims Construction is also circulated and attached hereto. Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, the Claims Construction Hearing is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue its ruling.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MINUTES OF TUTORIAL HEARING: Tutoria; Hearing Held. Court hears argument. held before Judge George H. Wu:, Defendants will have until January 13, 2015, to file a two-page brief regarding the recent decision made by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. Plaintiffs response will be due on or before January 16, 2015. The Markman Hearing remains set for January 22, 2015 at 9:30 a.m.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (shb) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND CONTINUE THE CASE SCHEDULE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a scheduling conference for CV14-8144 on January 22, 2015 at 8:30 a.m., to coincidewith the claim construction hearing in CV 14-01645. In their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, which shall be filed no later than January 15, 2015, the parties shall discuss whether it is possible to implement a schedule for the second and third wave cases that is sufficiently accelerated to warrant consolidating allthree waves. Plaintiff shall serve infringement contentions in the consolidated second and third wave cases, CV14-8144, no later than January 12, 2015. (See minute order for further consolidations details on the first wave) IT IS SO ORDERED. Cases associated with Lead Case CV-14-1645-GW(MRWx) (yl) (Entered: 12/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Decision: Final Written Decision in the Inter Partes Review of Related U.S. Patent No. 8,156,944 B2 filed by Defendants CB Distributors, Inc., DR Distributors, LLC. (Smith, Nicole) (Entered: 12/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph P. Hamilton, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Hamilton, Joseph) (Entered: 12/22/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Second Revised Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Hamilton, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES the Tutorial hearing set for December 4, 2014, to January 8, 2015 at 8:30 a.m. The Markman Hearing set for December 15, 2014 is CONTINUED to January 22, 2015 at 08:30 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to DR Distributors, LLC answer now due 5/2/2014; CB Distributors, Inc. answer now due 5/2/2014, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants DR Distributors, LLC; CB Distributors, Inc..(Attorney Nicole M Smith added to party CB Distributors, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole M Smith added to party DR Distributors, LLC(pty:dft))(Smith, Nicole) (Entered: 03/21/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Gary A. Feess, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 11-00367 GAF(FFMx) (rn) (Entered: 03/13/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants CB Distributors, Inc., DR Distributors, LLC. (et) (Entered: 03/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) (Entered: 03/06/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. Related Case(s): CV11-0367; CV11-6268; CV12-5454; CV12-5455; CV12-5456; CV12-5462; CV12-5466; CV12-5468; CV12-5470; CV12-5472; CV12-5477; CV12-5482; CV14-1645; CV14-1648 (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V., (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Holdings 1 B.V., Fontem Ventures B.V.. (Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13469527 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Fontem Ventures B.V., Fontem Holdings 1 B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Attorney Michael Jonathan Wise added to party Fontem Holdings 1 B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Jonathan Wise added to party Fontem Ventures B.V.(pty:pla))(Wise, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CB Distributors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Song

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Sliger