This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:45:15 (UTC).

Finnavations, LLC v. Alliance Bank

Case Summary

On 04/13/2015 Finnavations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alliance Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant

Finnavations, LLC

Counter Claimants

Prosperity Bancshares, Inc.

Frost Bank

Alliance Bank

Consolidated Defendants

First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company

JPMorgan Chase, National Association

The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.

Silicon Valley Bank

US Bank, National Association

HSBC Bank USA, National Association

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BBVA Compass Financial Corporation

First Republic Bank

Keycorp Finance, Inc.

Capital One, National Association

Citizens Financial Group, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

David Folsom

Texarkana, TX 75503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant Attorney

Jay Brett Johnson

Consolidated Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Matias Ferrario

Michael E Jones

J Stephen Ravel

Kevin Lowell Daffer

Benjamin K Thompson

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC - Atlanta

1180 Peachtree Street Ne, 21St Floor

Atlanta, GA 30309

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Kevin Eugene Cadwell

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP - Houston

811 Main Street, 17Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002-6119

Tonya M. Gray

Attorney at Andrews Kurth LLP

1717 Main St, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

Joshua L Raskin

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - New York

200 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Scott J Bornstein

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - New York

200 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Allan A Kassenoff

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - New York

200 Park Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Mary-Olga Lovett

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Ryan K Yagura

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - LA

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West - San Francisco

555 California Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Scott English Stevens

Attorney at Stevens Henry, PLLC

222 N. Fredonia Street, P O Box 3427

Longview, TX 75606

Maya Miriam Eckstein

Attorney at Hunton & Williams - Richmond

951 East Byrd St, Riverfront Plaza, East Tower

Richmond, VA 23219-4074

Jason Woodard Cook

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP - Dallas

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Shaun William Hassett

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP - Dallas

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

David Folsom

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

6002-B Summerfield Drive

Texarkana, TX 75503

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Alliance Bank. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

#131

(#131) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant First Republic Bank by Finnavations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Alliance Bank answer due 7/15/2015.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#4

(#4) ***FILED IN ERROR.***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alliance Bank.( Ferrario, Matias) Modified on 6/15/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#128

(#128) ORDER granting 125 Motion to Dismiss Defendant First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on February 23, 2016. (jml) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#135

(#135) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#129

(#129) ORDER granting 124 Motion to Dismiss Compass Bank D/B/A BBVA Compass. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on February 23, 2016. (jml) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#130

(#130) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Alliance Bank by Finnavations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#7

(#7) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-CV-00479. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#3

(#3) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alliance Bank.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by First Republic Bank (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#134

(#134) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alliance Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrario, Matias) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

#133

(#133) ORDER granting 130 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/24/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of First Republic Bank (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

#127

(#127) ORDER granting 126 Motion to Dismiss PNC Financial Services Group. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on February 23, 2016. (jml) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#132

(#132) ORDER granting 131 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant First Republic Bank filed by Finnavations, LLC., First Republic Bank (Consolidated from case 2:15-cv-487) terminated., Attorney Michael J Sacksteder; Matias Ferrario and Michael E Jones terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/24/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#135) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) ORDER granting 130 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/24/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) ORDER granting 131 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant First Republic Bank filed by Finnavations, LLC., First Republic Bank (Consolidated from case 2:15-cv-487) terminated., Attorney Michael J Sacksteder; Matias Ferrario and Michael E Jones terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/24/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant First Republic Bank by Finnavations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Alliance Bank by Finnavations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) ORDER granting 124 Motion to Dismiss Compass Bank D/B/A BBVA Compass. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on February 23, 2016. (jml) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ORDER granting 125 Motion to Dismiss Defendant First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on February 23, 2016. (jml) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) ORDER granting 126 Motion to Dismiss PNC Financial Services Group. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on February 23, 2016. (jml) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The PNC Financial Services Group by Finnavations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by First Republic Bank. Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by First Republic Bank (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of First Republic Bank (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-CV-00479. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/29/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Alliance Bank answer due 7/15/2015.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/25/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alliance Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrario, Matias) (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ***FILED IN ERROR.***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alliance Bank.( Ferrario, Matias) Modified on 6/15/2015 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alliance Bank.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Alliance Bank. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Alliance Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5147123.), filed by Finnavations, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 04/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.