This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 08:40:20 (UTC).

Financial Corporation of America v. HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2015 Financial Corporation of America filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Financial Corporation of America, Inc.

Defendants

HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc.

Rural Community Hospitals of America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James J. Thorpe

Attorney at Bush and Ramirez, PLLC

5615 Kirby Dr., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77046

Ed Walton

Attorney at Bush & Ramirez, LLC.

5615 Kirby Drive, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77005

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Wayne Lemmon

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Rhonda Bear Mates

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Ave, Ste 1400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

No Description Available

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Financial Corporation of America. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc., Rural Community Hospitals of America, LLC. (os) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Financial Corporation of America, Inc.. HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc. served on 1/13/2015, answer due 2/3/2015. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Financial Corporation of America, Inc.. Rural Community Hospitals of America, LLC served on 1/20/2015, answer due 2/10/2015. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc. to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc.. (Lemmon, Stephen) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc..(Lemmon, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#8

(#8) Letter/Correspondence regarding admissions status of John K. Power. (dm) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing Agreed Judgment by Financial Corporation of America, Inc. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Financial Corporation of America, Inc. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting Agreed Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

#12

(#12) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

#13

(#13) SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Financial Corporation of America, Inc.. (Thorpe, James) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Financial Corporation of America, Inc.. (Thorpe, James) (Entered: 06/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Granting Agreed Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 03/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Financial Corporation of America, Inc. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Filing Agreed Judgment by Financial Corporation of America, Inc. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 03/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter/Correspondence regarding admissions status of John K. Power. (dm) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint by HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc..(Lemmon, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc. to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc.. (Lemmon, Stephen) (Entered: 02/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Financial Corporation of America, Inc.. Rural Community Hospitals of America, LLC served on 1/20/2015, answer due 2/10/2015. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 02/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Financial Corporation of America, Inc.. HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc. served on 1/13/2015, answer due 2/3/2015. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 01/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to HMC/CAH Consolidated, Inc., Rural Community Hospitals of America, LLC. (os) (Entered: 01/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Financial Corporation of America. (Walton, Ed) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7113557), filed by Financial Corporation of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walton, Ed) (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less