This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 14:14:40 (UTC).

Filtalert Corporation v. International Business Machines Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2015 Filtalert Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against International Business Machines Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:15-CV-00276

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Counter Defendant

Filtalert Corporation

Respondents and Counter Claimants

Lenovo (United States) Inc.

International Business Machines Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jose Salvador Talavera(Designation Retained)

Michael Keith Lipscomb(Designation Retained)

Michael John Byrne

Angela Marie Lipscomb

Respondent and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Raymond M. Bennett

Fred I Williams(Designation Retained)

Kellie M. Johnson(Designation Retained)

Eric J. Klein(Designation Retained)

Darrell Winston Payne

Todd Eric Landis(Designation Retained)

Ashley Edison Brown(Designation Retained)

Hayden J. Silver, III

Paul Courtney Huck, Jr.

Chijioke E. Offor(Designation Retained)

Hilda C. Galvan(Designation Retained)

Robert J. Morris

 

Court Documents

#60

(#60) ORDER granting 32 Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of North Carolina. This action is transferred in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. All other motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/29/2015. (zvr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/30/2015.]

#81

(#81) ORDER granting 70 Motion to Lift the Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/19/2016. The parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) meeting in accordance with this court's April 7, 2016 order. See 80 . (Briggeman, N.)

#119

(#119) Order Dismissing Case pursuant to 118 Stipulation of Dismissal - Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/17/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

#109

(#109) ORDER denying 89 Motion to Strike; denying 33 Motion to Strike; denying 38 Motion to dismiss; denying 91 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/22/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) Order Dismissing Case pursuant to 118 Stipulation of Dismissal - Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/17/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) ORDER denying 89 Motion to Strike; denying 33 Motion to Strike; denying 38 Motion to dismiss; denying 91 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/22/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) ORDER granting 70 Motion to Lift the Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/19/2016. The parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) meeting in accordance with this court's April 7, 2016 order. See 80 . (Briggeman, N.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER granting 32 Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of North Carolina. This action is transferred in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. All other motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED in this District. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/29/2015. (zvr) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/30/2015.]

    Read MoreRead Less