This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2016 at 18:09:44 (UTC).

Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. v. Intramco, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2015 Ferguson Fire Fabrication, Inc filed a Contract - Miller Act lawsuit against Intramco, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:15-CV-00400

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Miller Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Judge

District Judge Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Cross Claimant

Tyler Construction Group, Inc.

Cross Defendant

Intramco, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Byron L. Saintsing

Attorney at Smith Debnam Narron Drake Saintsing & Myers, L.L.P.

4601 Six Forks Rd., Suite 400, P. O. Box 26268

Raleigh, NC 27611

Cross Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Matthew E. Cox

 

Court Documents

#1

No Description Available

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C-Payment Bond

1 #1

Exhibit A- Credit Application

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#3

(#3) Notice filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. regarding 1 Complaint, Summons as to Defendant Intramco, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#4

(#4) Notice filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. regarding 1 Complaint, Summons as to Defendant Tyler Construction Group, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#5

(#5) Notice filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. regarding 1 Complaint, Summons as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Intramco, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Tyler Construction Group, Inc. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Intramco, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on August 24, 2015 and August 27, 2015, filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew E. Cox on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Tyler Construction Group, Inc.. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Intramco, Inc. by Tyler Construction Group, Inc.. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#12

(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#13

(#13) Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyler Construction Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tyler Construction Group, Inc. for Tyler Construction Group, Inc... (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendant Intramco, Inc. filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#15

(#15) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 9/28/2015. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 9/28/2015. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendant Intramco, Inc. filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Financial Disclosure Statement by Tyler Construction Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tyler Construction Group, Inc. for Tyler Construction Group, Inc... (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Intramco, Inc. by Tyler Construction Group, Inc.. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew E. Cox on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Tyler Construction Group, Inc.. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Cox, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Intramco, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on August 24, 2015 and August 27, 2015, filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Intramco, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Tyler Construction Group, Inc. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Romine, L.) (Entered: 08/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent Wolseley PLC for Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc... (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. regarding 1 Complaint, Summons as to Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. regarding 1 Complaint, Summons as to Defendant Tyler Construction Group, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc. regarding 1 Complaint, Summons as to Defendant Intramco, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Byron L. Saintsing on behalf of Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-3390326.), filed by Ferguson Fire & Fabrication, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Credit Application, # 2 Exhibit B- Statement of Account, # 3 Exhibit C-Payment Bond, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Saintsing, Byron) (Entered: 08/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less