This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2016 at 12:18:45 (UTC).

Femto Sec Tech, Inc. v. Bausch & Lomb Inc

Case Summary

On 10/20/2015 Femto Sec Tech, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bausch Lomb Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-01687

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Femto Sec Tech, Inc.

Intervenor Plaintiff

Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC

Defendant

Bausch & Lomb Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip J Graves

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Cathy C Shyong

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Cam T Phan

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Amy K Van Zant

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Suttcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Siddhartha M Venkatesan

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 10/20/2015, receipt number 25O0U0FL), filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Philip J Graves added to party Femto Sec Tech, Inc.(pty:pla))(Graves, Philip) Modified on 10/21/2015 (twdb). correct receipt number 0973-16648944 (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc., identifying Joseph Neev. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:15-cv-624-JVS-JCG; 8:15-cv-01551-JVS-JCG. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (twdb) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Barbara Mahoney for Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (twdb) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV15-336 JVS (JCGx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV15-1687 JVS (JCGx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi (twdb) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

#28

(#28) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

#27

(#27) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC. upon Bausch & Lomb Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/17/2016, answer due 4/18/2016. Waiver of Service signed by David Clonts. (Van Zant, Amy) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

#26

(#26) MINUTES OF Scheduling/Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court ORDERS all actions consolidated through the Markman/Claim Construction hearing. The Court continues and sets the Markman/Claim Construction Hearing, for all actions, to August 22, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The Court sets a Status Conference regarding the terms to be construed for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall submit a Joint Status Report (including a date for a technology tutorial) by May 31, 2016. The Court CONTINUES/SETS the Scheduling Conference in the following cases for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. (See document for details.) The Court lifts any stay regarding discovery as discussed on the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (mt) (Entered: 02/20/2016)

#25

(#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC, served on February 18, 2016. (Phan, Cam) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#24

(#24) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Intervenor Complaint 19 as to defendant Bausch & Lomb Inc. (dg) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

#23

(#23) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Intervenor Complaint 19 filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC. (Van Zant, Amy) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cam T Phan on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC (Phan, Cam) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cathy C Shyong on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC (Shyong, Cathy) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Siddhartha M Venkatesan on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC (Venkatesan, Siddhartha) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/25/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC. upon Bausch & Lomb Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/17/2016, answer due 4/18/2016. Waiver of Service signed by David Clonts. (Van Zant, Amy) (Entered: 02/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MINUTES OF Scheduling/Status Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: The Court ORDERS all actions consolidated through the Markman/Claim Construction hearing. The Court continues and sets the Markman/Claim Construction Hearing, for all actions, to August 22, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. The Court sets a Status Conference regarding the terms to be construed for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall submit a Joint Status Report (including a date for a technology tutorial) by May 31, 2016. The Court CONTINUES/SETS the Scheduling Conference in the following cases for June 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. (See document for details.) The Court lifts any stay regarding discovery as discussed on the record. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (mt) (Entered: 02/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC, served on February 18, 2016. (Phan, Cam) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Intervenor Complaint 19 as to defendant Bausch & Lomb Inc. (dg) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Intervenor Complaint 19 filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC. (Van Zant, Amy) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cam T Phan on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC (Phan, Cam) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cathy C Shyong on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC (Shyong, Cathy) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Siddhartha M Venkatesan on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC (Venkatesan, Siddhartha) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Defendant Bausch & Lomb Inc, filed by Plaintiff-Intervenor Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC.(Van Zant, Amy) (Entered: 02/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV15-336 JVS (JCGx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV15-1687 JVS (JCGx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi (twdb) (Entered: 10/22/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Barbara Mahoney for Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (twdb) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (twdb) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (twdb) (Entered: 10/21/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:15-cv-624-JVS-JCG; 8:15-cv-01551-JVS-JCG. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc., identifying Joseph Neev. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 10/20/2015, receipt number 25O0U0FL), filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Philip J Graves added to party Femto Sec Tech, Inc.(pty:pla))(Graves, Philip) Modified on 10/21/2015 (twdb). correct receipt number 0973-16648944 (Entered: 10/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.