This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2016 at 13:09:13 (UTC).

Femto Sec Tech Inc v. Alcon Laboratories Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2015 Femto Sec Tech Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Alcon Laboratories Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:15-CV-01551

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Counter Defendant and Cross Defendant

Femto Sec Tech Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Alcon Laboratories Inc

Wavelight GmbH

Counter Defendants, Cross Claimants and Cross Defendants

Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC

Femto Sec Tech Inc

Counter Defendant and Cross Claimant

Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC

Cross Defendants and Counter Defendants

Dr Joseph Neev

Femto Sec Tech Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Philip J Graves

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 North Lake Avenue Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Greer N Shaw

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

301 Lake Avenue, Suite 203

Pasadena, CA 91101

Siddhartha M Venkatesan

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Amy K Van Zant

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Suttcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Cathy C Shyong

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Cam T Phan

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Eric Martin Acker

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster

12531 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130-2040

John Robert Lanham

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive Suite 100

San Deigo, CA 92130

Mary Prendergast

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Chika Arakawa

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

12531 High Bluff Drive Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16511143 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Philip J Graves added to party Femto Sec Tech, Inc.(pty:pla))(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc., identifying Joseph Neev. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:15-cv-336-JVS-JCG, 8:15-cv-624-JVS-JCG (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Ivy Arai Tabbara for Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Barbara Mahoney for Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

#40

(#40) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Crossclaim filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#41

(#41) ORDER Extending Time for Femto-Sec Tech Inc to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Counterclaims 40 by Judge James V. Selna: This matter comes before the Court on the Stipulation to Extend Time for Femto-Sec Tech Inc. to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims. Upon consideration of said stipulation the relief requested by the parties is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech Inc. to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 8, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#42

(#42) ANSWER to Crossclaim and counterclaim of Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC's filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Alcon Laboratories Inc, Alcon Laboratories Inc.(Acker, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#43

(#43) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Femto Sec Tech Inc answer now due 2/15/2016, re Answer to Counterclaim, 31 filed by crossdefendant Femto Sec Tech Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Philip J Graves added to party Femto Sec Tech Inc(pty:crd))(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#44

(#44) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting Stipulation Extending Time for Femto-Sec Tech. Inc. to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims 43 . The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech. Inc. to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 15, 2016. (mt) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#45

(#45) ORDER Extending Time For Femto-Sec Tech Inc to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims 43 by Judge James V. Selna: This matter comes before the Court on the Stipulation for an Order Extending Time to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims. Upon consideration of said stipulation the relief requested by the parties is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech Inc to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 15, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

#46

(#46) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Femto Sec Tech Inc answer now due 2/19/2016, re Crossclaim filed by crossdefendant Femto Sec Tech Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#47

(#47) ORDER Extending Time for Femto Sec Tech to Respond 46 by Judge James V. Selna: This matter comes before the Court on the Stipulation for an Order Extending Time to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims. Upon consideration of said stipulation the relief requested by the parties is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech Inc to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 19, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#48

(#48) Crossdefendants Femto-Sec Tech, Inc. and Joseph Neev's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC filed by crossdefendant Femto Sec Tech Inc.(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Crossdefendants Femto-Sec Tech, Inc. and Joseph Neev's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC filed by crossdefendant Femto Sec Tech Inc.(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER Extending Time for Femto Sec Tech to Respond 46 by Judge James V. Selna: This matter comes before the Court on the Stipulation for an Order Extending Time to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims. Upon consideration of said stipulation the relief requested by the parties is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech Inc to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 19, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Femto Sec Tech Inc answer now due 2/19/2016, re Crossclaim filed by crossdefendant Femto Sec Tech Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER Extending Time For Femto-Sec Tech Inc to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims 43 by Judge James V. Selna: This matter comes before the Court on the Stipulation for an Order Extending Time to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims. Upon consideration of said stipulation the relief requested by the parties is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech Inc to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 15, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 02/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting Stipulation Extending Time for Femto-Sec Tech. Inc. to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims 43 . The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech. Inc. to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 15, 2016. (mt) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Femto Sec Tech Inc answer now due 2/15/2016, re Answer to Counterclaim, 31 filed by crossdefendant Femto Sec Tech Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Philip J Graves added to party Femto Sec Tech Inc(pty:crd))(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ANSWER to Crossclaim and counterclaim of Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC's filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Alcon Laboratories Inc, Alcon Laboratories Inc.(Acker, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER Extending Time for Femto-Sec Tech Inc to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Counterclaims 40 by Judge James V. Selna: This matter comes before the Court on the Stipulation to Extend Time for Femto-Sec Tech Inc. to Respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims. Upon consideration of said stipulation the relief requested by the parties is GRANTED. The deadline for Plaintiff Femto-Sec Tech Inc. to respond to Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC's Crossclaims is extended to February 8, 2016. (lwag) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Crossclaim filed by plaintiff Femto Sec Tech Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Counterclaimant and Crossclaimant Lawrence Livermore National Security LLC. upon Dr Joseph Neev waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/22/2016, answer due 3/22/2016. Waiver of Service signed by Joseph Neev. (Van Zant, Amy) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV15-00336 JVS (JCGx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV15-01551 JVS (JCGx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (lwag) (Entered: 09/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Barbara Mahoney for Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application emailed to Ivy Arai Tabbara for Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lwag) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:15-cv-336-JVS-JCG, 8:15-cv-624-JVS-JCG (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc., identifying Joseph Neev. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-16511143 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Femto Sec Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Philip J Graves added to party Femto Sec Tech, Inc.(pty:pla))(Graves, Philip) (Entered: 09/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less