This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2016 at 00:03:05 (UTC).

Federal Trade Commission v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2014 Federal Trade Commission filed an Other lawsuit against AT T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Hon. Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:14-CV-04785

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Judge

Hon. Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Trade Commission

Defendant

AT&T Mobility LLC

Interested Party

Marcus A. Roberts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lin Wang Kahn

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Eric David Edmondson

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Laura Fremont

Attorney at Federal Trade Commision

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Maricela Segura

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

10877 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 700

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Evan Rose

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Linda Katherine Badger

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Kerry O'Brien

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

David Michael Newman

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Matthew David Gold

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

901 Market Street, Suite 570

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Stark Softness

Attorney at Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans and Figel, PLLC

1615 M St. Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Douglas Warren Sullivan

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

275 Battery Street, 23Rd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark C. Hansen

Attorney at Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

1615 M. Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-3209

David Lloyd Anderson

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 California Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael K. Kellogg

Attorney at Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans and Figel, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Kenneth M. Fetterman

Attorney at Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Interested Party Attorney

Nicole Diane Sugnet

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Rose, Evan) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#3

(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/29/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Edmondson for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Edmondson, Eric) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry O'Brien for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (O'Brien, Kerry) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Gold for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Gold, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

#97

(#97) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint CMS filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Rose, Evan) (Filed on 1/14/2016) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#98

(#98) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2016. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time 10:33-10:53. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2016) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

#99

(#99) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Federal Trade Commission for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 1/27/2016) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

#100

(#100) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

#101

(#101) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 10:33-10:53, held on 01/22/2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 10:33-10:53. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 99 Transcript Order, 100 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2016. (Related documents(s) 99 , 100 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 2/1/2016) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

#102

(#102) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend the Deadline to File a Joint Proposal for Phased Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation)(Fetterman, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#103

(#103) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend the Deadline to File a Joint Proposal for Phased Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#104

(#104) Statement re 98 Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Further Joint Statement & [Proposed] Order Regarding Phased Discovery by Federal Trade Commission. (Rose, Evan) (Filed on 2/11/2016) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#105

(#105) NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Regarding Scheduling of Ninth Circuit Oral Argument (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Kellogg, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2016) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Regarding Scheduling of Ninth Circuit Oral Argument (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Kellogg, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2016) (Entered: 03/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) Statement re 98 Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Further Joint Statement & [Proposed] Order Regarding Phased Discovery by Federal Trade Commission. (Rose, Evan) (Filed on 2/11/2016) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) STIPULATION AND ORDER re 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend the Deadline to File a Joint Proposal for Phased Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend the Deadline to File a Joint Proposal for Phased Discovery filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation)(Fetterman, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/4/2016) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 10:33-10:53, held on 01/22/2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 10:33-10:53. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 99 Transcript Order, 100 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2016. (Related documents(s) 99 , 100 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 2/1/2016) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Federal Trade Commission for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kahn, Lin) (Filed on 1/27/2016) (Entered: 01/27/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2016. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time 10:33-10:53. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2016) (Entered: 01/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint CMS filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Rose, Evan) (Filed on 1/14/2016) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, February 24, 2016, at 11:30 AM Pacific time with new call-in information. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Katherine Badger for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Badger, Linda) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Gold for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Gold, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry O'Brien for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (O'Brien, Kerry) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Edmondson for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Edmondson, Eric) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/29/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014) (Entered: 10/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Rose, Evan) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC. Filed byFederal Trade Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rose, Evan) (Filed on 10/28/2014) (Entered: 10/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less