This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2016 at 12:40:18 (UTC).

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2015 Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-01338

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Judge

Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Federal National Mortgage Association

Federal Housing finance Agency

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

Las Vegas Development Group, LLC

Nevada New Builds, LLC

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC

Sonora Hills Homeowners Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robin E Perkins

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Asim Varma

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Dana Jonathon Nitz

Attorney at Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP

7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89117

David Bergman

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

555 12Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Elliott C. Mogul

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Howard Cayne

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

John D. Tennert

Attorney at Fennemore Craig, P.C.

300 E. Second St., Suite 1510

Reno, NV 89501

Jory C. Garabedian

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE, LLP

520 South 4Th Street, Suite 360

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Leslie Bryan Hart

Attorney at Fennemore Craig, P.C.

300 E. Second St., Suite 1510

Reno, NV 89501

Michael A.F. Johnson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter LLP

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

John H. Maddock, III

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Michael W. Stark

Attorney at McGuire Woods, LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Tennille Checkovich

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219-3916

Defendant Attorneys

Roger P. Croteau

Attorney at Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd.

9120 West Post Road, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Timothy Rhoda

Attorney at Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd.

9120 West Post Road, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Howard C. Kim

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jacqueline A. Gilbert

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Jesse N Panoff

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Diana Cline Ebron

Attorney at Kim Gilbert Ebron

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Suite 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (PS) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, and Sonora Hills Homeowners Association re 1 Complaint. (PS) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 7/16/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Asim Varma, Howard Cayne, and Michael A.F. Johnson to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/31/2015. (no image attached) (PS) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC served on 7/31/2015, answer due 8/21/2015. (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

#95

(#95) MOTION Discovery Pursuant to FRCP 56(d) re 70 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendant Las Vegas Development Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Croteau, Roger) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

#96

(#96) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 1/21/2016. Granting 92 Motion to Strike. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#97

(#97) REPLY to Response to 74 Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#99

(#99) NOTICE of Submission of First Supplemental Declaration of Michael A.F. Johnson by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association re 73 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael A.F. Johnson)(Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#100

(#100) ERRATA to 70 Motion for Summary Judgment, ; filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dean Meyer)(Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#101

(#101) REPLY to Response to 70 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#102

(#102) RESPONSE to 95 Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 2/18/2016. (Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#103

(#103) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Discovery 74 is Granted. If necessary, the parties shall file a joint discovery plan within seven days of the issuance of an order resolving the pending Motion for Summary Judgment 70 and Motion to Dismiss 46 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Discovery 74 is Granted. If necessary, the parties shall file a joint discovery plan within seven days of the issuance of an order resolving the pending Motion for Summary Judgment 70 and Motion to Dismiss 46 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) (Entered: 03/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) RESPONSE to 95 Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. Replies due by 2/18/2016. (Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) REPLY to Response to 70 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) ERRATA to 70 Motion for Summary Judgment, ; filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dean Meyer)(Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) NOTICE of Submission of First Supplemental Declaration of Michael A.F. Johnson by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association re 73 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael A.F. Johnson)(Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to 73 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 3)(Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 01/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) REPLY to Response to 74 Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Hart, Leslie Bryan) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 1/21/2016. Granting 92 Motion to Strike. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LAA) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) MOTION Discovery Pursuant to FRCP 56(d) re 70 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendant Las Vegas Development Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Croteau, Roger) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) RESPONSE to 70 Motion for Summary Judgment,, filed by Defendant Las Vegas Development Group, LLC. Replies due by 2/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Croteau, Roger) (Entered: 01/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 1 Complaint; filed by Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Gilbert, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC served on 7/31/2015, answer due 8/21/2015. (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 08/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Asim Varma, Howard Cayne, and Michael A.F. Johnson to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/31/2015. (no image attached) (PS) (Entered: 07/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 7/16/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, and Sonora Hills Homeowners Association re 1 Complaint. (PS) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (PS) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiffs Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Federal Housing finance Agency. (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, Sonora Hills Homeowners Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-3737691), filed by Federal Housing finance Agency, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/25/2015. Proof of service due by 11/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20) (Nitz, Dana) (Entered: 07/15/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nevada New Builds, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC is a litigant