This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2018 at 14:22:40 (UTC).

FatPipe, Inc. v. Talari Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 FatPipe, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Talari Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:16-CV-00054

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

FatPipe, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Talari Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Timothy J Carroll

Douglas L Sawyer

Mark Thomas Smith

Steven M Lubezny

Kelly Dean Hine

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Pressly M. Millen

David R. Boaz

Michael E Jones

Nikolaus A. Woloszczuk

Preston Hamilton Heard

Richard G Frenkel

John Frederick Bufe

Adam Michael Greenfield

 

Court Documents

#82

(#82) ORDER denying 70 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/29/2016. (Romine, L.)

#79

(#79) ORDER granting 74 Motion accelerated briefing schedule for Talari's motion to stay and for a modification of the parties' respective contention deadlines under Local Civil Rules 303.1-4. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/2/2016. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Marsh, K)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) ORDER denying 70 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/29/2016. (Romine, L.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) ORDER granting 74 Motion accelerated briefing schedule for Talari's motion to stay and for a modification of the parties' respective contention deadlines under Local Civil Rules 303.1-4. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/2/2016. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Marsh, K)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.