This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:00:06 (UTC).

FastVDO LLC v. AT& T Mobility LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2015 FastVDO LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT amp T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne and Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00921

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne

Judge

Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T Mobility LLC

Counter Defendant

FastVDO LLC

Counter Claimants

Samsung Electronics America Inc

Huawei Device Co Ltd

ZTE (USA) Inc.

AT&T Services, Inc.

AT&T Mobility LLC

Huawei Technologies USA Inc

Huawei Device USA Inc

Apple, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.

Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd

Futurewei Technologies Inc

Consolidated Defendants

Huawei Device Co. Ltd

LG Electronics Inc

Microsoft Mobile Inc.

ZTE Corporation

NEC Corporation

NEC Corporation of America

LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Wood Kennerly

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP - Palo Alto

1117 S California Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1106

Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Evan M McLean

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP - Palo Alto

1117 S California Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1106

Counter Defendant Attorneys

Shani M Tutt

Charles Ainsworth

Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao

Counter Claimant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Heather Fai Auyang

Attorney at Lee Tran & Liang LLP

601 Gateway Boulevard, Suite 1010

South San Francisco, CA 94080

David A Bailey

Attorney at Upshaw PLLC

811 S Central Expy, Suite 307

Richardson, TX 75080

Christopher Wood Kennerly

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP - Palo Alto

1117 S California Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1106

Harry Lee Gillam, Jr

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Evan M McLean

Attorney at Paul Hastings LLP - Palo Alto

1117 S California Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1106

Anne Marie Cappella

Michael E Jones

Brian E Ferguson

Christopher T Marando

Christopher Joseph Siebens

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP - Washington DC

1152 15Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005-1706

Alex Verbin Chachkes

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe- New York

666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10103-0001

Edward Daniel Robinson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine - San Francisco

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jennifer Haltom Doan

Attorney at Haltom & Doan

6500 Summerhill Road, Crown Executive Center Suite 100, P O Box 6227

Texarkana, TX 75505

Maxwell A Fox

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP - Japan

John Frederick Bufe

Attorney at Potter Minton, a Professional Corporation

110 N College Avenue, Suite 500

Tyler, TX 75702

Nicholas Lee

12 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FastVDO LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#71

(#71) ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 2/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#72

(#72) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Alex Verbin Chachkes on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Chachkes, Alex) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5226251.), filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '482 Patent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

#68

(#68) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dkts. 38, 39 and 40 by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#67

(#67) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik J Dykema on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Dykema, Erik) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/3/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#70

(#70) Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Brian) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FastVDO LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

#66

(#66) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Conkle, Christian) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

#73

(#73) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Joseph Siebens on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Siebens, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

#74

(#74) ORDER granting 70 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. ORDERED that the above- styled actions are transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

#69

(#69) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter James Wied on behalf of Futurewei Technologies Inc, Huawei Device Co Ltd, Huawei Device Co. Ltd, Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc, Huawei Technologies USA Inc (Wied, Peter) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Liao, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 AT&T Mobility LLC, # 2 AT&T Services Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER granting 70 Joint MOTION to Change Venue. ORDERED that the above- styled actions are transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/9/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Joseph Siebens on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Siebens, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Alex Verbin Chachkes on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics U.S.A. Inc. (Chachkes, Alex) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 2/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of California by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Brian) (Entered: 02/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter James Wied on behalf of Futurewei Technologies Inc, Huawei Device Co Ltd, Huawei Device Co. Ltd, Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc, Huawei Technologies USA Inc (Wied, Peter) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Dkts. 38, 39 and 40 by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 02/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik J Dykema on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc. (Dykema, Erik) (Entered: 02/03/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian W Conkle on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Conkle, Christian) (Entered: 02/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Dilworth Wilson on behalf of Microsoft Mobile Inc. (Wilson, Erica) (Entered: 02/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shani M Tutt on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Tutt, Shani) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Liao, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 AT&T Mobility LLC, # 2 AT&T Services Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of FastVDO LLC (Fenster, Marc) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FastVDO LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FastVDO LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/3/2015. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5226251.), filed by FastVDO LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '482 Patent, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.