This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2016 at 09:06:35 (UTC).

Ezell et al v. Express Energy Services, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2015 Ezell filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Express Energy Services, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge David A. Ezra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:15-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge David A. Ezra

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Ezell

Steven Lukas

Robert Barrett

Defendant

Express Energy Services, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachael Victoria Rustmann

Attorney at The Young Law Firm, P.C.

1001 S. Harrison St., Suite 200

Amarillo, TX 79101

Jeremi K. Young

Attorney at The Young Law Firm

1001 S. Harrison, Suite 200

Amarillo, TX 79101

Defendant Attorneys

Stefanie R. Moll

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Michael Patrick Jones

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Express Energy Services, L.L.C. amending, filed by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent-Barrett, Robert)(Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

1 #2

Exhibit B-Consent-Lukas, Steven

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Parties by Express Energy Services, L.L.C.. (Moll, Stefanie) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

#6

(#6) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Steven Lukas. Express Energy Services, L.L.C. served on 7/2/2015, answer due 8/3/2015. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Patrick Jones on behalf of Express Energy Services, L.L.C.. Attorney Michael Patrick Jones added to party Express Energy Services, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#11

(#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Thomas Ezell. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#1

No Description Available

1 #1

Exhibit A-Consent-Ezell, Thomas

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Express Energy Services, L.L.C.. (sm) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-First Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

#9

(#9) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/2/2015,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (se) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 10/21/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2015, Discovery due by 5/13/2016, Motions due by 6/13/2016,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (se) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint by Express Energy Services, L.L.C..(Moll, Stefanie) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, . Attorney Stefanie R. Moll added to party Express Energy Services, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by Express Energy Services, L.L.C..(Moll, Stefanie) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint by Express Energy Services, L.L.C..(Moll, Stefanie) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Patrick Jones on behalf of Express Energy Services, L.L.C.. Attorney Michael Patrick Jones added to party Express Energy Services, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 10/21/2015, Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2015, Discovery due by 5/13/2016, Motions due by 6/13/2016,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (se) (Entered: 09/08/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Express Energy Services, L.L.C. amending, filed by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent-Barrett, Robert)(Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 09/04/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Proposed Scheduling Order by Thomas Ezell. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-First Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 09/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/2/2015,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (se) (Entered: 09/02/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Interested Parties by Express Energy Services, L.L.C.. (Moll, Stefanie) (Entered: 08/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, . Attorney Stefanie R. Moll added to party Express Energy Services, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by Express Energy Services, L.L.C..(Moll, Stefanie) (Entered: 07/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Acknowledgment of Service returned by Steven Lukas. Express Energy Services, L.L.C. served on 7/2/2015, answer due 8/3/2015. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 07/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert A. Junell no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert A. Junell. (ms2) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Express Energy Services, L.L.C.. (sm) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Thomas Ezell, Steven Lukas. (Young, Jeremi) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7562844), filed by Thomas Ezell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Consent-Ezell, Thomas, # 2 Exhibit B-Consent-Lukas, Steven, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Jeremi) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/26/2015) (sm). (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.