This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2018 at 09:39:10 (UTC).

Execware LLC v. Barneys New York Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2014 Execware LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Barneys New York Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:14-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Judge

Judge Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Execware LLC

Defendant

Barneys New York Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Larry D. Thompson, Jr.

Richard D. Kirk

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Zachariah S. Harrington

Sara E. Bussiere

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Matthew J. Antonelli

Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 900, P.O. Box 25130

Wilmington, DE 19899

Califf T. Cooper

Peter J. Corcoran

Defendant Attorneys

Julia Heaney

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Barneys New York Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1466211.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Barneys New York Inc. served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachariah S. Harrington, Matthew J. Antonelli, Larry D. Thompson, Jr., and Peter J. Corcoran, III - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Zachariah S. Harrington, # 2 Certification of Matthew J. Antonelli, # 3 Certification of Larry D. Thompson, Jr., # 4 Certification of Peter J. Corcoran, III)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which defendant Barneys New York, Inc. may respond to the Complaint to May 19, 2014 - filed by Barneys New York Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/18/2014)

#7

(#7) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Corcoran, III as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Califf T. Cooper - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Califf T. Cooper)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Barneys New York Inc..(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

#26

(#26) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint proposal regarding the scope and schedule of production of ESI to January 21, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

#27

(#27) PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) by Execware LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

#28

(#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Execware LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#29

(#29) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Barneys New York Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

#30

(#30) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Califf Cooper as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

#31

(#31) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a joint proposed protective order to February 23, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

#32

(#32) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiff Execware, LLC (Nos. 1-75) and (ii) Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-8) filed by OfficeMax North America Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

#33

(#33) Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Defendants' counsel regarding request for discovery teleconference re PO. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

#34

(#34) ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for March 11, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than March 2, 2016, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than March 4, 2016, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/26/16. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00230-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORAL ORDER: After having been advised by Plaintiff(s) and Defendant(s) of their inability to resolve a discovery matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference is scheduled for March 11, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the party seeking relief shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that not later than March 2, 2016, any party seeking relief shall file with the Court a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining the issues in dispute and its position on those issues. Not later than March 4, 2016, any party opposing the application for relief may file a letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, outlining that party's reasons for its opposition. Each party shall submit to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of its discovery letter and any attachments. Should the Court find further briefing necessary upon conclusion of the telephone conference, the Court will order it. Alternatively, the Court may choose to resolve the dispute prior to the telephone conference and will, in that event, cancel the conference. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/26/16. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00230-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 02/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Joint Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Defendants' counsel regarding request for discovery teleconference re PO. (Anderson, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Defendants' First Set of Common Requests for Production to Plaintiff Execware, LLC (Nos. 1-75) and (ii) Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Nos. 1-8) filed by OfficeMax North America Inc..(Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a joint proposed protective order to February 23, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Califf Cooper as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Barneys New York Inc..(Flynn, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF EXECWARE, LLC'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Execware LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/26/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) by Execware LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a joint proposal regarding the scope and schedule of production of ESI to January 21, 2016 - filed by OfficeMax North America Inc.. (Lydon, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) EXECWARE, LLC'S AMENDED DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 8(a); and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Execware LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Perry Capital LLC for Barneys New York Inc. filed by Barneys New York Inc.. (Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Barneys New York Inc..(Heaney, Julia) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Califf T. Cooper - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Califf T. Cooper)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Peter J. Corcoran, III as co-counsel.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME by which defendant Barneys New York, Inc. may respond to the Complaint to May 19, 2014 - filed by Barneys New York Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/18/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachariah S. Harrington, Matthew J. Antonelli, Larry D. Thompson, Jr., and Peter J. Corcoran, III - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Zachariah S. Harrington, # 2 Certification of Matthew J. Antonelli, # 3 Certification of Larry D. Thompson, Jr., # 4 Certification of Peter J. Corcoran, III)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 03/05/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Execware LLC. Barneys New York Inc. served on 2/25/2014, answer due 3/18/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,216,139;. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Barneys New York Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1466211.) - filed by Execware LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.